Jones-Rankins v. Cardinal Health Incorporated
Plaintiff: Weltha J Jones-Rankins
Defendant: Cardinal Health Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv01626
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2014 Filing 111 MANDATE of USCA dismissing the appeal re: 14-15558 as to #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit). (Attachments: #1 NDA). (LSP)
September 5, 2014 Filing 110 MANDATE of USCA, this appeal is dismissed for failure to pay the docketing/filing fees, re: 14-16492 #107 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 NDA) (Copies sent by Ninth Circuit)(ALS). Modified on 10/6/2014 (LSP).
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER of USCA, within 21 days, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; if appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute, re: 14-16492 #107 Notice of Appeal. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW)
August 4, 2014 Filing 108 USCA Case Number re: #107 Notice of Appeal. Case number 14-16492, Ninth Circuit. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW)
July 9, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #106 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) (6 pages) Modified on 7/25/2014 (ALS). Modified on 8/4/2014 (opened as new appeal by Ninth Circuit on 8/4/14) (REW).
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 * ORDER - This case is closed. We will not entertain any additional filings. IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's #105 Motion for Reconsideration. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/9/14. (LAD) * Modified to add additional text on 6/10/2014 (LAD).
June 4, 2014 Filing 105 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LSP)
April 21, 2014 Filing 104 MANDATE of USCA, the decision of the district court is affirmed, as to 9CCA #12-15143, re: #87 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 NDA) (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit.)(KMG)
April 1, 2014 Filing 103 USCA Appeal Fees received re: 14-15558 #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. Filing Fee $ 505, receipt number PHX144623. (REW)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER of USCA that within 21 day from the date of this order, appellant shall (1) file a motion with this court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees and provide proof of payment; or (3) otherwise show good cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute re: #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) (Distributed by the Ninth Circuit)
March 25, 2014 Filing 101 USCA Case Number re: #100 Notice of Appeal. Case number 14-15558, Ninth Circuit of Appeals. (LAD) (Distributed by the Ninth Circuit)
March 24, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #99 Order by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying the Motion under Rule 62.1(a)(2), Fed. R. Civ. P. #96 . (See attached PDF for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/24/14.(JAMA)
February 24, 2014 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #96 MOTION to Vacate #81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Leave to File, #82 Clerks Judgment filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) (10 pages)
February 10, 2014 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #96 MOTION to Vacate #81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Leave to File, #82 Clerks Judgment filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Lebowitz, Todd)
January 24, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION to Vacate #81 Order, #82 Clerks Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) (Entitled "Motion to Vacate Summary Judgement and Decision and Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure (60)(B) and 28 U.S.C. Section 455;" 51 pages)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying #94 the Motion to Disqualify Judge for lack of jurisdiction. (See attached PDF for details). Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/23/13.(JAMA)
November 27, 2013 Filing 94 MOTION for Retroactive Disqualification of Judge Frederick J. Martone by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) (49 pages)
May 1, 2012 Filing 93 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PHX121554 re #87 Notice of Appeal filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins (LAD)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER of USCA, within 21 days, appellant shall pay $455.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and file proof of payment with this court; failure to pay the fees will result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute; if appellant pays the fees, the remaining briefing schedule is reset, re: 12-15143 #87 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
January 23, 2012 Filing 91 US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-15143 for #87 Notice of Appeal. (TLJ)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #88 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/20/12.(REW)
January 20, 2012 Filing 89 Taxation Judgment in amount of $ 1,875.42 against plaintiff. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 01/20/2012. (BJWI)
January 20, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION (APPLICATION) to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs re #87 Notice of Appeal by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
January 20, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #84 Order, #81 Order, #82 Clerk's Judgment, by Weltha J Jones-Rankins.(LAD)
December 29, 2011 Filing 86 AFFIDAVIT/SUPPORTING DOCUMENT to BILL OF COSTS Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc's Itemization of Expenses in Support of its Bill of Costs re #85 by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
December 29, 2011 Filing 85 BILL OF COSTS by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying #83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/28/2011.(KAR)
December 27, 2011 Filing 83 MOTION for Reconsideration re #81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
