United States of America v. Smith

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert F Smith, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02358
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Robert F. Smith's request for a Certificate of Appealability is moot, re: 12-16801, as to 80 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/7/12. (LSP)
June 18, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Government's Motion for Summary Judgment; as part of this ruling, the Bigley affidavits are excluded. Judgment will be entered in favor of the IRS and against Defendant Robert F. Smith, Sr. in the amount of $186,230.37 for tax years 1999, 2000, 2001, and 2002, with interest and penalties to accrue until paid in full. The IRS shall submit a form of judgment by June 29, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 68 Smith's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike; denying 72 Motion to Compel; denying 75 Motion to accept additional materials. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/18/12.(LSP)
March 29, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying any relief requested in 58 Defendant's Offer of Proof by Affidavit. Defendant's response to 62 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment is due on 4/5/2012. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/28/12. (LSP)
January 30, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 44 Defendant's Motion for Emergency Relief from Deposition. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/30/12.(LSP)
January 4, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Take Interlocutory Appeal and granting 55 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/4/12.(LSP)
November 3, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/3/11.(LSP)
April 11, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/8/11.(LSP)
March 22, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/11.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?