Avant-Garde LLC v. Mountain Spa Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Avant-Garde LLC
Defendant: Richard H Bloomfield, Daniel Byer, Timothy R Forstrom, Unknown Byer, Unknown Forstrom, Rebecca R Mendenhall, Nolen Mendenhall, Unknown Locey, Bloomfield CFO PLLC, Unknown Rennert, Beck Locey, Mountain Spa Properties LLC, Michelle Locey, Aaron T Rennert, Michelle Forstrom and Unknown Bloomfield
Case Number: 2:2010cv01499
Filed: July 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Filing 159 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction of Judgment Against Defendant Beck Locey by Avant-Garde LLC. (Harris, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2017 Filing 158 *Judgment Renewal AFFIDAVIT of Jon A. Titus, Esq. re: #154 Clerks Judgment by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) *Modified to add text on 1/17/2017 (DXD).
December 12, 2016 Filing 157 *JUDGMENT RENEWAL AFFIDAVIT of Jon A. Titus, Esq. re: #147 Clerks Judgment by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) *Modified to add text on 12/15/2016 (DXD).
December 7, 2012 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Julie A. Rennert by Unknown Rennert. (DMT)
January 20, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Avant-Garde LLC (Brooks, Laura)
January 19, 2012 Filing 154 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed this date and upon the Court's instruction therein, judgment is entered for the Plaintiff and against Defendant Rebecca R. Mendenhall in the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid. Each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (DMT)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment between Plaintiffand Defendant Rebecca Mendenhall. That the clerk shall enter judgment against Defendant Rebecca Mendenhall and in favor of Plaintiff for the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid. Each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by January 26, 2012 why this case should not be dismissed against Defendant Jane Doe Byer, who appears to be a nominal party only. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/19/12. (DMT)
January 18, 2012 Filing 152 STIPULATION For Entry of Judgment by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Judgment)(Brooks, Laura)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: #150 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Deadlines is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/17/12. (NKS)
January 14, 2012 Filing 150 *NOTICE of Settlement Pending Bankruptcy Court Approval and Motion to Continue Deadlines by Avant-Garde LLC (Brooks, Laura) *Modified to add motion type on 1/17/2012 (LSP).
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER that Defendant Beck Loceys Motion to Request a Magistrate Judge (Doc. 148), which is treated as that and as a motion to set aside the stipulated judgment of December 16, 2011 (Doc. 147), is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/27/2011.(TCA)
December 23, 2011 Filing 148 MOTION to Request a Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference by Beck Locey. (SJF)
December 16, 2011 Filing 147 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 16, 2011, judgment is entered against Defendant Beck Locey and in favor of Plaintiff for the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid, each party to bear its own attorneys fees' and costs. Further, judgment is entered against Defendant Timothy Forstrom and in favor of Plaintiff for the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (LAD)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #142 Stipulation, #141 Stipulation: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall enter judgment against Defendant Beck Locey and in favor of Plaintiff for the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid, each party to bear its ownattorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall enter judgment against Defendant Timothy Forstrom and in favor of Plaintiff for the principal sum of $1,000,000, with interest accruing at the rate of 24% per annum from February 14, 2008 until paid in full, plus a late fee of 5% of the total amount due when paid, each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/16/11. (LAD)
December 14, 2011 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM Memorandum Regarding Stipulated Judgment Terms by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Brooks, Laura)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a memorandum on or before December 16, 2011, briefly explaining the basis for the 24% interest rate and 5% late fee. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/13/11. (NKS)
December 13, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE re of Filing Proposed Judgment by Avant-Garde LLC re #141 Stipulation . (Fitzgerald, David)
December 12, 2011 Filing 142 STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Judgment)(Fitzgerald, David)
December 12, 2011 Filing 141 STIPULATION For Entry of Judgment by Avant-Garde LLC. (Fitzgerald, David)
November 18, 2011 Filing 140 REPORT of Settlement Talks Joint by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
November 18, 2011 Filing 139 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #138 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions, ORDERED granting the aforementioned motion. FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline to file dispositive motions from 11/18/11 to 12/22/11 AND extending the deadline to submit a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order from 12/16/11 to 01/13/12. If summary judgment motions have been filed, the Court will set a new time for lodging the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order after the resolution of such dispositive motions. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 18, 2011 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order extending deadline to file dispositive motions)(Titus, Jon)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER: Defendant Rebecca Mendenhall's #127 motion to dismiss is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/25/11. (NKS)
October 17, 2011 Filing 136 *NOTICE to #134 MOTION for Disclosure Clarification and Additional Information by Defendant Mendenhall on Plaintiff's Filing Document #134 by Rebecca R Mendenhall. (Mendenhall, Rebecca R) Modified on 10/17/2011 (DMT). *Modified on 10/17/2011 from motion* (DMT).
