Batres et al v. Homecomings Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Juan H Batres and Elisa L Batres
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Homecomings Financial, LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv01276
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Granting the Motion to Dismiss Party Defendants Aurora Loan Services LLC and MERS (Doc. 24). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Aurora Loan Services LLC and MERS. This action therefore is dismissed in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Denying all other pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/9/10.(LAD)
August 10, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that by 8/13/2010, the removing Dft shall file a supplement to the amended notice of removal listing every member of both limited liability companies and the citizenship of each of those members or this case will be remanded to state court for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/10/10. (SAT)
July 16, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that by July 30, 2010, the removing Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is cautioned t hat it will be given one opportunity to amend to cure the jurisdiction defects. The Court will not issue additional sua sponte show cause orders to assist Defendant in pleading jurisdiction. Therefore, if the amended notice of removal fails to plead federal subject matter jurisdiction, this case will be remanded without the Court sua sponte granting Defendant any further opportunities to amend.. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/16/10. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batres et al v. Homecomings Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan H Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa L Batres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marie Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?