United States of America v. Arizona, State of, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Arizona, State of and Janice K Brewer
Intervenor_defendant: Russell K Pearce and Larry A Dever
Movant: David Salgado, Chicanos Por La Causa, Inc. and Martin H Escobar
Amicus: John Kavanagh, Allied Educational Foundation, National Border Patrol Council, Jesse Hernandez, Arizona Latino Republican Association, Robert Aderholt, Matthew D Pinnavaia and Mike Bishop
Intervenor: Richard Mack
Case Number: 2:2010cv01413
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 175 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the 173 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, it is ordered that Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC, Judicial Watch, Inc., Geoffrey S. Kercsmar, Gregory B. Collins, Paul J. Orfanedes, James F. Peterson and Michael Bekesha are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for the Arizona State Legislature. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 01/30/12. (ESL)
January 27, 2012 174 *ERRATA re 173 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record for The Arizona State Legislature by Arizona State Legislature.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey) *Modified entry to correct event type on 1/30/2012 (ESL).
January 27, 2012 173 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Arizona State Legislature. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
January 12, 2012 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Gentala on behalf of Arizona State Legislature (Gentala, Peter)
October 21, 2011 171 Featured Case ORDER granting the Counterdefendants' 154 Motion to Dismiss Counerclaims and dismissing Arizona's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/21/11.(ESL)
August 1, 2011 Notice of request for e-notices by Diana L. Varela. (Varela, Diana)
July 28, 2011 170 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: This is the time set for Hearing re: Counterdefendants' 154 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Counterdefendants' 154 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke.) (ESL)
July 12, 2011 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re 154 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims filed by Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
July 7, 2011 168 Featured Case ORDER denying the Renewed 167 Motion by Minuteman Civil Defense Corps, a Project of Declaration Alliance for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Minuteman Civil Defense Corps, a Project of Declaration Alliance, in Support of Counterclaimants' Opposition to Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/07/11. (ESL)
July 6, 2011 167 *MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by John Joseph Jakubczyk on behalf of Minuteman Civil Defence Corps. (Jakubczyk, John) *Modified to Motion event on 7/7/2011* (REW).
June 30, 2011 166 MANDATE of USCA as to 89 Notice of Appeal, appeal case number 10-16645 filed by Janice K Brewer, Arizona, State of. We AFFIRM the preliminary injunction enjoining enforcement of S.B. 1070 Sections 2(B), 3, 5(C), and 6. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 NDA)(ESL)
June 24, 2011 165 Featured Case ORDER denying the Minuteman Civil Defence [sic] Corps's 164 Motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief and striking the proposed brief from the docket. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/24/11. (ESL)
June 23, 2011 164 *Proposed Brief STRICKEN per (Doc 165)*MOTION for Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John Joseph Jakubczyk on behalf of Minuteman Civil Defence Corps. (Jakubczyk, John) *Entry modified to correct event on 6/24/2011 (ESL).
June 21, 2011 163 Minute Order: Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 at 10:00AM before Judge Susan R Bolton re: 154 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
June 13, 2011 162 RESPONSE to Motion re 154 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Hiller, Evan)
May 25, 2011 161 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by John J Bouma (Bouma, John)
May 11, 2011 160 NOTICE re Re Defendants' Intent to File a Petition for Writ of Certiorari by Arizona State Legislature, Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer, United States of America re 147 Order on Motion to Intervene, Motion Hearing,,,,. (Bouma, John)
May 10, 2011 159 Featured Case ORDER Pursuant to the stipulation between parties, and for good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants/Counterclaimants' response brief in opposition to the 154 Motion to Dismiss is due 06/13/11 and Counterdefendants' reply brief is due by 07/12/11. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 05/10/11. (ESL)
May 9, 2011 158 STIPULATION re 154 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims to Extend Time for Defendants/Counterclaimants to File Response and for Plaintiff/Counterdefendants to File a Reply by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tryon, G)
May 5, 2011 157 NOTICE of Appearance by G Michael Tryon on behalf of Arizona, State of (Tryon, G)
April 18, 2011 156 Featured Case ORDER that the 155 Consent Motion to Exceed Page Limits is GRANTED, and Counterclaimants may file a Response to Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss that does not exceed 32 pages, after which Counterdefendants may file a Reply that does not exceed 11 pages. The Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines is GRANTED. Counterclaimants shall file their Response on or before 05/31/11 and Counterdefendants shall file their Reply thereto on or before 06/22/11. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 04/18/11. (ESL)
April 15, 2011 155 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and Exceed Page Limits by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hiller, Evan)
April 12, 2011 154 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (ESL)
April 12, 2011 153 Featured Case ORDER that Counterdefendants' 150 Motion for Leave is granted, and they may file a motion to dismiss and supporting memorandum of law that does not exceed 32 pages. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 04/12/11.(ESL)
April 11, 2011 152 LODGED Proposed Lodged Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims re: 150 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
