Donahoe et al v. Arpaio et al
Plaintiff: Cherie Donahoe and Gary Donahoe
Defendant: Unknown Spaw, Peter Spaw, Unknown Parties, Maricopa, County of, Lisa Aubuchon, Andrew Thomas, David Hendershott, Anna Hendershott, Joseph M Arpaio, William Montgomery, Peter R Pestalozzi, Anne Thomas and Ava Arpaio
Consolidated Plaintiff: Sandra Wilson, Nancy Wetzel, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Stephen Wetzel, Earl Wilcox, W Harquahala LLC, Mary Rose Wilcox, Donald T Stapley, Jr., Vistoso Partners LLC, Kathleen Stapley, ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Susan Schuerman, Paul Wilson and Conley D Wolfswinkel
Consolidated Defendant: Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko, Jonathan Halverson and Unknown Halverson
Intervenor Plaintiff: Barbara Mundell, Anna Baca and Charles Hoskins
Case Number: 2:2010cv02756
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Filing 1193 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: #462 Order by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Campbell, Colin)
June 26, 2014 Filing 1192 APPEAL RECORD RETURNED: re: #377 Notice of Appeal; Docket numbers of Bulky Document: DVD #763 ; Number of Expandos: 1. (LAD)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 ORDER pursuant to #1190 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint and this action, with each party to pay his, her, or its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating all hearings and terminating all pending motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to terminate the Lead Case, CV-10-2756-PHX-NVW and the Member Case, CV011-902-PHX-NVW. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/27/13. (LAD)
December 26, 2013 Filing 1190 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2013 Filing 1189 NOTICE of Settlement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 13, 2013 Filing 1188 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED continuing the Final Pretrial Conference from December 17, 2013, to January 2, 2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED continuing the deadline for responses to motions in limine (Docs. #1174 #1175 #1178 #1179 #1181 ) to December 24, 2013, at 12:00 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 12, 2013 Filing 1187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1164 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN OF STAPLEYS TRIAL WITNESSES filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Shively, Sharon)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1186 RESPONSE to Motion re #1164 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN OF STAPLEYS TRIAL WITNESSES filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1185 Cross Proposed Jury Instructions by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1184 Proposed Jury Instructions by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1183 NOTICE of Filing - Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1182 NOTICE re Lodging of Deposition Transcripts by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1181 MOTION in Limine re: Stapley's Combined Motions in Limine by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1180 Joinder re #1174 MOTION in Limine re: Depositions and Testimony from Prior Testimony from Trial, #1178 MOTION in Limine re: NOS. 1 THROUGH 3 , #1175 MOTION in Limine 1 - 15, #1179 MOTION in Limine re: EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE FROM BAR TRIALS & JUDGMENTS by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1179 MOTION in Limine re: EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE FROM BAR TRIALS & JUDGMENTS by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1178 MOTION in Limine re: NOS. 1 THROUGH 3 by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1177 TRIAL BRIEF MARICOPA COUNTYS TRIAL BRIEF RE: (1) THE COUNTYS LIABILITY ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS, AND (2) THE SOURCE OF AUTHORITY OF THE SHERIFF AND COUNTY ATTORNEY by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1176 TRIAL BRIEF MARICOPA COUNTYS TRIAL BRIEF RE: MONELL LIABILITY by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1175 MOTION in Limine 1 - 15 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Audilett, Daryl)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1174 *MOTION in Limine re: Depositions and Testimony from Prior Testimony from Trial by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Drury, Douglas) *Modified to add filer on 12/11/2013 (LFIG).
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER that the Joint Motion for Clarification by Thomas and Aubuchon (Doc. #1172 ) is granted. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/10/13. (NKS)
December 10, 2013 Filing 1172 *Joint MOTION Clarification of Court's December 5, 2013 Order by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi, Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah) *Modified to correct filers on 12/10/2013 (LFIG).
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER that Plaintiff Stapley's Motion to Amend Order (Doc. #1146 ) is granted as stated in this order. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/5/13. (NKS)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER granting #1169 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: The filing deadline for the Proposed Final Pretrial Order, proposed jury instructions, and motions in limine, is extended from Friday, December 6, 2013, to Tuesday, December 10, 2013. The response deadline for motions in limine is extended from Wednesday, December 11, 2013, to Friday, December 13, 2013. ORDERED by the Court 12/5/13. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
December 5, 2013 Filing 1169 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shively, Sharon)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER denying Plaintiff Stapley's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. #1056 , #1060 , and #1065 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendant Arpaio's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1062 ) against Stapley's ninth claim for unconstitutional policies, customs, failure to train, and negligent supervision. The motion is otherwise denied. FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendant Aubuchon's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1066 ) against Stapley's second and fifth claims for malicious prosecution and against his fourth claim for false arrest. The motion is otherwise denied. FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendant Hendershott's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1072 ) against Stapley's ninth claim for unconstitutional policies, customs, failure to train, and negligent supervision. The motion is otherwise denied. FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendant Thomas's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #1063 ) against Stapley's second and fifth claims for malicious prosecution and against his tenth claim for unlawful search. The motion is otherwise denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/5/13. (NKS)
December 2, 2013 Filing 1167 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 11/14/2013, before Judge Wake. Court Reporter Laurie Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2014. (VPB)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1166 OBJECTION re #1154 Notice (Other), #1155 Exhibit List, #1152 Notice (Other), #1157 Exhibit List, #1153 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' RULE FRCP 26(A)(3) TRIAL EXHIBIT DISCLOSURES by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1165 * OBJECTION DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS RULE 26(a)(3) TRIAL EXHIBIT DISCLOSURE re #1156 by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon) * Modified to add document linkage on 11/26/2013 (LAD).
