United States of America v. $50,800.00 in US Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $50,800.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Rodney Burnett-Johnson
Case Number: 2:2010cv02004
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (see attached pdf for complete information). ORDER that Plaintiff's request that Claimant's claim be stricken and a final order of forfeiture entered is DENIED without prejudice. ORDER that the parties' 10/21/11 stipulation 43 , is deemed a joint motion and is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/21/11.(TLJ)
July 8, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Joint 37 Motion to Reconsider Order of 06/16/11, doc. 37 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 07/08/11.(ESL)
June 16, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motion to extend the Rule 16 discovery deadline, doc. 35, is DENIED. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/16/11. (LAD)
February 16, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem; granting 25 Motion to Vacate the 2/16/11 Scheduling Conference and Vacating 4 Scheduling Order. Scheduling conference reset for 3/29/11 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/16/11. (see order for full details)(DMT) Modified on 2/16/2011 (DMT). CORRECTED to add additional text.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $50,800.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reid Charles Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,800.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rodney Burnett-Johnson
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?