Harmon v. RAR Enterprises Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: John Harmon
Defendant: Raul Ramirez, RAR Enterprises Incorporated, Unknown Ramirez and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv01813
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's motion for entry of judgment (doc. 88 ). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED granting judgment in favor of plaintiff and against RAR Enterprises Inc., dba Ramirez Brothers under count one for breach of contract and count thr ee for PACA award in the amount of $79,929.00 with interest at the rate of 0.41 percent per annum from August 1, 2009 until paid, plus the amount of $500. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DISMISSING count two (insufficient funds check) against RAR Enterprises Inc., dba Ramirez Brothers without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/22/2012.(KMG)
November 30, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion to strike (doc. 79). IT IS ORDERED GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART plaintiff's motion for summary judgment doc. 71 . IT IS ORDERED GRANTING summary judgment for plaintiff on count one, breach of contr act. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING summary judgment for plaintiff on count three, PACA award. IT IS ORDERED DENYING summary judgment for plaintiff on count two, insufficient funds check. IT IS ALSO ORDERED DENYING summary judgment for defendants Raul and Genoviva Ramirez on count two, insufficient funds check. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/30/2011.(KMG)
June 3, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING defendants' motion to dismiss or motion to change venue/transfer case (doc. 48). It is FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for default judgment (doc. 43). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/2/11.(KMG)
March 1, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - GRANTING plaintiff's Request to Vacate the Judgment Entered on December 16, 2010. (Doc. 35). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/1/11.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. RAR Enterprises Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Harmon
Represented By: Sterling R Threet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Ramirez
Represented By: William Pierce Sargeant, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAR Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: William Pierce Sargeant, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ramirez
Represented By: William Pierce Sargeant, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: William Pierce Sargeant, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?