Breeser, et al. v. Menta Group Incorporated NFP, et al.

Plaintiff: Laura Breeser and John Charles Breeser, Jr.
Defendant: Rory Conran, Menta Group Incorporated NFP, Special Education Services, Southwest Education Center, Unknown Parties, Kathryn Carwell, William Andrew Hubble, Elizabeth Ann Conran, Kenneth Carwell and Kim Hubble
Case Number: 2:2010cv01592
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/24/2013.(TLB)
March 21, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 74 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The two remaining claims from Plaintiffs' 20 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' wrongful termination and defamation claims, are summarily dismissed. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs, with Plaintiffs to take nothing. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/21/2013.(LFIG)
April 18, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting the Motion with regard to Counts Two, Three, Four, Six, Seven, and the Claim for Holding Up to a False Light, denying the Motion with regard to Count One and the Defamation Claim found in Count Five. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/18/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeser, et al. v. Menta Group Incorporated NFP, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Conran
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menta Group Incorporated NFP
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Education Services
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Education Center
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Carwell
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Andrew Hubble
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ann Conran
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Carwell
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hubble
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Breeser
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Charles Breeser, Jr.
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?