Ho v. Griego et al

Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Defendant: Norm Carrier, Todd Thomas, Ben Griego and Timothy Dobson
Case Number: 2:2010cv01864
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's March 22, 2011 and March 24, 2011 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Docs. 19 and 21) are denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Plaintiff must not file any further documents in this closed case. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/29/11.(LAD)
March 10, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Prove SCC was Tampering with this Case is denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/10/11.(LFIG)
November 18, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action is dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with a Court Order, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/18/10.(TLJ)
October 20, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 7 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice; Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Completed Application is granted; Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Pla must eit her pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Pla fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Pla. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/20/10.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho v. Griego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norm Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?