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: #134 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Engage in Good Faith Settlement Talks and Request for Order Compelling the Parties to Appear In Person for Settlement Conference is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' deadline for engaging in good-faith, in-person settlement talks is extended until 11/18/11. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/30/11. (NKS)
September 29, 2011 Filing 134 * MOTION for Extension of Time to Engage in Good Faith Settlement Talks by Avant-Garde LLC and MOTION (request) for Order Compelling Parties to Appear in Person for Settlement Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Titus, Jon). *Added MOTION for Order on 9/30/2011* (DMT).
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party. Register as a user with the Clerk's Office within five (5) days of the date of this Order and register as a subscriber to PACER (PublicAccess to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. (see attached pdf for complete information) Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/29/2011.(GCP)
September 28, 2011 Filing 132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rebecca R Mendenhall. (GCP)
September 28, 2011 Filing 131 MOTION to Allow Eletronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney and Supporting Information by Rebecca R Mendenhall. (GCP)
September 21, 2011 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint if Necessary filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: #128 Defendant Rebecca Mendenhall's Request to Place on Hold Plaintiffs Request for Notice of Deposition is DENIED without prejudice to refiling, if necessary, after following paragraph 6(a) of the 06/06/11 Scheduling Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall forward a PDF copy of this order to beckmendenhall@gmail.com as soon as possible after receiving it. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/15/11. (NKS)
September 14, 2011 Filing 128 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Request for Notice of Deposition by Rebecca R Mendenhall. (LSP)
September 12, 2011 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Rebecca R Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-J). (LSP)
July 22, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE re Plaintiff's Notice of Lift Stay in Defendant Mendenhall's Bankruptcy Proceeding by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
July 19, 2011 Filing 125 TEXT ONLY ORDER: #124 Defendant Beck Locey's Motion to Review #119 Order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court's July 5, 2011 #119 Order is AMENDED as follows: the phrase "Locey's answer does establish" (p. 4, line 14) is changed to "Locey's answer does not establish." This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 18, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION to review order re #119 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Beck Locey. (DMT)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: The #120 Joint Request for Settlement Conference is DENIED without prejudice to a new request that either (a) includes Rebecca Mendenhall or (b) specifically explains why the Court should order mediation that will not resolve the entire case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/18/11. (NKS)
July 11, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE re Second Supplemental Disclosure by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
July 8, 2011 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of defendant's answer to plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Timothy R Forstrom (DMT)
July 7, 2011 Filing 120 JOINT MOTION for Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) *Modified on 7/8/2011 from request*(DMT).
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #97 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleading; GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's claim of breach of guaranty against Beck Locey, and DENIED in all other respects. Granting without prejudice #106 Defendant Michelle Locey's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/5/11.(DMT)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: #117 Plaintiff's Request for Settlement Conference is DENIED. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/29/11. (NKS)
June 24, 2011 Filing 117 *MOTION (Request) for Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) *Modified on 6/27/2011 from request*(DMT).