April 6, 2011 151 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 150 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Justice, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr., United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security. Description of deficiency: Original proposed pleading not electronically filed using the Lodged Proposed Document Event. Follow up is required. Please see attached pdf for complete details. (ESL)
April 6, 2011 150 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims by Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chilakamarri, Varu)
April 5, 2011 149 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Intervenor Defendant Arizona State Legislature.(ESL)
April 5, 2011 148 Featured Case ORDER granting the 142 Motion of the Arizona State Legislature for Intervention as Defendant. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 04/05/11.(ESL)
April 1, 2011 147 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2011 re 142 Motion of the Arizona State Legistlature for Intervention as Defendant. The 142 Motion is taken under advisement. Regarding the counterclaim, Plaintiff's counsel Chilakamarri advises the Court a Motion to Dismiss will be filed no later than 04/14/11. IT IS ORDERED the parties shall jointly advise the Court in writing within 30 days of receiving the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals' decision whether or not the parties intend to pursue further appeals. The Court may set a scheduling conference depending upon the parties' filing (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.) (ESL)
March 10, 2011 146 Featured Case ORDER setting oral argument on the 142 Motion of the Arizona State Legislature for Intervention as Defendant on Friday, 04/1/11 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502. It is further ordered that counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants also be prepared to discuss a scheduling plan for this case through trial. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 03/10/11. (ESL)
March 7, 2011 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 142 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Arizona State Legislature. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
February 25, 2011 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
February 11, 2011 143 LODGED Proposed Answer in Intervention re: 142 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona State Legislature. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
February 11, 2011 142 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Arizona State Legislature. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Senate Bill 1117)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
February 10, 2011 141 Summons Issued as to Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Janet A Napolitano on 2/10/11. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(MHU). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 10, 2011 140 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Tryon, G)
February 10, 2011 139 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Tryon, G)
February 10, 2011 138 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, Janet A Napolitano, United States Department of Justice, Eric Himpton Holder, Jr by Janice K Brewer, Arizona, State of.(Tryon, G)
January 20, 2011 137 NOTICE re Association of Counsel by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
January 13, 2011 136 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 84 in CV10-0951 and Doc. 44 in CV10-1413). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 01/12/11.(ESL)
December 21, 2010 135 Featured Case ORDER Pursuant to the 134 stipulation between the parties, and for good cause shown, the defendants' response to the operative complaint in this action is due by 02/11/11. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/21/10. (ESL)
December 20, 2010 134 STIPULATION Regarding Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
December 10, 2010 133 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants State of Arizona and Janice K. Brewer's 81 Motion to Dismiss and granting Plaintiff 30 days including the date of entry of this Order to file any amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/10/10. (ESL)
December 7, 2010 132 Featured Case ORDER denying Jesse Hernandez and the Arizona Latino Republican Association's 68 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/07/10.(ESL)
November 18, 2010 131 Featured Case ORDER denying Ray Elbert Parker's 112 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of Defendants Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Appellant After Docketing the Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/18/10. (ESL)
November 18, 2010 130 Featured Case ORDER denying 71 Motion for Permission to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona by Matthew D. Pinnavaia, an American Citizen. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/18/10. (ESL)
November 18, 2010 129 Featured Case ORDER denying the 110 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Michigan Senate Majority Leader Mike Bishop. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/18/10. (ESL)
October 28, 2010 128 Featured Case ORDER denying State Senator Russell Pearce's 33 Motion to Intervene; denying Cochise County Sheriff Larry A. Dever's 88 Motion to Intervene; denying Richard Mack's 122 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/28/10. (note: see attached pdf for complete details)(ESL)
October 19, 2010 127 MANDATE of USCA - The jgm of this Court, entered 8/26/10, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction re 10-16731 as to 100 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Mariette Do-Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 nda)(SAT)
October 6, 2010 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Intervene filed by Richard Mack. (Irion, Van)
September 28, 2010 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
September 28, 2010 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (Opposition to Motion to Intervene) filed by United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
September 16, 2010 123 NOTICE re Notice of Lodging by Larry A Dever re 88 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bergin, Brian)
September 16, 2010 122 MOTION to Intervene by Richard Mack. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Irion, Van)