December 16, 2011 Filing 82 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed December 16, 2011, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed. (LAD)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING plaintiff's motion for extension of time to fileresponse (doc. 57) nunc pro tunc. IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion to amend her opposition to the motion for summary judgment, admit a CD-ROM of evidence, amend her statement of controverting facts, file a separate statement of facts, amend her exhibit list, and file a surreply to defendant's reply (doc. 78). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendant's motion for summary judgment (doc. 52). The Clerk shall enter judgment. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/15/11.(LAD)
December 15, 2011 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #78 MOTION for Leave to (1) Amend Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Leave to Admit CD-ROM Evidence Produced in Discovery; (3) to Amend the Statement of Controverted Facts; (4) file a Separate Statement of Facts; (5) Amend Plaintiff's Exhibit List; (6) leave to file Sur-Reply to Defendant Cardinal Health Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
December 2, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION for Leave to File filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
November 28, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to (1) Amend Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Leave to Admit CD-ROM Evidence Produced in Discovery; (3) to Amend the Statement of Controverted Facts; (4) file a Separate Statement of Facts; (5) Amend Plaintiff's Exhibit List; (6) leave to file Sur-Reply to Defendant Cardinal Health Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 22, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE re Substitution of Declarations for Brian Worth and Valerie Pitteroff by Cardinal Health Incorporated re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Shields, James)
November 22, 2011 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
November 7, 2011 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibits X and Y) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AB) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AC) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD) Modified on 11/8/2011 (LAD).
November 7, 2011 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AE) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AF) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Welta J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AG) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AI) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AH) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AN) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AO) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AP) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AQ) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AR) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AS) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AZ) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Weltha J. Jones-Rankins (re Exhibit AAA) by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 59 STATEMENT of Controverted Facts from Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Statement of Facts in Support of #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Entitled "Motion in Opposition to Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment") (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LAD)
November 7, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response (Opposition) as to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying plaintiff's #55 motion for extension of time because she already has the time requested within which to respond. Plaintiff is encouraged to review the motions timing chart available at LRCiv Appendix A. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/03/11. (ESL)
November 3, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (TLJ)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #53 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/14/11.(DMT)
October 12, 2011 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response (Opposition) as to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
September 30, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit to Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #3 SSOF to MSJ, #4 Exhibit A to SSOF, #5 Exhibit B to SSOF, #6 Exhibit C to SSOF)(Shields, James)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - Therefore, IT IS ORDERED DENYING defendant's motion for a protective order (doc. 44). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING plaintiff's motion to compel (doc. 48). IT IS ORDERED that defendant produce all responsive documents within three (3) days of this order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/15/11.(LAD)
August 24, 2011 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Compel Defendants, #47 MOTION to Compel Defendant filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The court has before it plaintiff's Motion to Extend deadlines in the Rule 16 Order (Doc.43). Although no response has been received, plaintiff states that defendant opposes the motion. The motion fails to articulate any good cause to upset the Rule 16 Order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED DENYING the Motion to Extend. (Doc. 43). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/19/2011.(KMG)
August 19, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Certification of Good Faith to Confer With Opposing Counsel by Weltha J Jones-Rankins re #48 MOTION to Compel Defendants. (KMG)
August 19, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with Plaintiff's Entire Request for Interrogatories, Admissions and Request for Production pursuant to FRCP 26(a) by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (KMG)
August 19, 2011 Filing 47 *MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities re MOTION #48 to Compel Defendant to Comply with Plaintiff's Entire Request for Interrogatories, Admissions and Request for Production pursuant to FRCP 26(a) by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (KMG) *Modified on 8/22/2011 to correct event.* To Add document relationship.* (KMG).