November 25, 2013 Filing 1164 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN OF STAPLEYS TRIAL WITNESSES by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-B, #2 Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Shively, Sharon)
November 15, 2013 Filing 1163 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 11/14/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2013 Filing 1162 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on November 14, 2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
November 14, 2013 Filing 1161 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 10/30/2013, before Judge Wake. Court Reporter Laurie Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2014. (VPB)
November 14, 2013 Filing 1160 TEXT ONLY MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V. Wake: Oral Argument held on 11/14/2013. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the pending motions for summary judgment (Docs. #1056 , #1060 , #1062 , #1063 , #1065 , #1066 , #1072 ). Motions taken under advisement. APPEARANCES: Michael Manning, Stefan Palys, and Lawrence Wulkan for Plaintiffs. Daryl Audilett, Jeffrey Leonard, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson, and Sharon Shively for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 3:08 p.m. to 5:25 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(f) of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument regarding all pending motions for summary judgment (Docs. #1062 #1072 #1066 #1060 #1063 #1056 and #1065 ) for 11/14/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Ordered by Judge Neil V. Wake. (NVW, nb) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1158 NOTICE of Errata re #1140 Statement of Facts in Support of Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1157 Exhibit List AND WITNESS LIST PURUSANT TO FRCP 26(a)(3)(A) by Maricopa, County of.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1156 Exhibit List Plaintiffs Stapleys' FRCP Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley.. (Palys, Stefan)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1155 Exhibit List and Witness List Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(3) by Lisa Aubuchon.. (Drury, Douglas)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1154 NOTICE re Defendants Arpaios' Rule 26(a)(3) Witness and Exhibit List for Trial by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Audilett, Daryl)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1153 Exhibit List and Witness List Pursuant to Rule 26(A)(3) by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.. (Barnes, Sarah)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1152 NOTICE re re Defendants Hendershotts' Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures in Stapley et al. by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1151 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 10-30-2013 before Judge Neil Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1150 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on October 30, 2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 30, 2013 Filing 1149 TEXT ONLY MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 10/30/2013. Defendant's counsel argues his respective position regarding Maricopa County's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1058 ). Recess taken at 10:15 a.m. Court reconvenes at 10:24 a.m. Argument from both sides continues regarding Maricopa County's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1058 ). The Court denies the Motion for the reasons stated on the record. Separate written opinion to follow. APPEARANCES: Stefan Palys and Lawrence Wulkan for Plaintiffs. Jeffrey Leonard, Daryl Audilett (by phone), Sarah Barnes (by phone), Douglas Drury (by phone), and Barry Markson (by phone) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 9:06 a.m. to 10:54 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ORDER Setting Hearing on #1058 MARICOPA COUNTY'S MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for 10/30/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1028 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Andrew Thomas is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/24/2013.(LFIG) Modified on 10/30/2013 to reflect a WO filing pursuant to chambers email (SJF).
October 21, 2013 Filing 1146 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1126 Order by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 16, 2013 Filing 1145 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument Proceedings held on 10/4/2013, before Judge Wake. Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. (VPB)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1144 NOTICE re Joinder by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio re #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley, #1134 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley. (Audilett, Daryl)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1143 Joinder re #1142 Response by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1142 RESPONSE re #1112 Statement,,,, of Additional Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Defendants Motions for Judgment by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1141 Joinder re #1130 Reply to Response to Motion, #1134 Reply to Response to Motion, #1140 Statement, #1136 Statement, #1139 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1140 STATEMENT of Facts in Support re #1139 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J)(Audilett, Daryl)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1138 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1063 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1058 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MARICOPA COUNTYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1136 STATEMENT of Hendershott Defendants' Response, Objections and Controverting Facts to Stapley Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts [DOC 1112] by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1060 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Y through DD)(Manning, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1134 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1133 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1065 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manning, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1132 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manning, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1131 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1056 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against David Hendershott filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Manning, Michael)
October 15, 2013 Filing 1130 * REPLY to Response to Motion re #1066 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Drury, Douglas) * Modified to add additional filer on 10/16/2013 (LAD).
October 15, 2013 Filing 1129 MANDATE of USCA, the decision of the district court is AFFIRMED as to 12-16145 re: #375 Notice of Appeal and 12-16146 re: #377 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Order, #3 NDA) (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit)(KMG)
October 14, 2013 Filing 1128 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 10-04-2013 before Judge Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2013 Filing 1127 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald T Stapley, Jr for proceedings held on October 4, 2013 before Judge Neil Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER that Defendants' Joint Motion to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard (Doc. #1044 ) is granted except that Mr. Goddard may testify to prosecutors' usual investigative practices and ethical duties, and he may compare Thomas and Aubuchon's investigation to them. He may not offer any opinions regarding the criminal prosecutions, and he may not refer to any prosecutorial standard of care, offer legal conclusions, or testify about Defendants' states of mind. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/11/13.(SJF)
October 10, 2013 Filing 1125 NOTICE of Errata by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit H)(Palys, Stefan)
October 4, 2013 Filing 1124 TEXT ONLY MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 10/4/2013. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's and Andrew and Ann Thomas' Joint Motion to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard (Doc. #1044 ). The Court takes the matter under advisement. APPEARANCES: Michael Manning, Stefan Palys, and Lawrence Wulkan for Plaintiffs. Daryl Audilett (by phone), Jeffrey Leonard, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury, and Barry Markson for Defendants. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) Hearing held 3:33 p.m. to 5:06 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 4, 2013 Filing 1123 OMNIBUS RESPONSE to #1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit, #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley, #1066 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1063 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #1065 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (LAD)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 ORDER granting #1104 Notice of Lodging and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk shall file the Omnibus Response lodged with the Notice. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/4/13. (LAD)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1121 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1112 Statement,,,, Redacted Exhibits 69-92 and 115-137 by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Palys, Stefan)
October 3, 2013 Filing 1120 TEXT ONLY ORDER: ORDERED setting Oral Argument on Motion #1044 Joint MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard for 10/4/2013 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER granting #1118 Motion to Seal and directing the Clerk to seal Docs. 1112-11 and 1112-13 which contain Exhibits 82 and 126. FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiffs to file on the public docket a complete set of their redacted exhibits as additional attachments to their Statement of Additional Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response, etc. The Clerk's Office does not have the ability to insert a redacted version of a particular exhibit into a previously filed group of sealed exhibits. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/2/13.(MAP)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1118 MOTION to Seal Document by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 82 and 126, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palys, Stefan)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1117 NOTICE of Errata re #1115 Statement, #1116 Statement, #1113 Statement, #1114 Statement by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Palys, Stefan)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1116 STATEMENT of Controverting Statement of Facts to Thomas' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #1064 Statement by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1115 STATEMENT of Controverting Statement of Facts to Hendershott's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re #1073 Statement, by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1114 STATEMENT of Controverting Statement of Facts to Lisa Aubuchon's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #1068 Statement,, by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1113 STATEMENT of Controverting Statement of Facts to Arpaio's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re #1069 Statement, by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1112 * LODGED PROPOSED STATEMENT of Additional Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Arpaio, Hendershott, Thomas, and Aubuchon's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment re #1105 Lodged Proposed Document re Motion #1104 by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 through 7, #2 Exhibit Ex. 8 through 13, #3 Exhibit Ex. 14 through 16, #4 Exhibit Ex. 17 through 23, #5 Exhibit Ex. 24 through 32, #6 Exhibit Ex. 33 through 35, #7 Exhibit Ex. 36 through 42, #8 Exhibit Ex. 43 through 48, #9 Exhibit Ex. 49 through 60, #10 Exhibit Ex. 16 through 68, #11 Exhibit Ex. 69 through 92, #12 Exhibit Ex. 93 through 114, #13 Exhibit Ex. 115 through 137, #14 Exhibit Ex. 138 through 155, #15 Exhibit Ex. 156 through 162, #16 Exhibit Ex. 163 through 178, #17 Exhibit Ex. 179 through 194)(Wulkan, Lawrence) Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion for Leave to File is granted * Modified to correct event on 10/2/2013 (LAD). *Modified on 10/2/2013 to Seal Exhibit 11 and 13 Pursuant to Order #1119 *.
