Revit v. First Advantage Tax Consulting Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Debra Kane Revit
Defendant: First Advantage Tax Consulting Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01653
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/12/2012.(NVO)
November 7, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery conference call. Depositions of Ms. Henricks, Ms. Tesst, Ms. Boan, Ms. Jones may be re-opened. Depositions to be completed on or before 12/2/2011. Depositions may be completed by video conference or telephone call. Depositions may last up to 2 hours each. Attorneys' fees awarded. Defendant's motion for summary judgment 100 denied without prejudice. Defendant shall re-file motion for summary judgment on 12/9/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/7/2011.(NVO)
April 6, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline as to 29 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file the proposed amended complaint on or before 4/15/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2011.(NVO)
October 25, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 9) is denied. Plaintiff's request for oral argument (Doc. 13) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revit v. First Advantage Tax Consulting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage Tax Consulting Services LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Lehet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kane Revit
Represented By: David Charles Kresin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?