Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (Arizona) LLC et al v. Ensign-Bickford Aerospace & Defense Company

Plaintiff: Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (Arizona) LLC and Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (California) LLC
Defendant: Ensign-Bickford Aerospace & Defense Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv02252
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Rule 56(d), the court GRANTS the plaintiffs' motion to defer Docket 107 and DENIES without prejudice the defendant's motion for partial summary judgment Docket 97 . Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 5/22/2012.(KMG)
March 15, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. The court ORDERS the parties to submit a joint statement that is no longer than three pages, single-spaced, that describesthe discovery that has be en conducted thus far, the discovery that remains, and summarizes any outstanding discovery disputes. In addition, the plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a statement explaining the status of its efforts to obtain approval to disclose technical documentat ion in this suit. This statement should include a list in chronological order of the actions it has taken thus far and what remains to be done, with specificity. Both the joint statement and the plaintiffs' statement are due by March 26, 2012. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 3/15/12.(LAD)
September 23, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, denying Ensign-Bickford's 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for failure to state a claim and for transfer; denying the 37 Motion for Transfer of Venue. Signed by Judge Joseph R Goodwin on 9/23/11.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (Arizona) LLC et al v. Ensign-Bickford Aerospace & Defense Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (Arizona) LLC
Represented By: Michael Andrew Oblon
Represented By: David Matthew LaSpaluto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Scientific Energetic Materials Company (California) LLC
Represented By: David Matthew LaSpaluto
Represented By: Michael Andrew Oblon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign-Bickford Aerospace & Defense Company
Represented By: Richard D Getz
Represented By: Sid Leach
Represented By: Patrick J Markey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?