Kingsley Capital Management LLC et al v. Sly et al

Plaintiff: Kingsley Capital Management LLC and Bruce Paine Kingsley MD IRA Rollover
Defendant: Heather D Cunningham, Brian Nelson Sly, Tamara Sly, Brian Sly and Company Incorporated, Brian Sly and Company, Wilbur Anthony Huff, Sherri Huff, Thomas J Bean and Thomas Cunningham
Case Number: 2:2010cv02243
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 - Petition for Removal: Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 531 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial and or Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Doc. 500 ) is denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/17/14. (NKS) Modified on 1/23/2014 to change to WO (SJF).
August 2, 2013 408 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 369 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting in part 371 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment on Counts 2, 3, and 4. Plaintiffs remaining claims are Counts 1, 5, 6, and 7. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants submit further briefing regarding disqualification of Mr. Conant by 8/14/13. FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Final Pretrial Order is extended to 8/20/13. Motions in Limine shall be filed by 8/16/13 and responses filed by 8/26/13. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8-2-13.(NVW, nb) *Modified to add document number on 8/2/2013 (LSP).
August 20, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that "Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Untimely Notices of Nonparty at Fault" (Doc. 173 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Sly's and Defendant Cunningham's motions to excuse their untimely filing are DENIED. FURT HER ORDERED that "Thomas Cunningham's Notice of Non-Parties at Fault" (Doc. 170 ) and "Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendants Brian Sly, Brian Sly and Company and Brian Sly and Company, Inc." (Doc. 171 ) are STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/20/2012.(KMG)
February 23, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 90 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Thomas J. Beans Motion to Stay Litigation and Compel Arbitration in Kentucky is DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/23/12. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingsley Capital Management LLC et al v. Sly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather D Cunningham
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nelson Sly
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Sly
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sly and Company Incorporated
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sly and Company
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Anthony Huff
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Huff
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Bean
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cunningham
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Represented By: Alison Holden Pulaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingsley Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Paine Kingsley MD IRA Rollover
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?