September 13, 2010 121 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 120 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 13, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX101125 as to Van Irion. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2010 120 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Van Irion on behalf of Intervenor Richard Mack. (BAS)
September 10, 2010 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re 81 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
September 3, 2010 118 Featured Case ORDER denying the following Motions to file Amicus Curiae briefs as moot: Docs. 14 , 30 , 37 , 46 , 49 , 52 , 57 , 66 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/03/10. (ESL)
September 3, 2010 117 Featured Case ORDER that any response in opposition to Jesse Hernandez and the Arizona Latino Republican Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene as Defendants or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File Briefs as Amicus Curiae (Doc. 68) shall be filed no later than September 30, 2010. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/03/10. (ESL)
September 2, 2010 116 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to the 114 Stipulation between the parties, the reply brief in support of defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 81) is due by 09/10/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/02/10. (ESL)
September 2, 2010 115 Featured Case ORDER denying the document entitled 108 " Appealing Court Ruling and Motion for Join (sic) the Parties..." filed by D.Q. Mariette Do-Nguyen. D.Q. Mariette Do-Nguyen is not a party to this case, cannot appeal and will not be permitted to "join the parties". Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/02/10.(ESL)
September 1, 2010 114 STIPULATION by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
August 27, 2010 113 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of the State of Arizona's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion To Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (ESL)
August 27, 2010 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum in Support of Defendants Opposition to Motion To Dismiss by Ray Elbert Parker. (ESL)
August 26, 2010 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re 81 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by United States of America. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua)
August 23, 2010 110 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Mike Bishop. (note: Amici Curiae Brief not submitted) (ESL)
August 23, 2010 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re 88 MOTION to Intervene filed by Larry A Dever. (Bergin, Brian)
August 18, 2010 108 MOTION for Reconsideration re 106 Order on 54 MOTION to Join the Parties, in Support of State of Arizona's SB 1070 Immigration Law, for Miscellaneous Relief, by Mariette Do-Nguyen. (Titled: "Appealing Court Ruling and Motion for Join the Parties..."). (ESL)
August 17, 2010 107 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PHX100245 re 100 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Mariette Do-Nguyen (ESL)
August 13, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER denying 54 Motion for Join the Parties in Support State of Arizona's SB1070 Immigration Law filed by D.Q. Mariette Do-Nguyen; denying the Motion to Appeal the Court Ruling that did not Include Badly Effected Areas in Joinder Complain and Seek the Court Enforcement Order of the U.S. Constitution and Federal Laws filed on 08/05/10. D.Q. Mariette Do-Nguyen is not a party to this case and cannot appeal. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/13/10. (ESL)
August 12, 2010 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
August 9, 2010 104 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Larry A Dever for proceedings held on 07-22-10 before Judge bolton.. (Bergin, Brian)
August 9, 2010 103 Featured Case ORDER that the 99 Stipulation for an Extension of Time is granted, and Plaintiff may file its Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before 08/26/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 08/09/10. (ESL)
August 9, 2010 102 RESPONSE to Motion re 69 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases GOVERNOR BREWER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
August 9, 2010 101 Ninth Circuit Case Number 10-16731 for 100 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (REW)
August 5, 2010 100 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit as to 87 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Mariette Do-Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-H, # 2 Exhibits I-O)(REW)
August 5, 2010 99 STIPULATION and Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chilakamarri, Varu)
August 4, 2010 98 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD TRANSMITTED TO 9TH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re 89 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (ESL)
August 3, 2010 97 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 7/22/10 before Judge Susan R. Bolton, (Bouma, John)
August 3, 2010 96 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 93 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 94 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 95 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099663 as to Michael Bekesha. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099664 as to James F Peterson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 95 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James F Peterson on behalf of Russell K Pearce. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 94 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael Bekesha on behalf of Russell K Pearce. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099665 as to Paul J Orfanedes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 93 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Paul J Orfanedes on behalf of Russell K Pearce. (BAS)
August 2, 2010 92 RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
August 2, 2010 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua)
July 29, 2010 90 Ninth Circuit Case Number 10-16645 for 89 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
July 29, 2010 89 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to 87 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-4173069. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Information Representation Statement)(Bouma, John) Modified on 7/29/2010 CORRECTED to correct appeal event (REW).
