LimoStars Incorporated v. New Jersey Car and Limo Incorporated

Plaintiff: LimoStars Incorporated
Defendant: New Jersey Car and Limo Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv02179
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (Doc. 47). Plaintiff's Application for Entry of Default Judgment 18 , 23 , against Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc. is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fee s and Costs is GRANTED. Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc. is permanently enjoined (see order for full details). Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff LimoStars, Inc., and against Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc., in the amount of $82,380.77 ($45,407.07 + $36,973.70 for attorney's fees) plus Plaintiff's taxable costs and non-taxable expenses allowed by Rule 54(d)(1), LRCiv 54.1, and 28 U.S.C. § 1920. See, Grove, 606 F.3d at 579-582; In re Apoll o Group, Inc. Securities Litigation, 2009 WL 2169178 (D.Ariz., July 17, 2009). The Judgment shall earn interest at the annual federal rate from the date of entry of this Judgment until paid in full. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/7/11. (DMT)
August 8, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, FINDINGS OF FACT, AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Recommending MOTION for Default Judgment as to New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc. 18 , 23 be Granted. Plaintiff's Application for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs, [2 7], be GRANTED. Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc. be permanently enjoined. Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff LimoStars, Inc. and against Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc., in the amount of $82,380.77 ($45,407.07 + $ ;36,973.70 for attorney's fees) plus Plaintiff's taxable costs and non-taxable expenses. The Judgment shall earn interest at the annual federal rate from the date of entry of this Judgment until paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if t his Report and Recommendation is approved by Senior United States District Judge Stephen M. McNamee or if he otherwise directs, the Clerk is kindly directed to enter Judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/8/11. (see Report for full details)(DMT)
May 18, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a default damages hearing for 1:30 pm on 6/16/11 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. ORDER that Plaintiff's alternative requested relief is DENIED re 36 . The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to mail a copy of this order to Defendant New Jersey Car and Limo, Inc. c/o Malak Faltawws. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/18/11. (TLJ)
April 15, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 31 Motion to Continue. The April 14, 2011 default damages hearing ishereby VACATED. Defendant must retain an attorney, licensed to practice law in Arizona by 4/29/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/14/11. (see order for full details)(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LimoStars Incorporated v. New Jersey Car and Limo Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Car and Limo Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LimoStars Incorporated
Represented By: Mark L Brown
Represented By: Robert W Schmieder, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?