Johnson v. Wyeth LLC et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Johnson
Defendant: Wyeth LLC and Pfizer Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2010cv02690
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss 144 was sufficient without court order to effect the dismissal and termination of this action under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Fed. R. Civ.P.; all pending motions, of course, are terminated for that same reason; accordingly, the clerk shall terminate this action administratively. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/16/12. (REW)
April 11, 2012 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 79 Motion to Exclude Opinions of plaintiff's experts Drs. Parisian, Blume, and Austin (doc. 79). Defendants' motion to exclude Dr. Austin's testimony is DENIED on grounds of mootness. Defendants' motio n to exclude Dr. Parisian and Dr. Blume's failure to test opinions is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to exclude all of Dr. Parisian and Dr. Blume's testimony is DENIED. This ruling is without prejudice to defendants making appropriate objections at trial. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/11/12.(SJF)
April 5, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING IN PART defendants' motion to exclude opinionsof plaintiff's expert Michael Maloney (doc. 78). Dr. Maloney's testimony will be limited to his calculation of Wyeth's net worth, should evidence relati ng to punitive damages become necessary. His opinions regarding the size of an appropriate punitive damage award, that it is important to assess the "true value of a company" when awarding punitive damages, and how a punitive damages award can be calculated based on analogies to SEC fines, antitrust violations, and speeding fines are excluded. This ruling is without prejudice to defendants making other appropriate objections to the offering of net worth evidence at trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion to exclude opinions of plaintiff's expert Dr. Hollon (doc. 80). However, this is without prejudice to the right of plaintiff to offer such evidence if plaintiff first offers evidence that plaintiff or her physician were likely to have been influenced by Wyeth's marketing efforts. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/5/12.(LAD)
August 22, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall file and serve the First Amended Complaint within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/22/11.(REW)
April 19, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Defendants Wyeth and Pfizer's Motion to Transfer (filed in CV 10-2660-PHX-NVW); the Clerk is directed to file this Order in the cases listed herein. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/19/11. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wyeth LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Johnson
Represented By: Lisa Gay Lewallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Frenzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Incorporated
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Frenzinger
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?