October 1, 2013 Filing 1111 * SEPARATE CONTROVERTING STATEMENT of Facts in Opposition to Stapley Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1056 and OBJECTIONS and RESPONSE to Stapley Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts #1057 by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Markson, Barry) * Modified to correct document linkage and clarify text on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1110 RESPONSE to Motion re #1056 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against David Hendershott filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1109 * STATEMENT of Controverting and Supplemental Facts in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1029 by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah) * Modified to add document linkage and clarify text on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1108 * CONTROVERTING STATEMENT of Facts in Opposition to Stapley's Separate Statement of Facts #1067 and SEPARATE STATEMENT of Facts in Response to Stapley's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1065 by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Drury, Douglas) * Modified to correct document linkage and clarify docket text on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1107 * RESPONSE to Motion re #1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) * Document not in compliance with LRCivP 7.1(c); attorney noticed on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1106 RESPONSE to Motion re #1065 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
October 1, 2013 Filing 1105 * (Filed at Doc. #1123 * LODGED Proposed Omnibus Response to Arpaio, Hendershott, Thomas, and Aubuchon's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment re: #1095 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Response MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence) Modified on 10/4/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1104 * NOTICE of Lodging and MOTION for Order to File Plaintiffs' Omnibus Response to Arpaio, Hendershott, Thomas, and Aubuchon's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence) * Modified to correct event on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1103 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Response to Stapley Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1102 and Controverting Statements of Facts in Opposition to Stapley Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #1060 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15)(Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to add document linkage on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
October 1, 2013 Filing 1102 * RESPONSE to #1060 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to correct event on 10/2/2013 (LAD).
September 30, 2013 Filing 1101 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1068 Statement,, by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit U)(Drury, Douglas)
September 27, 2013 Filing 1100 RESPONSE re #1059 Statement, Plaintiffs' Response to Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Maricopa County's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 27, 2013 Filing 1099 RESPONSE to Motion re #1058 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MARICOPA COUNTYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER granting #1096 Motion to Seal. ORDERED The Clerk's Office shall file under seal Exhibits K and U of the Statement of Facts [Dkt. 1068]. FURTHER ORDERED directing counsel to re-file redacted versions of the exhibits for the public record no later than 5:00 p.m. on October 1, 2013. Counsel should use the event "additional attachment" to link their redacted exhibits to the previously filed Statement of Facts. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/27/13.(MAP)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 *ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to File Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and to Exceed Page Limitations (Doc. #1095 ). ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to File Omnibus Response (Doc. #1095 ) is granted as to filing an omnibus response and denied as to exceeding the page limits, without prejudice to submitting the proposed overlength brief. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/27/13. See order for details. (NVW, nb) *Modified text on 9/27/2013 (LSP).
September 26, 2013 Filing 1096 MOTION to Seal Document #1068 Statement,, Exhibits K and U of Statement of Facts by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1095 * MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to File Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment and to Exceed Page Limitations by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence) Modified on 9/26/2013 (LAD). * Modified to correct event and add MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 9/26/2013 (LAD).
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' Joint Motion for Order Re Rule 26(a)(3) Deadline (Doc. #1088 ), and good cause appearing, ORDERED granting the parties' Motion. The parties are reminded that the trial date is firm and will not be delayed for any reason. FURTHER ORDERED setting November 8, 2013 as the deadline for the filing and service of the disclosures. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9-20-13. (NVW, nb)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1093 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1069 Statement, of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit, by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SOF Redacted Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit SOF Redacted Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit SOF Redacted Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit SOF Redacted Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit SOF Redacted Exhibit 8)(Audilett, Daryl)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER: Before the Court are Defendants Hendershotts' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom and Supporting Memorandum (Doc. #1038 ), Defendants Arpaio's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom (Doc. #1041 ), Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response, and Defendants' respective Replies. ORDERED that Defendants Hendershotts' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom and Supporting Memorandum (Doc. 1038) and Defendants Arpaio's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom (Doc. 1041) are denied in part and granted in part. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9-20-13. (NVW, nb)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1091 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to LRCiv 7.1(b)(3), IT IS ORDERED that the parties' submit a revised form of order to their Joint Motion for Order re Rule 26(a)(3) Deadline (Doc. 1088-1) not on law firm stationery. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1090 * NOTICE of Errata (CORRECTION) by Maricopa, County of re #1088 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time RULE 26(a)(3) DEADLINE. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to correct event on 9/23/2013 (LAD).
September 20, 2013 Filing 1089 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1073 Statement, in support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C Redacted, #2 Exhibit D Redacted, #3 Exhibit F Redacted, #4 Exhibit K Redacted, #5 Exhibit L Redacted)(Markson, Barry)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1088 * Joint MOTION for Order re RULE 26(a)(3) DEADLINE by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to correct event on 9/20/2013 (LAD).
September 19, 2013 Filing 1087 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1044 Joint MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard by Ann and Andrew Thomas and filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mueller, James)
September 19, 2013 Filing 1086 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1038 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER granting Defendants Hendershotts' #1082 Motion to Seal. The Clerk's Office shall file under seal Exhibits C, D, F, K, and L of the Statement of Facts (Doc. #1073 ). FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants Arpiaos' #1084 Motion to Seal. The Clerk's Office shall file under seal Exhibits 2, 4, 6, 7, and 8 of the Statement of Facts (Docs. #1069 , #1070 , and #1071 ). FURTHER ORDERED directing counsel to re-file redacted versions of the exhibits for the public record by no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 20, 2013. Counsel should use the event "additional attachment" to link their redacted exhibits to the previously filed statements of fact. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/18/13.(MAP)
September 18, 2013 Filing 1084 *MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2, 4, 6, 7 and 8 of the Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit Docs. #1069 , #1070 and #1071 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl) *Modified event from Motion to Seal to Motion to Seal Document; link added to documents on 9/19/2013 (SSU).
September 16, 2013 Filing 1083 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1041 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
September 16, 2013 Filing 1082 *MOTION to Seal Exhibits C, D, F, K and L of the Statement of Facts Doc. #1073 in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) *Modified event from Motion to Seal to Motion to Seal Document on 9/17/2013 (SSU).
September 16, 2013 Filing 1081 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 13, 2013 Filing 1080 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 13, 2013 Filing 1079 NOTICE re of Filing Exhibit X to Plaintiffs's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley re #1061 Statement, . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 11, 2013 Filing 1078 Joinder re #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
September 11, 2013 Filing 1077 Joinder re #1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
September 11, 2013 Filing 1076 * Joinder by the Hendershott Defendants in Co-Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom #1041 by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) * Modified to add document linkage on 9/12/2013 (LAD).
September 11, 2013 Filing 1075 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibit in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #1055 ). For the reasons stated in the Motion, and good cause appearing,IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting the Motion for Leave. Supervisor Stapley may submit a CD as an exhibit to their Statement of Facts in support of his Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio that was filed on September 10, 2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
September 11, 2013 Filing 1074 Joinder re #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley, #1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit, #1066 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1073 *STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Hendershott Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment re #1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Markson, Barry) *Modified on 9/19/2013 to Seal Certain Exhibits Pursuant to Order #1085 (MAP)*.
September 10, 2013 Filing 1072 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Stapley by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1071 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1069 Statement, Exhibit 4 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 4, Part 2)(Audilett, Daryl) *Modified on 9/19/2013 to Seal Exhibits Pursuant to Order #1085 (MAP)*.
