Liberty Life Insurance Company v. Myers et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Anne R Myers, Erin Sarah Stoloff, Kirsten Anne Ruggiano, Erin Myers Trust dated 8/13/93, Kirsten Myers Trust Dated 8/13/93, Brooke Myers Wilson, Sean Edwin Lung, Joan L Myers, Eric L Myers and Donald D Myers
Counter_claimant: Eric L Myers
Counter_defendant: Liberty Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv02024
Filed: September 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Estate of Donald D. Myers, Erin Stoloff and Kirsten Ruggiano's Motions to Amend or Clarify Judgment 297 , 298 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall replace the CM/ECF Docket Entry Summary fo r the Judgment, Docket no. 294 , with "Judgment (see attached Judgment)." The Court's actual signed Judgment, entered as Doc. 294 , shall not be deleted, amended, or modified. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/15/2014.(ALS)
September 17, 2013 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 278 Motion for Leave to Provide an Itemized List. The Clerk of the Court shall file the lodged proposed itemized list 279 ; however, the Clerk of the Court need not take any further action on the list. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/13.(TLJ)
February 12, 2013 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 228 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in its entirety. Specifically, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff's fraud claim against Defendant Eric L. Myers, on Plaintiff' s unjust enrichment claim against Defendants Erin Sarah Stoloff and Kirsten Anne Ruggiano, and Plaintiff's conversion claim against Defendant Donald D. Myers. ORDER within 20 days Plaintiff shall file a status report of what claims, if any remain for trial and against which defendants (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/11/13.(TLJ)
February 11, 2013 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion Seeking Ruling. Specifically, the Court denies Defendant's request to deny Plaintiff the use of the account records and the Indemnity Agreement. The Court grants Defendant's request to deny Plaintiff the use of the Robert Comeau deposition. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/11/13. (LAD)
August 1, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 E. Myers' Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 E. Myers' Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss defendant E. Myers' Counterclaim. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/1/11.(DMT)
April 11, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 defendant Sean Lung's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/11/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Life Insurance Company v. Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne R Myers
Represented By: Richard M Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Sarah Stoloff
Represented By: Robert Barry Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Anne Ruggiano
Represented By: Robert Barry Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Myers Trust dated 8/13/93
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Myers Trust Dated 8/13/93
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Myers Wilson
Represented By: David B Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Edwin Lung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan L Myers
Represented By: David B Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald D Myers
Represented By: David B Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda V Damianakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Eric L Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Liberty Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda V Damianakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?