Johnson v. Arizona, State of

Petitioner: Eugene Boyd Johnson
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv02096
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Motion for Reconsideration 34 . This case shall remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/10/12. (TLJ)
July 27, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/27/12. (LAD)
June 25, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. Petitioner's Amended Petition for the Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 10) is denied. 2. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 28) is accepted. 3. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). 4. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/25/12. (LAD)
February 14, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Second Amended Petition (Doc. 10) and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. This mat ter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/14/11. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Boyd Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?