Hill v. White et al

Petitioner: Isiah Romont Hill
Respondent: William White and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv01339
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER summarily denying 60 Petitioner's Motion entitled "Title VII JudgmentF.R.C.P. Rule 55(A) Default". Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/17/11.(DMT)
May 2, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 45 . Denying the following: petitioner's Motion for Default Judgement 33 , Notice Motion (Doc. 34), Motion for Summary Judgment 35 , First Amended Motion for Summary Judgement 37 , Second Notice Motio n (Doc. 38), Second Amended Motion for Summary Judgement 39 , Motion for Specific Action/Request to Expedite Proceeding 49 , and Request [to] Expedite Release Order 53 are all denied. That the petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (as amended) is denied and that this action is dismissed. No certificate of appealability shall issue and that the petitioner shall not be allowed to appeal in forma pauperis because the dismi ssal of the habeas petition is justified in part by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable, and because the petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/2/11. (DMT)
April 4, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Petitioner's Motion for Disqualification or Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/4/11.(DMT)
November 3, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 27 ; that the petitioner's Motion to Request Summary Judgement F.R.C.P. 56(c)(A) - with Request to be Expedited 21 , Petitioners Reply Move for Dismissal of #CR 2006-009614-001 with Prejudice/Expedited Release 22 , Petitioner[s] Motion to Expedite his Reply 23 ), and the petitioner's Motion for Default Judgement... with Request to be Expedited... 24 are all denied. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/2/10. (DMT)
October 25, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, recommending that Petitioner's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment, 22 Motion for Dismissal/Expedited Release, 23 Motion to Expedite, and 24 Motion for Default Judgment be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/25/10. (REW)
September 24, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Release Order, Amended Motion for Release Order, Motion for Specific/Special Action, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Motion to Expedite Motion for Summary Judgment, docs. 12 , 14 , 15 , 16 and 17 , respectively, are DENIED, without prejudice, as premature. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/24/10.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isiah Romont Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William White
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Heckathorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Heckathorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?