Moore v Maricopa County Sheriff's Office

Plaintiff: Larry L Moore
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 2:2010cv01495
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Complaint 30 and this action are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/11/12. (TLJ)
February 14, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the "Re-Filed Complaint" 28 is dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's 1/18/12 Order and Local Rule of Civil Procedure 3.4. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/14/12. (TLJ)
February 8, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's "Motion to Request Case to be Before a Different Bench (Judge)(Request Displacement)". Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/8/12.(TLJ)
January 18, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is construed as a response to the Court's 10/28/11 Order to Show Cause. To the extent it requests "Compensation and Relief" at this point in the litigation, it is denied 23 . Plaintiff's Application to Proceed 2 is granted. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. The Complaint 1 and Amended Complaint 3 are dismissed. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must correct the docket to reflect that Document 6 is a Memorandum. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/18/12.(TLJ)
October 28, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE pursuant to the Mandate of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals 19 , the Clerk of Court must reopen this case. Within 20 days from the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must show cause why this case should not be dismissed withou t prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal. The Clerk of Court must mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the following address (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/28/11. (TLJ)
July 21, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; this action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a complaint in a new case accompanied by the full $350.00 filing fee; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly and close this file. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/21/10. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?