Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Swissport Fueling Incorporated

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Swissport Fueling Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv02101
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 239 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 279 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 280 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. ORDER that the litigation is stayed for 60 days pending the parties' conciliation efforts. The parties are directed to file a status report within 5 days after the 60 day period has expired (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/7/13.(TLJ)
May 10, 2012 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 165 Motion for Protective Order FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part 184 Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Identify Claimants FURTHER ORDERED denying 198 Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave t o File Sur-Reply FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part 216 Motion to Compel Production FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part 217 Motion to Compel in Camera Inspection FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 224 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel FURTHER ORDERED granting 227 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Exhibit 1 to EEOC's Response 228 under seal. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/10/12.(MAP)
January 12, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 75 Motion to Limit Class is granted in part. Plaintiff is precluded from seeking to assert individual relief for aggrieved employees who were not identified to Defendants prior to June 28, 2011 absent a finding by the Court of "good cause" for Plaintiff's failure to identify the class member by 06/28/11 to the Defendant as a person on whose behalf Plaintiff was affirmatively seeking relief. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 01/12/12.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Swissport Fueling Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swissport Fueling Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Christopher Robert Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?