Knight Transportation Incorporated et al v. Baldwin & Lyons Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Knight Truck & Trailer Sales LLC, Knight Refrigerated LLC, Knight Intermodal LLC, Squire Transportation Incorporated, Knight Brokerage LLC, Quad K Leasing Incorporated and Knight Transportation Incorporated
Defendant: Sagamore Insurance Company Incorporated, Baldwin & Lyons Incorporated, Protective Insurance Company, Unknown Parties and B&L Brokerage Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv01835
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE any and all claims with Plaintiffs and Defendants to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as moot Defendants' motion for Reconsideration. (Doc. 197 .) FURTHER ORDERED DENY ING as moot Plaintiffs and Defendants' motions for Partial Summary Judgment. (Docs. 208 , 206 .) FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as moot Defendants' motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion For Leave to File Motion to Exclude Testimony of Wayne Austin in Excess of Seventeen Pages. (Doc. 213 .) FURTHER ORDERED DENYING as moot Defendants' motion to Exclude Testimony of David Perry. (Doc. 214 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED VACATING the status hearing set for Monday, June 16, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/22/2014. (KMG)
January 27, 2014 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 169 B&L's motion for leave to file third-party complaint for contribution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING B&L's 171 motion for leave to file an amended answer that asserts a new statute of limitations affirmative defense. The Clerk of Court shall file B&L's lodged proposed amended answer. (Doc. 171-1.) Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/24/2014. (ALS)
December 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight Transportation Incorporated et al v. Baldwin & Lyons Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagamore Insurance Company Incorporated
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin & Lyons Incorporated
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Insurance Company
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&L Brokerage Services Incorporated
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Truck & Trailer Sales LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Refrigerated LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Intermodal LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Squire Transportation Incorporated
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Brokerage LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quad K Leasing Incorporated
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knight Transportation Incorporated
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?