Regional Care Services Corporation, et al v. Companion Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Regional Care Services Corporation and Regional Care Services Corporation Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plan
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv02597
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 , 120 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Plaintiffs are awarded their attorneys' fees in the amount of $180,525.50 and taxable costs pursuant to Rule 54(d)(1), LRCiv 54.1(a), and 28 U.S.C. § 1920. FURTHER OR DERED granting/denying in part Plaintiffs' 121 Application for Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest etc. Plaintiffs are awarded prejudgment interest on the amount of $274,181.01 at the rate of 4.25% per annum in the amount of  6;25,799.44 for the period beginning on March 31, 2010 to the date of entry of judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant Companion in the amount of $480,50 5.95 plus Plaintiffs' taxable costs which shall earn post-judgment interest at the applicable federal rate of.18% from the date of entry of judgment until paid in full. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/15/12.(MAP)
June 11, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Defendant Companion Life Insurance Company's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 118 Defendant Companion Life Insurance Company's Motion to Withdraw Admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/8/12.(LSP)
April 24, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDER Plaintiffs must complete the following tasks on or before 5/8/12 (see attached pdf for complete information). ORDER the parties' request for oral argument are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/24/12.(TLJ)
March 26, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' requests for oral argument are DENIED because the briefing is adequate and oral argument would not aid the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/26/12.(LAD)
December 9, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 68 Motion to Quash. That the deadline for Defendant to depose Toni Lavor is extended to, and including, Friday, December 30, 2011. Plaintiffs must cooperate in scheduling Ms. Lavor's deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/9/11.(DMT)
November 21, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, etc. (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/21/11.(LAD)
March 16, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to Stipulation 20 . (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/16/11. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regional Care Services Corporation, et al v. Companion Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Care Services Corporation
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regional Care Services Corporation Health and Welfare Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: John C West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Represented By: S David Childers
Represented By: Philip Ashley Overcash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?