June 24, 2011 Filing 116 ERRATA Notice of Errata by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
June 24, 2011 Filing 115 REQUEST re: Plaintiff's Request for Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/28/2011. Dispositive motions due by 11/18/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2011. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/6/11. (NKS)
June 3, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Beck Locey. (DMT)
June 3, 2011 Filing 112 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Scheduling Conference held on 6/3/2011. Appearances: Laura Brooks for Plaintiff; Pro Se Defendants Timothy Forstrom and Beck Locey (both telephonically). Discussion is held. Scheduling Order outlining the deadlines in this case to follow. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
May 27, 2011 Filing 111 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Avant-Garde LLC. (Tellier, John)
May 26, 2011 Filing 110 TEXT ONLY ORDER: On the Court's own motion, ORDERED resetting the Scheduling Conference from 06/03/11 at 11:30 AM to 06/03/11 at 4:00 PM (same date/later time) in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
May 19, 2011 Filing 109 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Timothy R Forstrom.(LSP)
May 17, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE re Plaintiff's Notice of First Supplemental Disclosure by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
May 17, 2011 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) Against Defendants Beck Locey and Michelle Locey filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
May 16, 2011 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michelle Locey. (DMT)
May 16, 2011 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of serving Initial Disclosures by Timothy R Forstrom (DMT)
May 16, 2011 Filing 104 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) Against Defendants Beck Locey and Michelle Locey filed by Beck Locey, Michelle Locey. (DMT)
May 12, 2011 Filing 103 REPLY Memorandum to Response to Motion re #95 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Timothy R Forstrom. (DMT)
May 12, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE re Initial Disclosure by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #95 Defendant Timothy Forstrom's Motion to Set Aside Judgment; that the default judgment against Timothy Forstrom (Doc. 94) is VACATED. Forstrom shall answer Plaintiff's complaint within 14 days of the filing of this order. Denying #99 Motion to Continue Discovery Deadlines and Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/10/11.(DMT)
May 9, 2011 Filing 101 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Timothy R Forstrom.(DMT)
May 5, 2011 Filing 99 MOTION to Continue Discovery Deadlines and Scheduling Conference by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Titus, Jon)
May 3, 2011 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re #95 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
April 29, 2011 Filing 97 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) Against Defendants Beck Locey and Michelle Locey by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
April 25, 2011 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Support of #95 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment by Defendant Timothy R Forstrom. (DMT)
April 25, 2011 Filing 95 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment by Timothy R Forstrom. (DMT)
April 15, 2011 Filing 94 VACATED by (Doc. 100) - DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Avant-Garde LLC against Timothy R Forstrom for the following: Judgment in the principal amount of $1,700,000; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $500,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from April 1, 2006 until the date of Judgment; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $200,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from October 1, 2007 until the date of Judgment; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $1,000,000 at the rate of 24% per annum in accordance with the Promissory Note, from February 14, 2008 until the date of Judgment; and Post-Judgment Interest awarded on the principal amount of $1,700,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from the date of Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/15/11. (DMT) Modified on 5/10/2011 (DMT).
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #91 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. ORDERED Withdrawing Attorney Jeffrey S Leonard as Counsel for Defendants' Beck Locey and Michelle Locey FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court to update the address and telephone number of Defendants' Beck Locey and Michelle Locey. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/14/11.(MAP)
April 14, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timothy R. Forstrom by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R. Schweikert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment Against Defendant Timothy R. Forstrom)(Titus, Jon)
April 14, 2011 Filing 91 EX PARTE MOTION Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, With Consent by Beck Locey, Unknown Locey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record with Consent)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2011 Filing 90 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Timothy R Forstrom (DMT)
April 13, 2011 Filing 89 ERRATA re #87 Notice (Other), #88 Application for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
April 13, 2011 Filing 88 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC against Timothy R. Forstrom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Titus, Jon)