September 10, 2013 Filing 1070 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1069 Statement, Exhibit 2 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 2)(Audilett, Daryl) *Modified on 9/19/2013 to Seal Exhibits Pursuant to Order #1085 (MAP)*.
September 10, 2013 Filing 1069 *STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit re #1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6-7, #5 Exhibit 8-15)(Audilett, Daryl) *Modified on 9/19/2013 to Seal Certain Exhibits Pursuant to Order #1085 (MAP)*.
September 10, 2013 Filing 1068 *STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re #1066 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Mueller, James) *Modified on 9/27/2013 to Seal Exhibits K and U Pursuant to Order #1098 (MAP)*.
September 10, 2013 Filing 1067 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon re #1065 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through C, #2 Exhibit Exhibits D through I, #3 Exhibit Exhibits J through K, #4 Exhibit Exhibits L through P, #5 Exhibit Exhibits Q through Y, #6 Exhibit Exhibits Z through EE)(Palys, Stefan)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1066 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1065 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lisa Aubuchon by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Palys, Stefan)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1064 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #1063 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1063 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1062 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Stapley Lawsuit by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1061 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio re #1060 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-K, #2 Exhibit Exhibits L-X)(Manning, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1060 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff Arpaio by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1059 STATEMENT of SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MARICOPA COUNTYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #1058 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MARICOPA COUNTYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1058 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MARICOPA COUNTYS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1057 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against David Hendershott re #1056 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against David Hendershott by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-Q, #2 Exhibit Exhibits R-DD, #3 Exhibit Exhibits EE-TT, #4 Exhibit Exhibits UU-NNN)(Manning, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1056 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against David Hendershott by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1055 MOTION Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibit in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Arpaio by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 9, 2013 Filing 1054 RESPONSE to Motion re #1038 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom , #1041 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan)
September 9, 2013 Filing 1053 RESPONSE to Motion re #1044 Joint MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard by Ann and Andrew Thomas and filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 6, 2013 Filing 1052 TEXT ONLY ORDER: ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Response Briefs (Doc. #1051 )is granted, but leave to exceed page limits will not be considered until the proposed overlength brief is submitted so it can be reviewed to assure that the length is warranted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
September 6, 2013 Filing 1051 * MOTION Leave to File Consolidated Response Brief to Defendants Arpaio's and Hendershott's Motions to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom and To Exceed the Page Limit re #1038 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom , #1041 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence) * Modified to correct event on 9/6/2013 (LAD).
September 5, 2013 Filing 1050 TEXT ONLY ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Expert Testimony of Walter Winnius III (Doc. #1048 ), ORDERED that Maricopa County's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Walter Winnius III (Doc. #1043 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Expert Gerald N. Zaddack (Doc. #1040 ) are deemed moot. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Expert Witness Dwight J. Duncan (Doc. #1009 ). See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9-4-13. (NVW, nb) Modified on 9/6/2013 (SJF).
September 4, 2013 Filing 1048 NOTICE re Withdrawal of Expert Testimony of Walter Winius, III by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley re #1043 MOTION to Strike MARICOPA COUNTY'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF WALTER WINIUS,III, #1040 MOTION to Strike Expert Gerald N. Zaddack . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
September 3, 2013 Filing 1047 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1009 MOTION to Strike Expert Dwight J. Duncan filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Palys, Stefan)
August 28, 2013 Filing 1046 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 8/19/2013, before Judge Wake. Court Reporter Laurie Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2013. (VPB)
August 27, 2013 Filing 1045 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing Regarding Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas re #1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas, #1033 Order by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1044 Joint MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff Expert Terry Goddard by Ann and Andrew Thomas and by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mueller, James)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1043 MOTION to Strike MARICOPA COUNTY'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF WALTER WINIUS,III by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1042 RESPONSE to Motion re #1009 MOTION to Strike Expert Dwight J. Duncan filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1041 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Audilett, Daryl)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1040 MOTION to Strike Expert Gerald N. Zaddack by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1039 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1038 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert D.P. Van Blaricom by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Markson, Barry)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1037 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1036 NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Arpaio, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 23, 2013 Filing 1035 NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Dowell, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 22, 2013 Filing 1034 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 08/19/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER that Plaintiff file a supplemental brief with regard to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas (Doc. #1028 ) by 8/27/13. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8-21-13. (NVW, nb)
August 20, 2013 Filing 1032 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on August 19, 2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 20, 2013 Filing 1031 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Tenth Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Shively, Sharon)
August 20, 2013 Filing 1030 NOTICE of Errata re #1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Palys, Stefan)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1029 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas re #1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Manning, Michael)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1028 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Andrew Thomas by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
August 19, 2013 Filing 1027 TEXT ONLY MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2013. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Judgment Should Not be Entered Against the County for Failure to Participate in Discovery (Doc. #962 ), Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanction Against Sheriff Arpaio for Spoliation of MCSO Emails (Doc. #964 ), and Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions Against David Hendershott for Spoliation of Gmail Emails (Doc. #963 ). The Court denies all three motions for the reasons stated on the record. The Court also denies the Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Exhibits for Hearing on August 19, 2013 (Doc. #1024 ) as moot. APPEARANCES: Stefan Palys, Michael Manning, and Lawrence Wulkan for Plaintiffs. Jeffrey Leonard, Daryl Audilett, Barry Markson, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury (by phone), Victoria Orze, and Sharon Shively for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 9:05 a.m. to 10:44 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
August 18, 2013 Filing 1026 NOTICE re Second Notice of Supplemental Exhibits by Donald T Stapley, Jr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1025 NOTICE re of Service DEFENDANTS HENDERSHOTTS FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1024 MOTION to Strike #1022 Notice (Other) OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 19, 2013 by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1023 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Supplemental Disclosure Statement dated 8-16-2013 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1022 NOTICE re Supplemental Exhibits for Hearing on August 19, 2013 by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Palys, Stefan)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1021 TEXT ONLY ORDER: ORDERED granting Defendant Aubuchon's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Doc. #1020 ). FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant Aubuchon shall contact the Court at 602-322-7640 approximately 5 minutes prior to the time set for hearing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1020 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Oral Argument Scheduled for August 19, 2013 by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mueller, James)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1019 NOTICE of Deposition of Terry Goddard, filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
August 14, 2013 Filing 1018 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Ninth Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Shively, Sharon)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER denying the Thomas' Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Trial Statrt Date One Week and to Extend Deadline to Challenge Plaintiffs' Prosecutorial Practices Expert (Doc. #1015 ). See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8-13-13. (NVW, nb)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1016 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #1015 MOTION to Continue RESCHEDULE TRIAL START DATE ONE WEEK AND TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE PLAINTIFFS PROSECUTORIAL PRACTICES EXPERT MOTION to Extend Deadline to Challenge Plaintiffs' Prosecutorial Practices Expert by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
August 12, 2013 Filing 1015 * MOTION to Continue RESCHEDULE TRIAL START DATE ONE WEEK AND TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO CHALLENGE PLAINTIFFS PROSECUTORIAL PRACTICES EXPERT by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah). * Added MOTION to Extend Deadline to Challenge Plaintiffs' Prosecutorial Practices Expert. Attorney also noticed that proposed order is not attached on 8/12/2013 (LAD).