July 28, 2010 88 MOTION to Intervene by Larry A. Dever. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit In Support of Sheriff Dever's Motion to Intervene)(Bergin, Brian)
July 28, 2010 87 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part the United States' 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to the following Sections of Senate Bill 1070 (as amended by House Bill 2162): Section 1, Section 2(A) and (C)-(L), Section 4, the portion of Section 5 creating A.R.S. § 13-2929, the portion of Section 5 creating A.R.S. § 13-2928(A) and (B), and Sections 7-13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED preliminarily enjoining the State of Arizona and Governor Brewer from enforcing the following Sections of Senate Bill 1070 (as amended by House Bill 2162): Section 2(B) creating A.R.S. § 11-1051(B), Section 3 creating A.R.S. § 13-1509, the portion of Section 5 creating A.R.S. § 13-2928 (C), and Section 6 creating A.R.S. § 13-3883(A)(5). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/28/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 27, 2010 86 LODGED Proposed Motion to Dismiss re: 33 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant and Request for Expedited Ruling. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Russell K Pearce. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
July 27, 2010 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by United States of America. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua)
July 27, 2010 84 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 07/22/2010 before Judge Susan R Bolton. Court Reporter: Elizabeth A Lemke. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2010. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 83 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on July 22, 2010 @ 1:30 pm before Judge Susan Bolton. (Bouma, John)
July 26, 2010 82 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Abigail Woodbury of NBC Nightly News - Washington - for proceedings held on 7/22/2010 before Judge Susan R Bolton. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 81 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
July 26, 2010 80 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by United States of America for proceedings held on 07/22/2010 before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Wilkenfeld, Joshua)
July 25, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Donald Peder Johnsen. (Johnsen, Donald)
July 23, 2010 79 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona for proceedings held on 7/22/2010 before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Lai, Anne)
July 22, 2010 78 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Hearing re Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 07/22/10. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.)(ESL)
July 22, 2010 77 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 22, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099283 as to Carolyn B Lamm. (BAS)
July 22, 2010 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carolyn Beth Lamm on behalf of American Bar Association. (BAS)
July 22, 2010 75 Notice re Certificate of Good Standing by Jesse Hernandez re 68 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief for Larry Klayman (Alexander, Rachel)
July 22, 2010 74 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (ESL)
July 22, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER granting Dft's 62 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit. That the proposed response to pla's motion for preliminary injunction, which dfts lodged with this court on 07/20/10, shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/22/10.(ESL)
July 22, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Louis R. Moffa, Jr., Esquire. (Moffa, Louis)
July 21, 2010 72 LODGED Proposed Brief for Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants State of Arizona and Governor Janice K Brewer re: 71 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Matthew D Pinnavaia. (ESL)
July 21, 2010 71 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Matthew D Pinnavaia. (ESL)
July 21, 2010 70 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 terminating 36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099268 as to Sara Elizabeth Dill. (BAS)
July 21, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Kenneth D. Nyman. (Nyman, Kenneth)
July 21, 2010 69 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Martin H. Escobar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Richard)
July 21, 2010 68 First MOTION for Leave to file Amicus Brief by Jesse Hernandez. (Alexander, Rachel) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. Modified on 7/21/2010 (ESL).