April 13, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE re Change by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Plaintiff show cause by 04/27/11 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Timothy R. Forstrom ONLY, unless a responsive pleading or an application for entry of default has been filed by that date. FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action after 04/27/11 as to Timothy R. Forstrom ONLY, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 04/13/11. (NKS)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ISSUED: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. The parties are ordered to provide initial disclosures at least 21 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference in the form required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1). See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 03/14/11. (NKS)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: The Forstroms' #76 Motion to Dismiss Rule 12(b)2 is GRANTED as to Defendant Jane Doe Forstrom (Michelle Forstrom) and DENIED as to Defendant Timothy Forstrom. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 03/10/11. (NKS)
February 3, 2011 Filing 83 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Avant-Garde LLC against Aaron T Rennert, Unknown Rennert for the principal amount of $1,700,000; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $500,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from April 1, 2006 until the date of Judgment; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $200,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from October 1, 2007 until the date of Judgment; Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $1,000,000 at the rate of 24% per annum in accordance with the Promissory Note, from February 14, 2008 until the date of Judgment; and Post-Judgment Interest awarded on the principal amount of $1,700,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from the date of Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/3/11. (DMT)
February 2, 2011 Filing 82 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Aaron T. Rennert and Jane Doe Rennert by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R. Schweikert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment)(Titus, Jon)
January 31, 2011 Filing 81 NOTICE re Notice of Errata by Avant-Garde LLC re #80 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Titus, Jon)
January 31, 2011 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
January 19, 2011 Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the Defendant's #78 Stipulated Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, ORDERED granting the aforementioned Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Donald L. Myles, Jr. and Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C. shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant Nolen Mendenhall. Defendant Nolen Mendenhall shall continued to be represented by Glenn C. Hanni and the Law Firm of Strong & Hanni, PC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 18, 2011 Filing 78 STIPULATION Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
January 13, 2011 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support of #76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Timothy R Forstrom, Unknown Forstrom. (DMT)
January 13, 2011 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Timothy R Forstrom, Unknown Forstrom. (DMT)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/12/11.(DMT)
January 10, 2011 Filing 74 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aaron T Rennert, Unknown Rennert (DMT)
January 7, 2011 Filing 73 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC against Aaron T. Rennert and Jane Doe Rennert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Titus, Jon)
January 6, 2011 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jane Doe Forstrom on 12/23/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
January 6, 2011 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Timothy R. Forstrom on 12/23/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
January 4, 2011 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the pleadings filed by Nolen Mendenhall. (Hanni, Glenn)
January 3, 2011 Filing 68 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #67 Stipulation: THE COURT ORDERS that Defendant Nolen Mendenhall shall have leave to file a late reply brief in support of his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #62 within three (3) days after the date of this Order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
December 30, 2010 Filing 67 STIPULATION for Leave to File Late Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadnigs by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hanni, Glenn)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #66 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to Bloomfield Defendants Only. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to dismiss this action with prejudice as it pertains to Defendants Richard H. Bloomfield and Jane Doe Bloomfield, husband and wife, and Bloomfield CFO, PLLC only, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/29/10. (NKS)
December 29, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Avant-Garde LLC. Party Bloomfield CFO PLLC, Richard H Bloomfield and Unknown Bloomfield terminated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Titus, Jon)
December 17, 2010 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the pleadings filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
December 9, 2010 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jane Doe Rennert on December 2, 2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
December 9, 2010 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Aaron T. Rennert on December 2, 2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
November 30, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION for Judgment on the pleadings by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hanni, Glenn) Modified on 11/30/2010 (DMT). CORRECT event was used by counsel.
