United States of America v. Maricopa, County of et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Maricopa, County of, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2010cv01878
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Sheridan L. England appearing for United States of America. Attorney Michael Madison Walker terminated. (England, Sheridan)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the United States' 63 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), each party to bear their own costs and fees. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/01/11. (ESL)
August 1, 2011 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion re 63 MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Popolizio, Joseph)
August 1, 2011 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Case without prejudice by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aminfar, Amin)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed without prejudice within 60 days of the date of this Order unless prior to that date the United States of America files a motion to postpone dismissal of the case. The Clerk shall terminate this matter on August 2, 2011 unless the United States of America has filed a motion to postpone the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/11. (LSP)
June 3, 2011 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Avner Shapiro (telephonically) and Michael Walker for plaintiff. Joseph Popolizio for defendants Joseph Arpaio and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. Cynthia Estrella for defendant Maricopa County. Status Conference held on 6/3/2011. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
June 3, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Avner Michael Shapiro on behalf of United States of America (Shapiro, Avner)
June 2, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE re No Objection to Joint Motion to Remove Case to the Inactive Docket and Stay Proceedings by Maricopa, County of re 58 Joint MOTION to Stay and Remove Case to the Inactive Docket. (Irvine, Thomas)
June 2, 2011 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Stay and Remove Case to the Inactive Docket by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aminfar, Amin)
June 1, 2011 Filing 57 Minute Order: Status Conference set for 6/3/2011 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(ADG)
April 26, 2011 Filing 56 *REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Maricopa, County of. (Estrella, Cynthia) *Modified on 4/27/2011, deleted 40 and ]18], (LSP).*
April 26, 2011 Filing 55 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Reply to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re 54 Reply by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 2, 3, 4)(Popolizio, Joseph)
April 26, 2011 Filing 54 *Reply to Response to Motion re 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Popolizio, Joseph) *Modified on 4/27/2011, to Reply to Response to Motion and to add 40 , (LSP).
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER pursuant to 52 Stipulation: extending the deadline for Defendants to file a Reply in Support of 43 their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, to and including, April 26, 2011. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/24/11. (LSP)
February 24, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Maricopa, County of, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Popolizio, Joseph)
February 4, 2011 Filing 51 OBJECTION re 44 Statement, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin)
February 4, 2011 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to 43 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin) Modified on 2/7/2011 (LSP). CORRECTION to document linkage and event.
February 4, 2011 Filing 49 OBJECTION re 41 Statement, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin)
February 4, 2011 Filing 48 STATEMENT of Supplemental Facts re 47 Response to 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Avner Shapiro, # 2 Exhibit 69, # 3 Exhibit 70)(Aminfar, Amin) Modified on 2/7/2011 (LSP). CORRECTION to document linkage.
February 4, 2011 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to 40 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin) Modified on 2/7/2011 (LSP). CORRECTION to document linkage.
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER pursuant to 45 Stipulation: the United States shall be allowed through and including February 4, 2011, in which to file its combined Replies and Responses to Defendants respective Responses to the United States Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/10. (LSP)
December 21, 2010 Filing 45 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Responses and Respond to Defendants' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aminfar, Amin)
December 10, 2010 Filing 44 STATEMENT re 43 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment / Defendant's Controverting and Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Maricopa Count's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Estrella, Cynthia)
December 10, 2010 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment, CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendant Maricopa County's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment -and- Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Maricopa, County of. (Estrella, Cynthia) Modified on 12/13/2010 (SAT). CORRECTION: Motion event added to entry of this two-part document.
December 10, 2010 Filing 42 OBJECTION re 19 Statement,,,,, by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Popolizio, Joseph)
December 10, 2010 Filing 41 STATEMENT of of Facts in Support of their Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Index and Exhibits 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibits 6-8, # 4 Exhibits 9-18, # 5 Exhibits 19-22)(Popolizio, Joseph)
December 10, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment, CROSS-MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Popolizio, Joseph) Modified on 12/13/2010 (SAT). CORRECTION: Motion event added to entry of this two-part document.
