Shaka v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Shaka
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Duane Belcher, Unknown Benavidez, Unknown Curran, Unknown Felkins and Unknown Long
Case Number: 2:2010cv02253
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2015 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 316 Plaintiff's Request/Motion for Certificate of Appealibility (C.O.A.). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/24/15.(LSP)
March 4, 2015 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 254 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 292 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is terminated with prejudice. The Clerk must enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/15.(LSP)
November 4, 2014 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling Plaintiff's objection under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 (Doc. 279 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 60 relief (Doc. 280 ). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/31/2014.(KMG)
October 3, 2014 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's request for a typewriter (Doc. 273 at 2) is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/3/2014. (KMG)
July 20, 2012 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's request that the Court refrain from using anything other than Shaka in the caption is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to mail a current copy of the viewable public docket to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/20/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaka v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Benavidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Felkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?