Gila River Indian Community v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Glendale, City of, Delvin John Terry, Celestino Rios, Brandon Rios, Damon Rios, Gila River Indian Community and Cameron Rios
Defendant: Andy Tobin, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States of America, United States Department of the Interior, Kirk Adams and Larry Echo Hawk
Intervenor: Russell Pearce and Lori Klein
Amicus: Janice K Brewer
Intervenor_plaintiff: Chuck Gray and John McComish
Intervenor_defendant: Tohono O'Odham Nation
Case Number: 2:2010cv01993
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 165 USCA Mandate, The Ninth Circuit has issued its mandate in this case, remanding this matter to the Department of the Interior for reconsideration in light of the Ninth Circuit's opinion. Doc. 165. The Court of Appeals has provided no guidance on the role of this Court with respect to the remand. This Court in other cases has entered an order remanding the matter to the federal agency and setting a date by which the agency shall complete its consideration on remand. The Court has required the new agency decision to be filed by the deadline, and has required the opposing party to indicate, within 30 days of the new decision being issued, whether it continues to contest the agency action, in which event a scheduling confer ence is held to address briefing with respect to alleged flaws in the new decision. On or before July 31, 2013 the parties shall file a joint memorandum setting forth their position on whether such an order should be entered in this case, and, if so, what time periods should be included, or whether the Court should take some other action in light of the Ninth Circuit's mandate. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2013. (KMG)
May 3, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/2011.(NVO)
March 23, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to transfer related case (Doc. 132, CV-10-1993) is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer Case No. CV-11-296-PHX-NVW to the undersigned Judge. A case management conference will be held by telephone on April 1, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. At least two days prior to the conference, the parties jointly shall file a memorandum setting forth a proposed litigation schedule for this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/11.(KMG)
March 3, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 94 Motion to Strike ; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/3/2011.(NVO)
February 14, 2011 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The State of Arizona's motion to intervene (Doc. 103 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged proposed complaint in intervention (Doc. 104 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/14/11. (SAT)
December 14, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The brief lodged at Doc. 83 shall become part of the record. Defendants may file a response to the amicus brief by January 14, 2011. Governor Brewer may file a reply by January 28, 2011. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/10.(LSP)
November 19, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to intervene (Doc. 52) is granted with respect to the Legislative Leaders and denied with respect to the Legislators. Senator Gray's motion to intervene (Doc. 54) is denied. The Legislative Leaders shall comply with the existing litigation schedule (Doc. 62) and coordinate with other Plaintiffs to avoid duplicate briefing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/19/10.(KMG)
November 4, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Mr. Bundgaard's motion to intervene (Doc. 40) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/10.(KMG)
October 28, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The motion to intervene (Doc. 24) is denied. Senator Pearce may, by November 16, 2010, file an amicus brief setting forth his views with respect to the Arizona statutory scheme regarding gaming, A.R.S. 5-601 et. seq. Defendants shall file a res ponse to the amicus brief by December 3, 2010. Senator Pearce may file a reply by December 17, 2010. The amicus brief and response shall not exceed 10 pages in length, and the reply shall not exceed 5 pages in length. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/28/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gila River Indian Community v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Tobin
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Represented By: Joseph Nathanael Watson
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Nathanael Watson
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Joseph Nathanael Watson
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Adams
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Echo Hawk
Represented By: Joseph Nathanael Watson
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glendale, City of
Represented By: Peter T Limperis
Represented By: Audrey E Moog
Represented By: Dominic F Perella
Represented By: Jose de Jesus Rivera
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: Craig Douglas Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delvin John Terry
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alongi
Represented By: Douglas A Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestino Rios
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alongi
Represented By: Douglas A Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Rios
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alongi
Represented By: Douglas A Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Rios
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alongi
Represented By: Douglas A Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: James P Tuite
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Represented By: Jason Travis Hauter
Represented By: Merrill C Godfrey
Represented By: Linus Everling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Rios
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alongi
Represented By: Douglas A Jorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Russell Pearce
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lori Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Kanefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Chuck Gray
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: John McComish
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Tohono O'Odham Nation
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Daughety
Represented By: Brian H Fletcher
Represented By: Jonathan Landis Jantzen
Represented By: Danielle Spinelli
Represented By: Seth P Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?