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ORDER as to the parties' Stipulated Request (1st) to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline (Doc. #1013 ), ORDERED granting in part the Stipulated Request extending the deadline for dispositive motions to 9/10/13. FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for motions in limine to 12/6/13, responses are due on 12/11/13. FURTHER ORDERED that the Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2013.See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8-9-13. (NVW, nb)
August 8, 2013 Filing 1013 STIPULATION to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah)
August 8, 2013 Filing 1012 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa Co.'s Eighth Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Shively, Sharon)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1011 TEXT ONLY ORDER. ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Separate Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. #1010 ) and modifying the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. #464 ) such that Plaintiff Stapley may file separate motions for summary judgment against each of the defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
August 6, 2013 Filing 1010 * MOTION for Leave to File Separate Motions for Summary Judgment by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence) * Modified to correct event on 8/6/2013 (LAD).
August 6, 2013 Filing 1009 MOTION to Strike Expert Dwight J. Duncan by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1008 REPLY to Response to Motion re #962 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1007 REPLY to Response to Motion re #964 MOTION for Sanctions Against Sheriff Arpaio for Spoliation of MCSO Emails filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1006 REPLY to Response to Motion re #963 MOTION for Sanctions Against David Hendershott for Spoliation of Gmail Emails filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER that construing the parties' Supplemental Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Produced, Yet Potentially Uncommunicated Work Product (Doc. #1004 ) as a motion by Plaintiffs seeking permission to make inquiries having to do with documents that have been or will be voluntarily produced, regardless of whether they reflect thoughts that were communicated to clients. FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #1004 ) and allowing Plaintiffs to make the inquiries they propose. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/5/13. (NKS)
August 2, 2013 Filing 1004 STATEMENT of Supplemental Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Produced, Yet Potentially Uncommunicated Work Product by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 2, 2013 Filing 1003 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Extend Expert Deposition Deadline (Doc. #1002 ), ORDERED that the stipulating defendants shall have until 8/16/13 to complete expert witness depositions. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1002 STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DEPOSITION DEADLINE by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1001 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Seventh Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Shively, Sharon)
July 31, 2013 Filing 1000 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 999 IT IS ORDERED the motion to continue is GRANTED and the motion hearing for #963 Motion for Sanctions filed by Kathleen Stapley, Donald T Stapley, Jr., #962 Motion for Sanctions, filed by Kathleen Stapley, Donald T Stapley, Jr., #964 Motion for Sanctions filed by Kathleen Stapley, Donald T Stapley, Jr. presently set for 8/7/13 at 1:30 p.m., is VACATED and RESET. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Ordered by Judge Neil V Wake. (NVW, nb)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2013 Filing 998 TEXT ONLY ORDER. ORDERED granting Defendant's Motion to Continue and Motion to Expedite (Doc. #997 ). FURTHER ORDERED resetting Oral Argument in this matter to 8/19/13 at 9:00 a.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
July 29, 2013 Filing 997 * MOTION to Continue Motion to Continue Oral Argument on Motion for Sanctions by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey). * Added MOTION (REQUEST)for Expedited Consideration on 7/30/2013 (LAD).
July 29, 2013 Filing 996 TEXT ONLY ORDER: ORDERED granting Defendants Arpaios' Request for Hearing (Doc. #994 ). ORDERED setting Oral Argument on all pending motions for 8/7/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
July 29, 2013 Filing 995 NOTICE of Deposition of Terry Goddard, filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
July 26, 2013 Filing 994 * MOTION for Hearing Regarding Stapley Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Sheriff Arpaio for Spoliation of MCSO Emails #964 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to correct event and add document linkage on 7/26/2013 (LAD).
July 25, 2013 Filing 993 RESPONSE to Motion re #963 MOTION for Sanctions Against David Hendershott for Spoliation of Gmail Emails filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Markson, Barry)
July 25, 2013 Filing 992 RESPONSE to Motion re #962 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED AGAINST THE COUNTY FOR FAILURE TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 991 RESPONSE to Motion re #964 MOTION for Sanctions Against Sheriff Arpaio for Spoliation of MCSO Emails filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-5)(Audilett, Daryl)
July 25, 2013 Filing 990 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Supplemental Disclosure Statement Dated 7-25-2013 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
July 24, 2013 Filing 989 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Sixth Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Shively, Sharon)
July 24, 2013 Filing 988 NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Arpaio, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER that the Supplemental Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions of Seriff Arpaio's Counsel (Doc. #981 ) is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7-23-13. (NVW, nb)
July 22, 2013 Filing 986 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 22, 2013 Filing 985 NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Dowell (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 22, 2013 Filing 984 NOTICE of Deposition of D. P. Van Blaricom, filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
July 17, 2013 Filing 983 NOTICE of Deposition of Amended Notice Deposition of Walter Winius, III, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2013 Filing 982 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Supplemental Disclosure Statement dated 7-17-2013 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
July 17, 2013 Filing 981 ** TREATED AS A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE ELIZABETH SPERLING AND DENIED BY ORDER #987 ** SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions of Arpaio's Counsel re #974 Order,,, by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Supplemental Joint Statement re Discovery Dispute)(Wulkan, Lawrence) Modified on 7/24/2013 (LAD).
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 980 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #978 Motion for Clarification Regarding the Court's Ruling on the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning "Advice of Counsel" Discovery. Plaintiff has presented a potential dispute that differs from the discovery issue addressed in Document 970, and the parties are directed to follow the procedures outlined in paragraph six of the Scheduling Order #464 should they determine that: (1) a dispute does exist; and (2) the dispute needs to be resolved by this Court. Ordered by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/16/2013. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
July 15, 2013 Filing 979 NOTICE re Notice of Removal of Attorney from ECF System by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
July 15, 2013 Filing 978 MOTION Clarification Regarding the Court's Ruling on the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning "Advice of Counsel" Discovery re #973 Order,, by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 12, 2013 Filing 977 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Frey (Second Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 12, 2013 Filing 976 NOTICE of Deposition of Laura Sierra (Second Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 12, 2013 Filing 975 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Driscoll (Second Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER as to the parties' Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions of Sheriff Arpaio's Counsel (Doc. #971 ). ORDERED construing the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions of Sheriff Arpaios Counsel (Doc. 971) as a motion by Defendants seeking a protective order precluding, at this time, the depositions of Mr. Dowell, Mr. Frey, Ms. Sierra, and Ms. Sperling. The motion for a protective order is denied with respect to Mr. Dowell, Mr. Frey, and Ms. Sierra; those depositions may proceed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit, on or before Wednesday, July 17, 2013, a supplemental joint discovery statement advising the Court as to Ms.Sperlings involvement in the proceedings and the importance of her deposition. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7-11-13. (NVW, nb)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER as to the parties' Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning "Advice of Counsel" Discovery (Doc. #970 ), ORDERED that the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Advice of Counsel Discovery (Doc. 970) is treated as a motion for protective order by Defendants and is granted. Discovery is not permitted into the uncommunicated work product or mental impressions of counsel. Discovery, including document discovery, may extend to evidence of what was communicated from client to counsel or from counsel to client and what the client understood the advice to be. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7-11-13. (NVW, nb)
July 10, 2013 Filing 972 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for an Order to Show Cause (Doc. #962 ) is treated as a motion for sanctions; that motion and the other two Motions for Sanctions (Docs. #963 , #964 ) may be briefed within the times provided by LRCiv 7.2(c) and (d). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, nb)
July 9, 2013 Filing 971 ** CONSTRUED AS A MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DENIED AS TO DOWELL, FREY AND SIERRA PER ORDER #974 ** STATEMENT of Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning Depositions of Sheriff Arpaio's Counsel by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence) Modified on 7/12/2013 (LAD).
