Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Salazar et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Maricopa Audubon Society
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar and Rowan Gould
Intervenor_plaintiff: San Carlos Apache Tribe of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv02130
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 113 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/15/2012.(NVO)
May 14, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT, Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors consistent with the Court's ruling on the parties' motions for summary judgment 88 ; the 60-day period for the parties to discuss fees and costs (Doc. 98) shall commence upon the filing of this Order and Judgment; the Court denies the requests of Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenors to require Defendants to produce an administrative record in advance of the filing of a new lawsuit; for purposes of judicial economy, any new lawsuit filed in this Court concerning treatment of the desert bald eagle under the Endangered Species Act shall be assigned to the undersigned judge. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/12. (REW)
January 11, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 92 Brief (Non Appeal), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Salt River Pima-Maricopa Indian Community, Maricopa Audubon Society. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/11/2012. (NVO)
November 30, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 71 Motion for Le ave to File; denying 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. the 12-month finding is remanded to FWS for reconsideration consistent with this order. FWS shall produce a new 12-month finding by 4/20/2012. Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors shall file m emoranda (no longer than 7 pages each) stating their positions with respect to the new 12-month finding by 5/4/2012. The parties shall submit simultaneous memoranda on Plaintiffs' request that the Court enjoin DPS from applying the 2007 delisting rule to the desert eagle by 12/16/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/30/2011.(NVO)
March 1, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Salt River Pima-Maricopa Indian Community's 29 Motion to Intervene; the Clerk shall file SRPMIC's proposed complaint lodged at Doc. 30 as a complaint in intervention. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/1/11.(REW)
January 10, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting San Carlos Apache Tribe's 20 Motion to Intervene; the Clerk shall file the Tribe's proposed complaint lodged at Doc. 21 as a complaint in intervention; the Tribe may file a memorandum in support of the pending motion for preliminary injunction 15 by 1/28/11; Defendants my file a memorandum in response to the Tribe's memorandum by 2/18/11; the Tribe may file a reply memorandum, not to exceed 7 pages, by 2/28/11. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Justin J Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricopa Audubon Society
Represented By: Justin J Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Represented By: Hao-Chin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan Gould
Represented By: Hao-Chin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: San Carlos Apache Tribe of Arizona
Represented By: Robyn Loretta Interpreter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?