August 18, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Deposition of Weltha Jones-Rankins, filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
August 17, 2011 Filing 44 *MOTION for Protective Order by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rule 7.2(J) statement, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Protective Order)(Shields, James) *Modified to reflect document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) on 8/17/2011 (TLJ).*
July 29, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Extend Time for Discovery and Final Supplement of All Discovery by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
July 29, 2011 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's 4/22/11 #32 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
July 29, 2011 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENT of to disclosures pursuant to Court's 4-22-2011 scheduling order by Defendant Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
July 15, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE re Service of Subpoenas by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #38 Motion to Reconsider Allowing Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/17/2011.(KAR)
May 13, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION to Reconsider Electronic Filing re #7 Order by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (TLJ)
May 6, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE (Certificate of Service) re Initial Disclosures by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (KMG)
May 6, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE re disclosure by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 4, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Todd H Lebowitz on behalf of Cardinal Health Incorporated. (BAS)
May 4, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX109314 as to Todd H Lebowitz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 3, 2011 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cardinal Health Incorporated.(Shields, James)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2011. Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/22/2011. (KAR)
April 22, 2011 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederick J Martone: Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2011. Appearances by telephone: Weltha Jones-Rankins, plaintiff; and James Shields II and Gilbert Brosky, counsel for defendant. Case management plan as set forth on the record. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAR)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 21, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX108820 as to Gilbert P Brosky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 20, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gilbert P Brosky pn behalf of Cardinal Health Incorporated. (BAS)
April 15, 2011 Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cardinal Health Incorporated, Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (Shields, James)
April 13, 2011 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cardinal Health Incorporated served on 4/11/2011. (LAD)
April 12, 2011 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cardinal Health Incorporated served on 4/12/2011. (LAD)
April 12, 2011 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James)
April 8, 2011 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health Incorporated c/o Corporate Services-Statutory Agent and as to Cardinal Health Incorporated Attn: George S. Barrett/Chairman and handed to plaintiff over the counter on 4/8/11. (MHU). *** This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying defendant's #14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 04/04/11.(ESL)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff has had to and including February 25, 2011 to file a response, and the response has been filed. We again urge plaintiff to seek the advice of counsel. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/22/11.(LAD)
March 21, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Cardinal Health Incorporated. (KAR)
March 3, 2011 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shields, James)
February 24, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service by Weltha J Jones-Rankins of #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File, #18 Response in Opposition to Motion. (LAD)
February 24, 2011 Filing 18 RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
February 24, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Dft's Motion to Dismiss by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (LAD)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than five days before the conference. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/10/2011. (KAR)
February 2, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE re Service of motion to dismiss via U.S. Mail by Cardinal Health Incorporated re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (Shields, James)
February 2, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Shields, James) Modified on 2/3/2011 (TLJ). DOCUMENT not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to the #12 Stipulation of the parties, defendant Cardinal Health Incorporated shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action no later than 02/02/11. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 01/03/11. (ESL)
January 3, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Cardinal Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Shields, James)
January 3, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Burr Shields, II on behalf of Cardinal Health Incorporated (Shields, James)
December 8, 2010 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health Incorporated. SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF OVER THE COUNTER. NO PDF ATTACHED. (MHA)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/3/10.(REW)
December 2, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Process by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (REW)
August 16, 2010 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX100233 (LAD)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the entry of this order to pay the filing fee of $350.00. The clerk of court is directed to dismiss this action if the filing fee is not paid within 10 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/4/10.(TLJ)
August 2, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (TLJ)
August 2, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Weltha J Jones-Rankins. (TLJ)
August 2, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE re Civil Cover Sheet by Weltha J Jones-Rankins re #1 Complaint. (HLA)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE re Magistrate Consent Form. (HLA)
August 2, 2010 Filing 2 This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Frederick J. Martone. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CIV-10-1626-PHX-FJM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HLA)
August 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Weltha J Jones-Rankins.(HLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones-Rankins v. Cardinal Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Incorporated
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Represented By: Todd H Lebowitz
Represented By: Gilbert P Brosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weltha J Jones-Rankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?