July 9, 2013 Filing 970 ** TREATED AS A MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTED PER ORDER #973 ** STATEMENT of Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning "Advice of Counsel" Discovery by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence) Modified on 7/12/2013 (LAD).
July 9, 2013 Filing 969 * RESPONSE (OBJECTION) to #962 MOTION for Discovery Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Judgment Should Not be Entered Against the County for Failure to Participate in Discovery by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to correct event on 7/10/2013 (LAD).
July 9, 2013 Filing 968 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Frey (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
July 9, 2013 Filing 967 NOTICE of Deposition of Laura Sierra (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
July 9, 2013 Filing 966 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Driscoll (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
July 9, 2013 Filing 965 NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Dowell (Amended), filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Manning, Michael)
July 8, 2013 Filing 964 MOTION for Sanctions Against Sheriff Arpaio for Spoliation of MCSO Emails by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 11)(Manning, Michael)
July 8, 2013 Filing 963 MOTION for Sanctions Against David Hendershott for Spoliation of Gmail Emails by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 15)(Manning, Michael)
July 8, 2013 Filing 962 ** TREATED as a Motion for Sanctions per Order 972 ** MOTION for Discovery Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Judgment Should Not be Entered Against the County for Failure to Participate in Discovery by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 11, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Michael) * Modified on 7/11/2013 (LAD).
July 8, 2013 Filing 961 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Supplemental Disclosure Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses in Stapley v Arpaios, et al. by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
July 2, 2013 Filing 960 NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Dowell, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 2, 2013 Filing 959 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
July 2, 2013 Filing 958 NOTICE re Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
June 28, 2013 Filing 957 NOTICE of Deposition of Eric Dowell, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 28, 2013 Filing 956 NOTICE of Deposition of David Harlow, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 28, 2013 Filing 955 NOTICE of Deposition of Laura Sierra, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 28, 2013 Filing 954 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Driscoll, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 28, 2013 Filing 953 NOTICE of Deposition of Elizabeth Sperling, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 28, 2013 Filing 952 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Frey, filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 27, 2013 Filing 951 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Hendershotts' Supplemental Rule 26 (a)(2)(A),(B) Disclosure by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER denying Maricopa County's Motion to Strike [Doc. 928]. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6-26-13. (NVW, nb)
June 26, 2013 Filing 949 NOTICE re Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement Re Expert Witnesses in Stapley by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 26, 2013 Filing 948 NOTICE of Deposition of WALTER WINIUS, III, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2013 Filing 947 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Hendershotts' FRCP 26(a)(2)(A),(B) DISCLOSURE by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
June 21, 2013 Filing 946 NOTICE re DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY'S FRCP 26(a)(2)(A),(B) DISCLOSURE by Maricopa, County of NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY'S FRCP 26(a)(2)(A),(B) DISCLOSURE. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2013 Filing 945 NOTICE re Service of Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Expert Report) by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 12, 2013 Filing 944 RESPONSE re #942 Brief (Non Appeal) TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF CONCERNING MARICOPA COUNTY'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2013 Filing 943 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 6/3/2013, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2013. (VAR)
June 7, 2013 Filing 942 BRIEF re #940 Order, Supplemental Brief Concerning Maricopa County's Motion to Strike by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Palys, Stefan)
June 7, 2013 Filing 941 NOTICE re Service by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio of Defendants Arpaios Supplemental Disclosure Statement dated 6-07-2013. (Audilett, Daryl)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER reaffirming the oral ruling as stated on the record on 6/3/13. FURTHER ORDERED clarifying that Defendants' Motion to Strike Trial Witnesses (Doc. 928) was denied with regard to trial witnesses properly disclosed, as required by 16 A.R.S. Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26.1(a)(3), by parties in related cases. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 6-7-13. (NRB)
June 6, 2013 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on June 3, 2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 6, 2013 Filing 938 NOTICE re Service of Stapleys' Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 6, 2013 Filing 937 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 6/3/2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Shively, Sharon)
June 3, 2013 Filing 936 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 6/3/2013. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding Defendant Maricopa County's Motion to Strike Trial Witnesses (Doc. #928 ). The Court identifes the witnesses that will be excluded as stated on the record. The Court will allow Plaintiffs' counsel up to and including June 7, 2013, to file further briefing/motion regarding whether the Court should exclude the category of individuals who have not been listed by others as potential witnesses to be called on the morning of trial (they just show up on someone's disclosures). Defendant's counsel shall have up to and including the morning of June 12, 2013, to file a response to Plaintiffs' briefing/motion. APPEARANCES: Stefan Palys and Michael Manning for Plaintiffs. Jeffrey Leonard, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson, Sharon Shively, Sarah Barnes (by phone) and Daryl Audilett (by phone) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 1:36 p.m. to 2:55 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
June 3, 2013 Filing 935 NOTICE re Service by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio of Defendants Arpaios' Supplemental Disclosure Statement. (Audilett, Daryl)
May 29, 2013 Filing 934 Joinder re #928 MOTION to Strike TRIAL WITNESS, #933 Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Trial Witnesses by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl)
May 29, 2013 Filing 933 REPLY to Response to Motion re #928 MOTION to Strike TRIAL WITNESS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE TRIAL WITNESS filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-E)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2013 Filing 932 RESPONSE to Motion re #928 MOTION to Strike TRIAL WITNESS filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through G to Response)(Palys, Stefan)
May 10, 2013 Filing 931 NOTICE re Service of Stapley's Fourth Supplemental (Expert) Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER as to the Motion to Strike Trial Witnesses (Doc. #928 ) that Plaintiffs file a response by 05/22/13; Maricopa County file any reply by 05/29/13. Oral Argument set for 06/03/13 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/8/13. (NKS)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER - Pursuant to the settlement and the stipulation of the parties (Docs. #926 , #927 ), IT IS ORDERED that No. CV-11-00116-PHX-NVW, Wolfswinkel v. Arpaio and all claims therein are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions in No. CV-11-00116-PHX-NVW,Wolfswinkel v. Arpaio, (Docs. #761 , #764 , #765 , #771 , #776 , #777 , #780 , #784 , #789 , #796 ) are denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/7/13. (LAD)
May 7, 2013 Filing 928 MOTION to Strike TRIAL WITNESS by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2013 Filing 927 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2013 Filing 926 * NOTICE of Settlement (Applicable in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW only) by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to clarify text on 4/26/2013 (LAD).
