Owens v. ReconTrust Company NA et al

Plaintiff: Dannielle Owens
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv02696
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Defendants. It is further ordered denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Strike Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 08/22/11.(ESL)
March 31, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 34) in all respects referred to this Court for ruling. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/31/11.(LAD)
January 25, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED adopting Temporary Restraining Order entered by the Superior Court until this Court can rule on the emergency motion filed on 1/21/2011. FURTHER ORDERED setting hearing on 16 emergency Motion to Sequester the Genuine Note Until Fin al Adjudication of This Matter: Replevin in Detinet for a Provisional Remedy Pursuant to A.R.S. Section 12-2402 for 2/17/2011 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge James A Teilborg. FINALLY ORDERED that if plaintiff does not obtain counsel by the hearing, the Court will dismiss this case, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/25/2011. (Copy mailed to Danielle Owens on 1/25/2011).(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. ReconTrust Company NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannielle Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?