Fifer v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Richard Theodore Fifer
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Michael McCraw, Unknown Friedman and Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 2:2010cv01727
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to McCraw's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 25) and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 28), and Dr. Friedman and Maricopa Countys Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 26).(2) McCraw&# 039;s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 25) and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss(Doc. 28), and Friedman and Maricopa County's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 26) are granted; Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice.(3) The Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal accordingly. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/7/11.(LAD)
April 21, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 16 ) is ACCEPTED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/20/11. (SAT)
December 10, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of Court must change the docket to replace Dft "Maricopa County Board of Supervisors" with Dft "Maricopa County". Counts II and III are dismissed without prejudice. Dft City of Pho enix is dismissed without prejudice. Dfts McCraw, Friedman, and Maricopa County must answer Counts I and IV. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 7 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts McCraw, Friedman, and Maricopa County. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Dfts must answer the First Amended Complaint or otherwise respo nd by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/10/10. (SAT)
October 28, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Pla must file a completed and signed Certificate, using the Certificate form provided with this Order, certifying that Pla's signature on the Certificate shall serve as an original signa ture on his Amended Complaint for the purposes Rule 3.4(a) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Pla fails to file, within 30 days, a completed and signed Certificate on the form provided with t his Order, the Clerk of Court must strike Pla's Amended Complaint and enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Pla. The Clerk of Court must mail Pla a Certificate form. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/10. (KMG)
September 23, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Richard Theodore Fifer. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/22/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifer v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Theodore Fifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?