November 29, 2010 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint by Nolen Mendenhall.(Hanni, Glenn)
November 24, 2010 Filing 60 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Avant-Garde LLC against Mountain Spa Properties LLC as follows: A. Judgment in the principal amount of $1,700,000; B. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $500,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from April 1, 2006 until the date of Judgment; C. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $200,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from October 1, 2007 until the date of Judgment; D. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $1,000,000 at the rate of 24% per annum in accordance with the Promissory Note, from February 14, 2008 until the date of Judgment; and E. Post-Judgment Interest awarded on the principal amount of $1,700,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from the date of Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/24/10. (DMT)
November 24, 2010 Filing 59 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Avant-Garde LLC against Daniel Byer as follows: A. Judgment in the principal amount of $1,700,000; B. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $500,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from April 1, 2006 until the date of Judgment; C. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $200,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from October 1, 2007 until the date of Judgment; D. Pre-Judgment Interest awarded on the amount of $1,000,000 at the rate of 24% per annum in accordance with the Promissory Note, from February 14, 2008 until the date of Judgment; and E. Post-Judgment Interest awarded on the principal amount of $1,700,000 at the statutory rate of 10% per annum from the date of Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/24/10. (DMT)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that Defendant Nolen Mendenhall's #56 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Claim for Relief Breach of Guaranty is DENIED. This denial is without prejudice to a procedurally proper motion raising the same argument. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/16/10. (ESL)
November 12, 2010 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Beck Locey, Unknown Locey.(Leonard, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Seventh Claim Nolen Mendenhall's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Seventh Claim for Relief - Breach of Guaranty by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to serve Complaint. Plaintiff has to January 10, 2011, to serve its Complaint on Defendants' Aaron T. Rennert and Jane Doe Rennert, husband and wife, and Timothy R. Forstrom and Jane Doe Forstrom, husband and wife. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/10/10.(DMT)
November 9, 2010 Filing 54 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #53 MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Complaint Proposed Order Granting Extension by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
November 9, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Complaint by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Attempted Service on Defendants Rennert, #2 Exhibit Proof of Attempted Service on Defendants Forstrom)(Titus, Jon)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Defendant Nolen Mendenhall's second motion to dismiss, styled a "Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Seventh Claim for Relief Breach of Guaranty)" #51 , is DENIED. This denial is without prejudice to a procedurally proper motion raising the same argument. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/9/10. (DMT)
November 8, 2010 Filing 51 Reply Nolen Mendenhall's Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Seventh Claim for Relief - Breach of Guaranty) by Defendant Nolen Mendenhall. (Myles, Donald)
November 4, 2010 Filing 50 LODGED Proposed Default Judgment Against Defendant Daniel Byer re: #49 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Byer Amended. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
November 4, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Byer Amended by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R. Schweikert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Default Judgment)(Titus, Jon)
November 4, 2010 Filing 48 LODGED Proposed Default Judgment Against Mountain Spa Properties, LLC re: #47 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mountain Spa Properties, LLC Amended. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
November 4, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mountain Spa Properties, LLC Amended by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of James R. Schweikert, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Titus, Jon)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that Defendant Nolen Mendenhall's Motion to Dismiss #31 is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's first, second, third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims, and DENIED in all other respects. That Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint If Necessary #33 is DENIED without prejudice to a subsequent motion. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/2/10.(DMT)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, Defendant Nolen Mendenhall may, if desired, file a Surreply to Plaintiff's alternative #33 MOTION to Amend by 11/8/10. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/25/10. (REW)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying without prejudice #39 Motion for Default Judgment against Mountain Spa and #41 Motion for Default Judgment D. Byer. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/10.(DMT)
October 18, 2010 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [proposed] Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to [proposed] Amended Complaint)(Titus, Jon)
October 13, 2010 Filing 42 LODGED Proposed Default Judgment Against Defendant Daniel Byer re: #41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Byer. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
October 13, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Daniel Byer by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment)(Titus, Jon)
October 13, 2010 Filing 40 LODGED Proposed Default Judgment Against Defendant Mountain Spa Properties, LLC re: #39 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mountain Spa Properties, LLC. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
October 13, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mountain Spa Properties, LLC by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Default Judgment)(Titus, Jon)
October 7, 2010 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Myles, Donald)
October 7, 2010 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Myles, Donald) Modified on 10/8/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT linkage corrected.
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #34 Defendant N. Mendenhall's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/6/10.(DMT)
October 6, 2010 Filing 35 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT re #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nolen Mendenhall. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Myles, Donald) Modified on 10/6/2010 (LSP). CORRECTION to "Lodged Proposed Document".
October 6, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Nolen Mendenhall's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
September 27, 2010 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint if Necessary filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 9/28/2010 (DMT).DOCUMENT now lists motion as correct event.
