Carroll v. Maricopa County Sheriff et al

Plaintiff: Granville Lee Carroll
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff, Maricopa County Correctional Health Services and Lance Antonson
Case Number: 2:2010cv02032
Filed: September 22, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Gila
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint and this action are DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/9/11. (LAD)
August 30, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count I (Doc. 24). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count I is granted (Doc. 24). Count I and Defendants Dubbs and Herrera are dismissed without prejudice. The remaining claim is Count III against Jackson and A6203. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/29/2011.(KMG)
March 25, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and MOTION for Reconsideration. The Motion is granted to the extent that the Clerk must substitute Defendants Officer Dubbs and Officer Herrera for Defendants John Doe (Maricopa County Correctional Officer) and James Doe (Maricopa County Correctional Officer). Defendants Dubbs and Herrera must answer Count I of 11 First Amended Complaint. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including 11 Firs t Amended Complaint, the January 28, 2011 Order, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Dubbs and Herrera. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/25/11. (LSP)
January 28, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time; the Court will accept the First Amended Complaint as timely filed. Count II is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Maricopa County and Joe or Jane Doe (Medical Administrator) are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Jackson and Doe A6203 must answer Count III. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including 11 First Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Jacks on and Doe A6203. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/27/11. (LSP)
November 18, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Granville Carroll. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/17/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Maricopa County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Antonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granville Lee Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?