Smith v. Barrow Neurological Institute et al

Plaintiff: Leanna Smith
Defendant: Barrow Neurological Institute, Banner Health Systems, Arizona, State of, Arizona Department of Economic Security, Child Protective Services, Charles Alfano, Unknown Alfano, Harold Rekate, Unknown Recate, Scott Elton, Unknown Elton, Laura Pederson, Unknown Pederson, Tammy Hamilton-Macalpine, Unknown Hamilton-Macalpine, Bonnie Brown, Unknown Brown, Marysol Ruiz, Unknown Ruiz and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv01632
Filed: August 2, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 339 Motion for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Costs in the amount of $50,402.50. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/13/2013.(LFIG)
May 29, 2013 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 346 Motion to Stay. ORDERED granting defendants' 338 Application for Attorneys' Fees in the amount of $15,154.00 against Keith Knowlton and Keith M. Knowlton LLC, jointly and severally. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that defendants are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $16,139.50, $11,540.00, and $5,908.50 for a total amount of $33,588.00 against plaintiff, Keith Knowlton, and Keith M. Knowlton LLC, jointly and severally. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/28/2013.(LFIG)
February 12, 2013 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 250 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of all defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/11/13.(MAP)
January 18, 2013 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 302 Sealed Motion. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/17/13.(LAD)
January 16, 2013 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 323 Plaintiff's Motion to File her Reply Under Seal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/14/13. (MAP)
October 31, 2012 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 287 Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/31/12. (MAP)
October 10, 2012 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Banner defendants' motion for Rule 54(b) certification (doc. 241 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/10/2012.(KMG)
September 21, 2012 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 175 defendants' motion to strike. Plaintiff's disclosure of 250 treating physicians and Dr. Mart's report are stricken. Plaintiff's disclosure of Dr. Newberger's report is not str icken. ORDER denying as moot 193 Banner defendants' motion to exclude and compel disclosures and discovery responses. ORDER denying 230 Banner's motion to transfer related case pursuant to LRCiv 42.1(a) and 244 plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/20/2012.(KAR)
September 20, 2012 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Banner Health System's 231 Motion to file Exhibit A to Motion to Transfer under seal, State Defendants' 236 Motion to file Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Facts under seal, Banner Health System and Scott Elton, M.D.'s 239 Motion to file Motion for Sanctions under seal, and Plaintiff's 245 Motion to file Exhibits to Response to Motion for Transfer of Related Case under seal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/19/12.(MAP)
August 24, 2012 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 182 motion to modify protective order and/or for authority to provide confidential records to law enforcement, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/24/2012.(LFIG)
July 31, 2012 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion for summary judgment (doc. 138). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/30/12. (LAD)
July 20, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Defendants' Motion for Time Enlargement and 179 Motion for Case Management Conference and 180 Supplement. See PDF for details.Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 07/19/12.(JAMA)
June 1, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/31/12.(MAP)
April 23, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/20/12. (MAP)
March 21, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendants' motion to require plaintiff to post bond (doc. 108 ). IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motions to file exhibits under seal (docs. 114 and 119 ). This case was reassigned to the undersigned on March 16, 2012. I t is already 18 months old. Judge Campbell's case management order is more than adequate to bring this case to a conclusion. (Doc. 104). There will be no extensions granted to the deadlines in the order. We invite early dispositive motions. All records of the juvenile proceeding shall be shared no later than March 31, 2012. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than April 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/21/2012.(KMG)
January 17, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 88 Motion to Strike ; denying 98 Motion to Strike. The Court will establish a litigation schedul by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/17/2012.(NVO)
May 4, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 49 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/4/2011.(NVO)
February 24, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ; denying 35 Motion to Strike ; denying 40 Motion to Strike ; denying 41 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/24/2011.(NVO)
December 1, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Banner Health Defendants' 5 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. CHW Defendants' 14 Motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 13 , 24 are granted. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint by 12/16/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/01/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Barrow Neurological Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Smith
Represented By: Keith M Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrow Neurological Institute
Represented By: Robin Elyce Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health Systems
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Economic Security
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Protective Services
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Alfano
Represented By: Robin Elyce Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Alfano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Rekate
Represented By: Robin Elyce Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Recate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Elton
Represented By: Sara Jane Agne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Elton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Pederson
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pederson
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Hamilton-Macalpine
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hamilton-Macalpine
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Brown
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marysol Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?