Al-Misehal Commercial Group, Ltd. v. Armored Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Al-Misehal Commercial Group Limited
Defendant: Armored Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01303
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. It still appears to the court that this case should be settled by the parties, and they are again encouraged to do so. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 5/30/12.(JWS)
September 30, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION - For the reasons above, plaintiff's motion at docket 62 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1) It is denied to the extent there are genuine issues of material fact concerning repudiation of the agreement. 2) It is granted such that TAG may not argue that Al-Misehal cancelled the agreement for a reason other than HSSs failure to supply the jammers. 3) It is denied to the extent it seeks application of collateral estoppel to establish that TAG breached the contract. The motion at docket 75 is GRANTED in part. The Clerk will please strike the statement of facts at docket 74. Finally, it appears to the court that this case could be settled by the parties and they are encouraged to do so. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/30/11.(LAD)
June 1, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's 44 motion for leave to modify the scheduling order at docket 21 is GRANTED in part as follows. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended to 01/15/12, and the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 02/15/12. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 06/01/11. (ESL)
May 26, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that the defendant's 42 Motion for Leave to Amend its answer is denied. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 05/26/11.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Misehal Commercial Group, Ltd. v. Armored Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armored Group LLC
Represented By: John Laxson Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al-Misehal Commercial Group Limited
Represented By: Gary K Brucker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?