July 20, 2010 67 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT: Amicus Curiae re 66 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Amici Curiae by Amicus Parties Rodney Alexander, Michele Bachmann, Spencer Bachus, John Barrasso, Gresham Barrett, Brian Bilbray, Gus Bilirakis, Rob Bishop, Marsha Blackburn, John Boozman, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Ginny Brown-Waite, Michael Burgess, Ken Calvert, John Campbell, John Carter, Jason Chaffetz, Howard Coble, Mike Coffman, John Culberson, Geoff Davis, Jim Demint, David Dreier, John Duncan, John Fleming, Randy Forbes, Virginia Foxx, Trent Franks, Elton Gallegly, Scott Garrett, Phil Gingrey, Louie Gohmert, Bob Goodlatte, Tom Graves, Wally Herger, Pete Hoekstra, Duncan Hunter, James Inhofe, Lynn Jenkins, Walter Jones, Jim Jordan, Steve King, Jack Kingston, John Kline, Doug Lamborn, Robert Latta, Jerry Lewis, Cynthia Lummis, Michael McCaul, Tom McClintock, Thaddeus McCotter, Patrick McHenry, Gary Miller, Jeff Miller, Jerry Moran, Tim Murphy, Sue Myrick, Randy Neugebauer, Joe Pitts, Todd Platts, Ted Poe, Bill Posey, Tom Price, Phil Roe, Mike Rogers, Dana Rohrabacher, Ed Royce, Jean Schmidt, John Shadegg, Mike Simpson, Lamar Smith, Cliff Stearns, John Sullivan, Gene Taylor, Todd Tiahrt, David Vitter, Ed Whitfield, Roger Wicker, Rob Wittman. to be filed by the Clerk if Motion for Leave to File is granted. (Meehan, Michael) CORRECTION: incorrect event. Modified on 7/21/2010 (ESL).
July 20, 2010 66 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Rodney Alexander, Michele Bachmann, Spencer Bachus, John Barrasso, Gresham Barrett, Brian Bilbray, Gus Bilirakis, Rob Bishop, Marsha Blackburn, John Boozman, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Ginny Brown-Waite, Michael Burgess, Ken Calvert, John Campbell, John Carter, Jason Chaffetz, Howard Coble, Mike Coffman, John Culberson, Geoff Davis, Jim Demint, David Dreier, John Duncan, John Fleming, Randy Forbes, Virginia Foxx, Trent Franks, Elton Gallegly, Scott Garrett, Phil Gingrey, Louie Gohmert, Bob Goodlatte, Tom Graves, Wally Herger, Pete Hoekstra, Duncan Hunter, James Inhofe, Lynn Jenkins(U.S. Representative (KS)), Walter Jones, Jim Jordan, Steve King, Jack Kingston, John Kline, Doug Lamborn, Robert Latta, Jerry Lewis, Cynthia Lummis, Michael McCaul, Tom McClintock(U.S. Representative (CA)), Thaddeus McCotter, Patrick McHenry, Gary Miller(U.S. Representative (CA) ), Jeff Miller, Jerry Moran, Tim Murphy, Sue Myrick, Randy Neugebauer, Joe Pitts, Todd Platts, Ted Poe, Bill Posey, Tom Price, Phil Roe, Mike Rogers, Dana Rohrabacher, Ed Royce, Jean Schmidt, John Shadegg, Mike Simpson, Lamar Smith(U.S. Representative (TX)), Cliff Stearns, John Sullivan, Gene Taylor, Todd Tiahrt, David Vitter, Ed Whitfield, Roger Wicker, Rob Wittman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Amici Leave to File Brief in Support of Defendants)(Meehan, Michael)
July 20, 2010 65 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Rodney Alexander, Michele Bachmann, Spencer Bachus, John Barrasso, Gresham Barrett, Brian Bilbray, Gus Bilirakis, Rob Bishop, Marsha Blackburn, John Boozman, Kevin Brady, Paul Broun, Ginny Brown-Waite, Michael Burgess, Ken Calvert, John Campbell, John Carter, Jason Chaffetz, Howard Coble, Mike Coffman, John Culberson, Geoff Davis, Jim Demint, David Dreier, John Duncan, John Fleming, Randy Forbes, Virginia Foxx, Trent Franks, Elton Gallegly, Scott Garrett, Phil Gingrey, Louie Gohmert, Bob Goodlatte, Tom Graves, Wally Herger, Pete Hoekstra, Duncan Hunter, James Inhofe, Lynn Jenkins, Walter Jones, Jim Jordan, Steve King, Jack Kingston, John Kline, Doug Lamborn, Robert Latta, Jerry Lewis, Cynthia Lummis, Michael McCaul, Tom McClintock, Thaddeus McCotter, Patrick McHenry, Gary Miller, Jeff Miller, Jerry Moran, Tim Murphy, Sue Myrick, Randy Neugebauer, Joe Pitts, Todd Platts, Ted Poe, Bill Posey, Tom Price, Phil Roe, Mike Rogers, Dana Rohrabacher, Ed Royce, Jean Schmidt, John Shadegg, Mike Simpson, Lamar Smith, Cliff Stearns, John Sullivan, Gene Taylor, Todd Tiahrt, David Vitter, Ed Whitfield, Roger Wicker, Rob Wittman. (Meehan, Michael)
July 20, 2010 64 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 63 Lodged Proposed Document Index - Exhibit P by Defendants Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q-Y, # 2 Exhibit Z, 1, 2, # 3 Exhibit 3-8, # 4 Exhibit 9-33, # 5 Exhibit 34-41)(Bouma, John)
July 20, 2010 63 LODGED Proposed Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
July 20, 2010 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
July 20, 2010 61 LODGED Proposed Amended Proposed Memorandum in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Russell K Pearce. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
July 20, 2010 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Washington Legal Foundation, Allied Educational Foundation, National Border Patrol Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hardy, David) Modified on 7/20/2010 to add additional filers. (ESL).