April 25, 2013 Filing 925 NOTICE re NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2013 Filing 924 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 4/15/2013, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2013. (VAR)
April 16, 2013 Filing 923 NOTICE re Notice of Removal of Attorneys from ECF System by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
April 16, 2013 Filing 922 NOTICE re Service of Stapleys' Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
April 16, 2013 Filing 921 NOTICE re Correspondence to Judge Wake by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Neal, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 Filing 920 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 04/15/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2013 Filing 919 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel for proceedings held on 4/15/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Eagan, Shannon)
April 15, 2013 Filing 918 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 04/15/13. The Court takes all of the pending motions (Docs. #761 , #764 , #765 , #771 , #776 , #777 , #780 , #784 , #789 and #796 ) under advisement. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 1:41 p.m. to 6:30 p.m. (NKS)
April 10, 2013 Filing 917 NOTICE re Service by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko of Defendants Arpaios, Halversons and Roshetkos' Supplemental Disclosure Statement, regarding MCSO Disk 16. (Audilett, Daryl)
April 9, 2013 Filing 916 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley. (Shively, Sharon)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER (applicable in the Stapley matter ONLY) setting a Final Pretrial Conference on 12/17/13, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 504. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties jointly shall prepare a Proposed Final Pretrial Order and shall lodge it with the Court no later than 4:00 PM on 11/19/13. The parties shall file and serve all motions in limine no later than 11/19/13. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed on or before 12/06/13. FURTHER ORDERED that a jury trial will be held on 01/14/14, at 8:45 AM (FIRM TRIAL). See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/8/13. (NKS)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER granting granting the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc. #913 ). FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk's Office to dismiss Plaintiffs Gary Donahoe and Cherie Donahoe from the above-entitled action with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining parties continue to file documents under the case number CV-10-02756-PHX-NVW. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/5/13. (NKS)
April 5, 2013 Filing 913 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
April 5, 2013 Filing 912 NOTICE of Settlement by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for the Completion of Expert Discovery (Doc. #910 ). FURTHER ORDERED modifying the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. #464 ). See order for details. FURTHER ORDERED reaffirming all other deadlines in the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. #464 ). Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/5/13. (NKS)
April 3, 2013 Filing 910 First MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines for the Completion of Expert Discovery by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palys, Stefan)
April 2, 2013 Filing 909 NOTICE re of Disassociation of Counsel by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Manning, Michael)
March 22, 2013 Filing 908 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 3/13/2013, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2013. (VAR)
March 22, 2013 Filing 907 RESPONSE re #824 Statement, Maricopa County's Response to Plaintiffs' "Statement of Other Facts Creating Genuine Issues of Dispute Regarding Damages and Monell Liability" by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33-35, #2 Exhibit 36-38)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2013 Filing 906 RESPONSE re #895 Amended Minute Entry,,, Regarding Advise of Counsel Defense, by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
March 20, 2013 Filing 905 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for Hearing on Motion to Compel by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 3/13/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2013 Filing 904 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel for proceedings held on 3/13/2013 before Judge Wake.. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 19, 2013 Filing 903 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on March 13, 2013 before Judge Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
March 15, 2013 Filing 902 Joinder re #865 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
March 15, 2013 Filing 901 Joinder re #867 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
March 15, 2013 Filing 900 Joinder re #872 Reply to Response to Motion, for Summary Judgment by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
March 15, 2013 Filing 899 Joinder re #879 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Lisa Aubuchon filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Drury, Douglas)
March 14, 2013 Filing 898 Joinder re #877 Reply, #872 Reply to Response to Motion, #879 Reply to Response to Motion, #865 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
March 14, 2013 Filing 897 Joinder re #780 MOTION Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and to Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom , #866 Reply to Response to Motion, #822 Response to Motion,, by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
March 13, 2013 Filing 896 * Joinder in Co-Defendants' Replies to their Motions for Summary Judgment #865 , #867 , #877 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to add document linkage on 3/14/2013 (LAD).
March 13, 2013 Filing 895 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Amending Doc. #893 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Reason for Amendment: to amend line 6 of the first paragraph. Oral Argument held on 03/13/13. Counsel state their respective positions regarding Maricopa County's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(2)(b)(i) (Doc. #861 ). The Court denies the Motion (Doc. #861 ) for the reasons stated on the record. The Court ORDERS counsel for Sheriff Arpaio to advise the Court by 5:00 PM on Wednesday, 03/20/13, as to whether the Sheriff continues to assert the defense of advice of counsel. If the Sheriff does NOT continue to assert the defense, the Court further ORDERS the parties to submit brief memoranda of law by Friday, 03/22/13. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 10:06 a.m. to 11:25 a.m. (NKS)
March 13, 2013 Filing 894 Joinder re #830 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Hendershotts by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl)
March 13, 2013 Filing 893 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 03/13/13. Counsel state their respective positions regarding Maricopa County's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(2)(b)(i) (Doc. #861 ). The Court denies the Motion (Doc. #861 ) for the reasons stated on the record. The Court ORDERS counsel for Sheriff Arpaio to advise the Court by 5:00 PM on Wednesday, 03/20/13, as to whether the Sheriff continues to assert the defense of advice of counsel. If the Sheriff does continue to assert the defense, the Court further ORDERS the parties to submit brief memoranda of law by Friday, 03/22/13. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 10:06 a.m. to 11:25 a.m. (NKS)
March 12, 2013 Filing 892 REPLY to Response to Motion re #861 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(2)(b)(i) filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2013 Filing 891 STATEMENT of Discovery Dispute Concerning Sheriff Arpaio's Assertion of the Attorney-Client Privilege and Work Product Doctrine by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
March 11, 2013 Filing 890 Joinder re #866 Reply to Response to Motion, to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and To Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
March 11, 2013 Filing 889 Joinder re #822 Response to Motion,, to (1) Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dwight Duncan As Set Forth in His Supplemental Report, and (2) Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Enrique "Rick" Rodriguez by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
March 11, 2013 Filing 888 * Joinder re #780 MOTION Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and to Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) * Modified to correct event on 3/26/2013 (LAD).
March 11, 2013 Filing 887 RESPONSE to Motion re #861 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(2)(b)(i) filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Eagan, Shannon)
March 11, 2013 Filing 886 Joinder re #877 Reply, #872 Reply to Response to Motion, #865 Reply to Response to Motion, #867 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER (applicable in CV-11-00116-PHX-NVW ONLY) setting a Final Pretrial Conference for 05/21/13 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 05/16/13, at 4:00 PM. With the exception of any motions in limine, oral argument on all pending motions will be held on 04/15/13, at 1:30 PM. The trial date of 05/28/13, at 8:45 AM is affirmed at this time. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 3/11/13. (NKS)
March 8, 2013 Filing 884 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts to Aubuchon's Separate Statement of Facts in Response to Wolfswinkels' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #790 Statement,, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Wright, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 883 REPLY to Response to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 882 REPLY to Response to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Hendershott filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 881 * REPLY to Response to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants Thomas filed by Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel, ABCDW LLC. (Wright, Lawrence) * Modified to add additional filer (ABCDW LLC) on 3/11/2013 (LAD).