September 13, 2010 Filing 32 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 10, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 7, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Glenn C Hanni on behalf of Nolen Mendenhall. (BAS)
September 7, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX10997 as to Glenn C Hanni. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Nolen Mendenhall answer due 9/10/2010. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/3/10. (DMT)
August 31, 2010 Filing 27 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Neil V. Wake. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 10-1499-PHX-NVW. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearings scheduled for September 27, 2010, are hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 31, 2010 Filing 26 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 30, 2010 Filing 25 AMENDED Ordered that Nolen Mendenhall show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Mary H Murguia. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2010 04:00 PM before Judge Mary H Murguia. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
August 30, 2010 Filing 24 AMENDED Ordered that Rebecca R Mendenhall show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Mary H Murguia. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2010 04:00 PM before Judge Mary H Murguia. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consetn Form)(MAP)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Ordered that Nolen Mendenhall show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Mary H Murguia. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Mary H Murguia. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Forms)(MAP)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Ordered that Rebecca R Mendenhall show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.8(a) before Judge Mary H Murguia. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2010 04:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Mary H Murguia. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
August 26, 2010 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants Daniel Byer and Jane Doe Byer.(ESL)
August 26, 2010 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Mountain Spa Properties, LLC.(ESL)
August 25, 2010 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC against Daniel and Jane Doe Byer, husband and wife. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Titus, Jon)
August 25, 2010 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Avant-Garde LLC against Mountain Spa Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Default)(Titus, Jon)
August 16, 2010 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mountain Spa Properties, LLC on 07/22/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jane Doe Byer on 07/26/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Replacement Affidavit served on Daniel Byer on 07/26/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Beck Locey on 07/22/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jane Doe Locey on 07/22/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nolan Mendenhall on 07/22/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 16, 2010 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rebecca R. Mendenhall on 07/22/2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon) Modified on 8/16/2010 (DMT). DOCUMENT does not contain case caption.
August 13, 2010 Filing 10 ERRATA re #9 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint by Defendant Nolen Mendenhall. (Myles, Donald)
August 13, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Nolen Mendenhall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
August 12, 2010 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rebecca R Mendenhall.(DMT)
August 3, 2010 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Daniel Byer on July 26, 2010, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
July 23, 2010 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 16, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Richard H Bloomfield, Unknown Bloomfield, Bloomfield CFO PLLC, Daniel Byer, Unknown Byer, Timothy R Forstrom, Unknown Forstrom, Beck Locey, Unknown Locey, Nolen Mendenhall, Rebecca R Mendenhall, Mountain Spa Properties LLC, Aaron T Rennert, Unknown Rennert. (Attachments: #1 Beck Locey, #2 Bloomfield CFO PLLC, #3 Daniel Byer, #4 Mountain Spa Properties LLC, #5 Nolen Mendenhall, #6 Rebecca Mendenhall, #7 Richard H Bloomfield, #8 Timothy R Forstrom, #9 Unknown Bloomfield, #10 Unknown Byer, #11 Unknown Forstrom, #12 Unknown Locey, #13 Unknown Rennert)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2010 Filing 4 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(BAS)
July 15, 2010 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Edward C. Voss. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 10-1499-PHX-ECV. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avant-Garde LLC. (Titus, Jon)
July 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-4126740, filed by Avant-Garde LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Richard H Bloomfield, #4 Summons Jane Doe Bloomfield, #5 Summons Bloomfield CFO, PLLC, #6 Summons Rebecca R Mendenhall, #7 Summons Nolen Mendenhall, #8 Summons Daniel Byer, #9 Summons Jane Doe Byer, #10 Summons Aaron T Rennert, #11 Summons Jane Doe Rennert, #12 Summons Timothy R Forstrom, #13 Summons Jane Doe Forstrom, #14 Summons Beck Locey, #15 Summons Jane Doe Locey, #16 Summons Mountain Spa Properties, LLC)(Titus, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avant-Garde LLC v. Mountain Spa Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R Forstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Forstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca R Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolen Mendenhall
Represented By: Donald L Myles, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn C Hanni,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Locey
Represented By: Jeffrey S Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomfield CFO PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beck Locey
Represented By: Jeffrey S Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Spa Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Locey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron T Rennert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Forstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avant-Garde LLC
Represented By: John R Tellier
Represented By: David Albrecht Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jon A Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?