Arenberg v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: David Arenberg
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Jim Taylor
Case Number: 2:2010cv02228
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 214 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 227 Motion. The net result is that plaintiff Arenberg shall recover the sum of $2,548.40 in attorney's fees and non-taxable costs from defendants. The Clerk will please effectuate this decision by adding that sum to the judgment in Arenberg's favor against defendant Taylor. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/23/13.(LSP)
July 9, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 185 Motion for Reconsideration of the order at docket 182 . Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/9/10.(JWS)
July 8, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 165 Objections to defendants' exhibits and 170 Objections to plaintiff's exhibits. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/8/13. Plaintiff's Exhibit 9 is SUSTAINED, and the objections to defendants' Exhibits E and F a re SUSTAINED. Exhibits 9, E, and F will not be admitted in evidence. Within seven (7) days from the date of this order, plaintiff may serve and file a copy of a redacted log to be labeled Exhibit 9-1," which contains only statements which plai ntiff believes fall within the ambit of Fed. R. Evid. 803(1). Defendants may respond within four (4) business days after proposed Exhibit 9-1 is filed, and plaintiff may reply within three (3) business days after defendants' response is filed.(JWS)
July 1, 2013 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 163 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/1/13.(JWS)
January 7, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 5). Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 5) is denied without prejudice. On or before January 18, 2011, Defe ndant Ryan must file a Notice with the Court providing the status of Plaintiff's surgery and the week for which it is scheduled. That portion of the Courts Screening Order (Doc. 6) that dismissed Taylor as a Defendant is vacated; Taylor is reins tated as a Defendant in this action, as is the claim that Taylor was deliberately indifferent in violation of the Eighth Amendment.The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Taylor. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/5/11.(LAD)
November 29, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/22/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arenberg v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Alice Jolynn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?