Bastian v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Thomas Bastian
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv02743
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1355
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Court Order Compelling Petitioner Possession and Access to a Personal Typewriter (Doc. 10 ) is denied. This case must remain closed. The Clerk of Court shall accept no further documents for filing in this case number. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/2013.(KMG)
March 19, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Filing of Search Warrant Affidavit and Copy of Search Warrant and Attacments. This case must remain closed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/19/13.(TLJ)
February 22, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with the Court's January 3, 2011 Order. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Plaintiff's Motion for Filing of Search Warrant Affidavit (Doc. 4) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/19/11.(KMG)
January 3, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/3/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastian v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bastian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?