Reed v. Purcell et al

Plaintiff: Mark Reed
Defendant: Helen Purcell, Karen Osborne and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2010cv02324
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees for the amount requested in Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Fees and Costs 52 , plus the amount requested in Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of his Memorandum and Points of Authorities 54 for a total amount of $71,224.00. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/11.(TLJ)
November 1, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/1/10.(LSP)
October 29, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting a Hearing re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 at 11:30AM before Judge James A Teilborg. FURTHER ORDERED that, because the Court will not consider the motion on an ex parte basis, Plaintiff sh all deliver a copy of this order (by fax, email, or hand delivery) to each Defendant by close of business TODAY (10/29/10) and shall file a notice by 8:00 a.m. Monday, 11/1/10 of how notice was given to each Defendant. FURTHER ORDERED that any Defend ant may respond in writing to the motion by 8:00 a.m., Monday, 11/1/10. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit a proposed form of injunction by 8:00 a.m. Monday, 11/1/10. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall make the motion 4 accessible to all CM/ECF users. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/29/10. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Purcell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Reed
Represented By: Diane S Cohen
Represented By: Clint Daniel Bolick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Purcell
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Osborne
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: M Colleen Connor
Represented By: Karen J Hartman-Tellez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?