Grundy et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Elvin G Grundy, Jr. and Willie Ruth Grundy
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Aames Funding Corporation, John Vella, Unknown Parties, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Cassieopeia Saicawalo
Case Number: 2:2010cv01542
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Chase's 61 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/24/2012.(LFIG)
May 4, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Quality Loan Service Corporation's 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying Quality Loan Service Corporation's 34 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; the Court will set a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/4/11.(REW)
January 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file the status report required by this order on or before 2/18/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/24/2011.(NVO)
October 15, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plas' 13 Motion for leave to amend is granted. Dft's 8 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Plas shall file a status report by 10/25/2010. Plas shall address whether their claims in this case can be adjudicated in bankruptcy court, permitting dismissal of this action. Dft's second motion to dismiss (Doc. 20 ) is stayed pending Pla's status report. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/15/10. (SAT)
August 16, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/16/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grundy et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin G Grundy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Ruth Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aames Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassieopeia Saicawalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?