July 20, 2010 59 LODGED Proposed Amicus supporting Defendant re: 57 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae supporting Defendants. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hardy, David)
July 20, 2010 58 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sara Elizabeth Dill by American Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dill, Sara)
July 20, 2010 57 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae supporting Defendants by Washington Legal Foundation. (Hardy, David)
July 20, 2010 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Russell K Pearce. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
July 20, 2010 55 LODGED Proposed PROPOSED MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 33 MOTION to Intervene. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Russell K Pearce. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) CORRECTION: document linked incorrectly. Modified on 7/20/2010 (ESL).
July 19, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Michael J. Meehan. (Meehan, Michael)
July 19, 2010 54 MOTION to Join the Parties, in Support of State of Arizona's SB 1070 Immigration Law by Mariette Do-Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (NOTE: Exhibit F is a book)(REW)
July 19, 2010 53 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Memorandum re: 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Municipal Risk Retention Pool. (Peters, Donald)
July 19, 2010 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum by Arizona Municipal Risk Retention Pool. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peters, Donald)
July 19, 2010 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Zall, Barnaby)
July 19, 2010 50 LODGED Proposed Amicus Brief re: 49 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Opposing Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Zall, Barnaby)
July 19, 2010 49 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Opposing Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Zall, Barnaby)
July 19, 2010 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Smiley Kneedler on behalf of United States of America (Kneedler, Edwin)
July 19, 2010 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by United States of America. (Chilakamarri, Varu)
July 16, 2010 47 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief re: 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear: Amicus. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ray Elbert Parker. (REW)
July 16, 2010 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus (in Support of Dfts in this cause) by Ray Elbert Parker. (REW)
July 16, 2010 44 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David Salgado, Chicanos Por La Causa, Inc.. (Montoya, Stephen)
July 16, 2010 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Silverman on behalf of American Bar Association (Silverman, Andrew)
July 15, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099044 as to Barnaby W Zall. (BAS)
July 15, 2010 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Barnaby W. Zall by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zall, Barnaby)
July 15, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099033 as to Stephen N Zack. (BAS)
July 15, 2010 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen N. Zack by American Bar Association. (Zack, Stephen)
July 15, 2010 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sara Elizabeth Dill filed by American Bar Association. Description of deficiency: certificate of good standing is missing. Follow up is required. Please see attached pdf for complete details. (ESL)
July 15, 2010 37 AMENDED MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara)
July 15, 2010 36 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sara Elizabeth Dill by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara)
July 14, 2010 35 LODGED Proposed re: 34 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTION: filer (REW).
July 14, 2010 34 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTION: filer (REW).
July 14, 2010 33 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant and Request for Expedited Ruling by Russell K Pearce. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
July 14, 2010 32 LODGED Proposed Document: Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae re 30 MOTION Memorandum for Request to File Brief of Amici Curiae. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File is granted. Filed by Michigan, Florida, Alabama, Nebraska, Northern Mariana Islands, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Virginia. (Casey, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTIONS: document event and filers (REW).
July 14, 2010 31 Additional Attachments to Main Document [Proposed] Order re 30 MOTION and Memorandum for Request to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Michigan, Florida, Alabama, Nebraska, Northern Mariana Islands, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Virginia . (Casey, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTED: filers (REW).