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER pursuant to 38 Stipulation: the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 18) is extended to December 10, 2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/6/10. (LSP)
December 3, 2010 Filing 38 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Maricopa, County of, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Popolizio, Joseph)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Defendants are directed to file a Response on or before December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/10.(LSP)
November 1, 2010 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin)
October 29, 2010 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Popolizio, Joseph) Modified on 11/1/2010 (LSP). CORRECTION to "Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply".
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Counsel. ORDERED that William R. Jones, Jr., John T. Masterson, Joseph J. Popolizio and the law firm of Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C., be substituted as counsel of record for named Defendants Maricopa County Sheriffs Office and Joseph M. Arpaio in the place of Alec R. Hillbo, Kerry Scott Martin, Leigh Eric Dowell and the lawfirm of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/21/10. (MAP)
October 14, 2010 Filing 33 EX PARTE MOTION for Substitution of Counsel with Consent by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Substitution of Counsel)(Masterson, John)
October 6, 2010 Filing 32 ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of.(Irvine, Thomas)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue. Defendants shall locate new counsel and that new counsel shall file a notice of appearance no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/6/10.(LSP)
October 5, 2010 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue All Case Matters filed by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Dowell, Leigh)
September 28, 2010 Filing 29 ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office.(Martin, Kerry)
September 28, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 27 MOTION to Continue All Case Matters filed by United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin)
September 27, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION to Continue All Case Matters by Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dowell, Leigh)
September 17, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec R Hillbo on behalf of Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office (Hillbo, Alec)
September 17, 2010 Filing 25 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 10-1878-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 16, 2010 Filing 24 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER Defendants Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Joseph M. Arpaio shall file their written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Wednesday, September 28, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/16/10. (LSP)
September 15, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Scott Martin on behalf of Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office (Martin, Kerry)
September 13, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE re Service by United States of America re 17 Amended Complaint, 19 Statement,,,,, 20 Notice (Other), 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Aminfar, Amin)
September 13, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE re Filing of Motion to Transfer Case by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Filed Motion to Transfer Case, # 2 Filed Proposed Order For Motion to Transfer Case)(Aminfar, Amin)
September 13, 2010 Filing 19 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter S. Gray, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68)(Aminfar, Amin)
September 13, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States of America. (Aminfar, Amin)
September 13, 2010 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Aminfar, Amin)
September 13, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie Gelman on behalf of United States of America (Gelman, Laurie)
September 10, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 9/2/10 upon Maricopa County and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office - c/o Andrew W. Kunasek (LAD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 9/2/10 on Maricopa County and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office - c/o R. Fulton Brock, Member (LAD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Maricopa County and Maricopa County Sheriff's Office on 9/2/10 - c/o Donald T. Stapley Jr. (LAD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Maricopa County, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office on 9/2/10 - c/o Mary Rose Wilcox (LAD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph M Arpaio served on 9/2/2010. (LAD)
September 10, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maricopa County Sheriff's Office served on 9/2/2010; Maricopa, County of served on 9/2/2010 - c/o Max Wilson. (LAD)
September 9, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Madison Walker on behalf of United States of America (Walker, Michael)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER that Defendant Maricopa County, Arizona, shall file its written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Thursday, September 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/9/10. (LSP)
September 3, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Irvine on behalf of Maricopa, County of (Irvine, Thomas)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER - that Plaintiff shall file its written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Thursday, September 26, 2010. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their written electionto either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to have this case assigned to a United States district judge within 14 days of its appearance herein or as otherwise directed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/2/10. (KMG)
September 2, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa, County of (by serving the following individual Board of Supervisors Members: R. Fulton Brock, Andrew W. Kunasek, Donald T. Stapley, Jr., Mary Rose Wilcox, and Max W. Wilson). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 2, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Aminfar, Amin)
September 2, 2010 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lawrence O. Anderson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 10-1878-PHX-LOA. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
September 2, 2010 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by United States of America (submitted by Amin Aminfar). (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(REK)
September 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by United States of America (submitted by Amin Aminfar). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Maricopa, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amin Aminfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Cynthia Renee Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: William R Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: William R Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?