de Mol et al v. Grand Canyon Title Agency Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Robert G Turrill, II and M Theresa de Mol
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Grand Canyon Title Agency Incorporated, Phoenix Settlement Services LLC, Empire West Title Agency LLC, Biltmore Bank of Arizona, Lawyers Title of Arizona and Coppercrest Leveraged Mortgage Fund LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01895
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration 60 , motion for sanctions 61 , motion to vacate judgment 68 , and motion for new trial or to alter or amend judgment 74 are denied. Plaintiffs are advised that any further motions seeking post-judgment relief will be summarily denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/15/11.(TLJ)
January 27, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the motions to dismiss (Docs. 18,21,27,28) are granted. The amended complaint (Doc. 15) is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The alternative motion for more definite statement (Doc. 46) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' motion to amend (Doc. 53) is denied. Plaintiffs' motions to strike (Docs. 33,42) are denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/11.(TLJ)
December 29, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 36 motion for reconsideration or clarification is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/29/10. (ESL)
December 9, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion to correct falsified docket description and falsified notice of filing; denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/10.(TLJ)
October 25, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs shall have until 11/12/10 to file an amended complaint. Denying 3 the motion to enforce and strike provisions of the state court judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment if Plaintiffs fail to meet the 11/12/10 deadline for filing an amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Mol et al v. Grand Canyon Title Agency Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon Title Agency Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Settlement Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire West Title Agency LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biltmore Bank of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title of Arizona
Represented By: Brian James Cosper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coppercrest Leveraged Mortgage Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G Turrill, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Theresa de Mol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?