Tousignant v. Bergman et al

Plaintiff: Dean Thomas Tousignant
Defendant: Unknown Bergman
Case Number: 2:2010cv01804
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) and Motion to Strike (Doc. 22). Defendant's Motion to Strike (Doc. 22) is granted. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) is granted. The claims are dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/30/2011.(KMG)
November 10, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants Dennison and Unknown Others are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Bergman must answer the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 8), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Bergman. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/10/10. (DMT)
October 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order . If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. section 1915(g). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/5/10.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tousignant v. Bergman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Thomas Tousignant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?