Cestro v. Dovenmuele Mortgage, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Lida Cestro |
Defendant: |
GMAC Mortgage LLC, LNV Corporation, MGC Mortgage Incorporated, Executive Trustee Services LLC, Lender Services Direct Incorporated, Dovenmuele Mortgage Incorporated and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01507 |
Filed: |
July 16, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
Maricopa |
Presiding Judge: |
Neil V Wake |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 16, 2011 |
Filing
59
ORDER that the First Amended Complaint as to Defendant Lender Services Direct, Inc., is dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 58 LNV Corp.'s Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that 10 Stipulated Order Enjoining Trustee's Sale of Real Property is vacated. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant LNV Corporation and against Plaintiff and that Plaintiff take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/16/11.(LSP)
|
August 1, 2011 |
Filing
57
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant LNV Corporation's Motion toDismiss First Amended Complaint With Prejudice (Doc. 38) is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause by August 15, 2011, whyher First Amended Complaint as t o Lender Services Direct, Inc., not be dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. If Plaintiff does not respond to this Order by August 15, 2011, the First Amended Complaint as to Lender Services Direct, Inc., will be dismissed and the case terminated without further notice. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/1/11.(LAD)
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant LNV Corporation's 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted to the extent it seeks dismissal of Dft LNV Corporation with respect to Counts I and II of Pla's complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla is given leave to amend her complaint by 12/13/2010. If no amended complaint is filed by 12/13/2010, the Clerk shall enter jgm dismissing this action with prejudice as to Dft LNV Corp. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/9/10. (SAT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?