July 14, 2010 30 MOTION and Memorandum for Request to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Michigan, Florida, Alabama, Nebraska, Northern Mariana Islands, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Virginia. (Casey, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTED: filers (REW).
July 14, 2010 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Casey on behalf of Michigan, Florida, Alabama, Nebraska, Northern Mariana Islands, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Virginia (Casey, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTED: filers (REW).
July 14, 2010 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Casey on behalf of Michigan, Florida, Alabama, Nebraska, Northern Mariana Islands, Pennsylvania, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Virginia (Casey, Timothy) Modified on 7/16/2010 CORRECTED: filers (REW).
July 12, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Michael M. Walker. (Walker, Michael)
July 8, 2010 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Bouma on behalf of Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer (Bouma, John)
July 8, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098760 as to Anthony S Barkow. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098756 as to Ellen London. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098758 as to Jessica A Murzyn. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098759 as to Anne Milgram. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anne Milgram on behalf of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jessica A Murzyn on behalf of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ellen London on behalf of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anthony S Barkow on behalf of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Janice K Brewer served on 7/6/2010. (REW)
July 8, 2010 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Arizona, State of served on 7/6/2010. (REW)
July 8, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER, the Court advises counsel that the hearing scheduled for July 22, 2010, at 1:30 p.m. will be held in Special Proceedings Courtroom #200. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/8/10. (REW)
July 8, 2010 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Text of Proposed Order by Amicus Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (Solano, Ricardo)
July 8, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER: On June 8, 2010, Amicus Curiae Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed a Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae 14 . IT IS ORDERED that the motion will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Page 12, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/8/10. (MAW)
July 8, 2010 15 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae the Center on the Administration of Criminal Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re: 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (Solano, Ricardo)
July 8, 2010 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (Solano, Ricardo)
July 7, 2010 27 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(ESL)
July 7, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 7, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098655 as to Ricardo Solano, Jr. (BAS)
July 7, 2010 12 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Telephonic Conference held on 7/7/2010. Granting Pla's Motion to Transfer. Transferring CV 10-1413 PHX NVW to this Court. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV 10-1413 PHX SRB; granting Pla's 5 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Pla's lodged Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed as of this date. FURTHER ORDERED setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing on 07/22/10, at 1:30 p.m.. FURTHER ORDERED granting Pla's 8 Motion for Issuance of an Expedited Briefing Schedule. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.) (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details and deadlines) (ESL)
July 7, 2010 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ricardo Solano Jr on behalf of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law. (BAS)
July 7, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer [doc. 44 in CV 10-926 PHX SRB]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED transferring CV 10-1413 PHX NVW to Judge Susan R. Bolton for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV 10-1413 PHX SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/07/10. (ESL)
July 7, 2010 9 Minute Order: On the Court's Own Motion, Telephonic Conference set for 7/7/2010 at 02:00 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. The Court will initiate the conference call. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 6, 2010 8 MOTION for Motion for Issuance of an Expedited Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilkenfeld, Joshua)
July 6, 2010 7 Notice re Notice of Filing of Motion to Transfer Case by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Filed Motion to Transfer Case, # 2 Filed Proposed Order for Motion to Transfer Case)(Chilakamarri, Varu)
July 6, 2010 6 LODGED Proposed Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof re: 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Chilakamarri, Varu)
July 6, 2010 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chilakamarri, Varu)
July 6, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Janice K Brewer)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
July 6, 2010 3 Notice of availability of Magistrate Judge (BAS)
July 6, 2010 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 10-1413-PHX-NVW. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 6, 2010 1 COMPLAINT., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Chilakamarri, Varu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Arizona, State of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Varu Chilakamarri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Russell K Pearce
Represented By: Michael Bekesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Larry A Dever
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: David Salgado
Represented By: Erica Rose Gonzalez-Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Chicanos Por La Causa, Inc.
Represented By: Erica Rose Gonzalez-Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Martin H Escobar
Represented By: Augustine B Jimenez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: John Kavanagh
Represented By: David T Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Allied Educational Foundation
Represented By: David T Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Border Patrol Council
Represented By: David T Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Jesse Hernandez
Represented By: Rachel R Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arizona Latino Republican Association
Represented By: Rachel R Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Robert Aderholt
Represented By: Michael M Hethmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Matthew D Pinnavaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mike Bishop
Represented By: Colleen Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Richard Mack
Represented By: Van Irion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?