Bobolas v. Unknown Parties

Plaintiff: George F Bobolas
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Intervenor: Public Citizen Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv02056
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/3/2011.(NVO)
January 28, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Intervene; finding as moot 18 Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2011.(NVO)
October 1, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Expedited Consideration FURTHER ORDERED granting 4 Motion to Seal. Clerk is directed to file the lodged declarations (Docs. 5, 6) under seal. FURTHER ORDERED denying 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; denying 8 Motion for Preservation of Documents. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/1/10. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobolas v. Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George F Bobolas
Represented By: Allison Leigh Kierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Public Citizen Incorporated
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?