Ordonez v. Arpaio

Plaintiff: Ramon Ordonez
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2010cv02731
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12 ) and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The docket shall reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Robert C roomfield on 03/17/11. (ESL)
February 23, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Pla must file a completed and signed Certificate, using the Certificate form provided with this Order, certifying that Pla's signature on the Certificate shall serve as an original signa ture on his Second Amended Complaint for the purposes Rule 3.4(a) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Pla fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must strike Pla's Second Amended Complaint and enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 02/23/11. (ESL)
January 27, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the First 10 Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk o f Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 01/27/11. (Attachments: # 1 PCR Complaint Form)(ESL)
January 20, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Ramon Ordonez. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 01/19/11. (ESL)
December 27, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 3 MOTION (application) to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date of this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of the Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/24/10. (Attachments: # 1 IFP non-habeas)(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordonez v. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ordonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?