Placencia et al v. I-Flow Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Gilbert S Placencia and Theresa Placencia
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation, Breg Incorporated, DJO LLC and DJO Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv02520
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, I-Flow's motion for summary judgment 129 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order; Breg's motion for summary judgment 137 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order; I-Flow and Breg&# 039;s motion to strike certain opinions of Dr Badylak 131 is granted; I-Flow and Breg's motion to strike certain opinions of Dr Busfield 132 is granted; I-Flow and Breg's motion to strike Dr Pence 136 is denied; I-Flow's motion to strike Dr Greenland 140 is denied; the Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/12. (REW)
May 24, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Discovery Conference Call held 5/24/2012. Defendants are granted protective orders with respect to the depositions and related written discovery discussed on the record during the 5/24/2012 conference call with the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/2012. (NVO)
April 11, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 48 Order on Motion to Dismiss. The Court has amended its order previously entered as 48 in this matter. Counsel are directed to disregad the order previously entered as 48 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/11/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/11/2011. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Placencia et al v. I-Flow Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert S Placencia
Represented By: Leslie W OLeary
Represented By: Matthew E Munson
Represented By: Serena C Montague
Represented By: Laura B Kalur
Represented By: Heather A Brann
Represented By: Thomas B Powers
Represented By: Michael L Williams
Represented By: Frank Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Placencia
Represented By: Heather A Brann
Represented By: Laura B Kalur
Represented By: Serena C Montague
Represented By: Leslie W OLeary
Represented By: Thomas B Powers
Represented By: Michael L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-Flow Corporation
Represented By: Paul E Wojcicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breg Incorporated
Represented By: Lori Ann Zirkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO LLC
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Raymond Paul Rogissart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJO Incorporated
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Raymond Paul Rogissart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?