eMove Incorporated v. SMD Software Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: |
eMove Incorporated |
Defendant: |
SiteLink LLC, Markus Hecker and SMD Software Incorporated |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv02052 |
Filed: |
September 23, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
Maricopa |
Presiding Judge: |
Neil V Wake |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 11, 2012 |
Filing
210
ORDER The Motion 191 for Attorneys' Fees is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The defendants are awarded $836,079.15 in attorneys' fees and $97,716.41 in non-taxable costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 10/11/2012.(KMG)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing
168
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER In sum, I FIND that there is no genuine issue of material fact and GRANT the defendants' motion 70 for summary judgment as to the plaintiff's Lanham Act claims. The parties agree that common law unfair compet ition is congruent with false advertising under the Lanham Act. Consequently, I GRANT the defendants' motion for summary judgment as to the plaintiff's claim for common law unfair competition. I GRANT the plaintiff's Motion 157 for L eave to File First Supplemental Complaint. The court ORDERS that the plaintiff submit an amended supplemental complaint by April 24, 2012. In addition, the court ORDERS that the plaintiff is limited in its discovery to one two-hour deposition of Mr. Hecker, and the defendants are limited to one two-hour deposition of Ms. Fuery. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 4/20/2012. (Note: See Order for full details)(KMG)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
142
ORDER re 125 Memorandum - I FIND that the defendants have withdrawn any indication of consent within a sufficient time in advance of trial, and for that reason as well Rule 39(c)(2) does not apply. In conclusion, the plaintiff failed to properly demand a jury trial under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and absent a reason beyond mere inadvertence, the court does not have discretion to order a jury trial under Rule 39(b). The plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 3/6/2012. (KMG)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
134
ORDER re 125 I FIND that the defendants have withdrawn any indication of consent within a sufficient time in advance of trial, and for that reason as well Rule 39(c)(2) does not apply. In conclusion, the plaintiff failed to properly demand a jury trial under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and absent a reason beyond mere inadvertence, the court does not have discretion to order a jury trial under Rule 39(b). The plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 3/6/2012. (KMG)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 116 Amended Joint Stipulation to File Excerpts Under Seal. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 3/2/12. (MAP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?