March 8, 2013 Filing 880 REPLY to Response to Motion re #784 MOTION to exclude expert testimony of Enrique "Rick" Rodriguez filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 879 REPLY to Response to Motion re #771 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
March 8, 2013 Filing 878 RESPONSE re #838 Statement, to Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Controverting Statement of Facts and Separate Controverting Statement of Facts by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Markson, Barry)
March 8, 2013 Filing 877 * REPLY to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment #789 by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James) * Modified to correct event on 3/11/2013 (LAD).
March 8, 2013 Filing 876 RESPONSE to Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike Contained in the Wolfswinkel Controverting Statement of Fact (Document 836) by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl)
March 8, 2013 Filing 875 STATEMENT of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs Controverting Statement of Facts to Defendants Arpaios, Halversons and Roshetkos Statements of Fact in Support of Response and Opposition to Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #834 Statement, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Eagan, Shannon)
March 8, 2013 Filing 874 NOTICE re of Service of Subpoena to John M. Jack Cox by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 873 * REPLY to Response to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS ARPAIO'S, HALVERSON'S AND ROSHETKO'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO WOLFSWINKELS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Eagan, Shannon) * Modified to correct text on 3/11/2013 (LAD).
March 8, 2013 Filing 872 REPLY to Response to Motion re #777 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Audilett, Daryl)
March 8, 2013 Filing 871 NOTICE re of Videotaped Deposition of Jack Cox by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
March 8, 2013 Filing 870 * REPLY to Response to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC and W Harquahala LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eagan, Shannon) * Modified to add additional filers on 3/11/2013 (LAD).
March 8, 2013 Filing 869 Joinder re #865 Reply to Response to Motion by Maricopa County in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant William Montgomery filed by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
March 8, 2013 Filing 868 REPLY to Response to Motion re #764 MOTION WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DWIGHT DUNCAN AS SET FORTH IN HIS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dwight Duncan as Set Forth in His Supplemental Expert Report filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Eagan, Shannon)
March 8, 2013 Filing 867 REPLY to Response to Motion re #776 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
March 8, 2013 Filing 866 REPLY to Response to Motion re #780 MOTION Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and to Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index & Exhibits 12, 13, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 14, 15)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2013 Filing 865 REPLY to Response to Motion re #765 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index & Exhibits 33 - 35, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 36 - 39)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2013 Filing 864 MANDATE of USCA: Appellant's unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. This order served on the District Court shall act as and for the mandate of this court re 12-17809, #716 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 NDA)(LFIG)
March 8, 2013 Filing 863 REPLY to Response to Motion re #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
March 7, 2013 Filing 862 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that any response to Defendant Maricopa County's Motion to Compel (Doc. #861 ) must be filed on or before 03/11/13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting oral argument on the Motion (Doc. #861 ) for 03/13/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Parties may participate in person or by telephone. All parties appearing telephonically must call the Court on one conjoined phone call at (602) 322-7640 approximately 5 minutes prior to the start of the proceeding. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
March 6, 2013 Filing 861 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Rule 45(c)(2)(b)(i) by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibits B - F, #3 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2013 Filing 860 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 1/15/2013 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2013 Filing 859 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 1/15/2013, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2013. (VAR)
March 1, 2013 Filing 858 OBJECTION re #812 Objection Plaintiffs' Amended Objections to Defendant Hendershott's List of Trial Exhibits by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 1, 2013 Filing 857 OBJECTION re #815 Objection Plaintiff's Amended Objections to Defendants Arpaios' Roshetkos' and Halversons' List of Trial Exhibits by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 1, 2013 Filing 856 OBJECTION re #813 Objection Plaintiff's Amended Objections to Defendant Aubuchon's List of Trial Exhibits by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 1, 2013 Filing 855 OBJECTION re #811 Objection Plaintiff's Amended Objections to Defendant Maricopa County's List of Witnesses to be Presented by Depoisition and Trial Exhibit List by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 1, 2013 Filing 854 OBJECTION re #814 Objection Plaintiffs' Amended Objections to Defendant Thomas' List of Trial Exhibits by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
March 1, 2013 Filing 853 NOTICE re Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2013 Filing 852 NOTICE re of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena on Ernie Riffer, MD. (Shively, Sharon)
February 28, 2013 Filing 851 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena on Superior Court of Arizona, County of Maricopa. (Shively, Sharon)
February 28, 2013 Filing 850 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Supplemental Discovery Responses by William Montgomery . (Orze, Victoria)
February 27, 2013 Filing 849 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
February 27, 2013 Filing 848 Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: #377 Notice of Appeal. Number of Bulky Documents: 1; Docket Number of Bulky Documents: 763; Number of Expandos: 1; (MHU)
February 26, 2013 Filing 847 NOTICE re Notice of Removal of Attorney Caleb S. Lihn by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
February 26, 2013 Filing 846 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Barry Matthew Markson. (Markson, Barry)
February 26, 2013 Filing 845 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena on HighGround, Inc.. (Shively, Sharon)
February 25, 2013 Filing 844 Joinder re #828 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #823 Response in Opposition to Motion, #834 Statement, #827 Statement, #824 Statement, #829 Statement, #826 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #833 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
February 25, 2013 Filing 843 Joinder re #830 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #834 Statement, #827 Statement, #826 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #833 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #832 Statement, by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
February 22, 2013 Filing 842 *STATEMENT of Controverting Facts and Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Response to Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas' Motion for Summary Judgment re #839 Response by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence) *Modified to correct document number/link on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 841 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts to Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment re #790 Statement, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
February 22, 2013 Filing 840 RESPONSE to Motion re #789 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
February 22, 2013 Filing 839 RESPONSE to Motion re #776 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
February 22, 2013 Filing 838 *STATEMENT of Controverting Facts and Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Response to Defendant Hendershott's Motion for Summary Judgment re #837 Response, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence) *Modified to correct document number/link on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 837 RESPONSE to Motion re #771 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
February 22, 2013 Filing 836 *STATEMENT of Controverting Facts and Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Response to Defendants Arpaio's, Halverson's and Roshetko's Motion for Summary Judgment re #835 Response, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence) *Modified to correct document number/link on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 835 RESPONSE to Motion re #777 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
February 22, 2013 Filing 834 STATEMENT of Controverting Statements of Fact and Statements of Fact in Support of Response to Wolfswinkel Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #833 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 29)(Audilett, Daryl)
February 22, 2013 Filing 833 RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl)
February 22, 2013 Filing 832 STATEMENT of Facts and Controverting Statement of Facts in Opposition to Wolfswinkels' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #830 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
February 22, 2013 Filing 831 STATEMENT of Facts re #825 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, of Maricopa County, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Eagan, Shannon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 830 RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
February 22, 2013 Filing 829 *STATEMENT of Controverting and Supplemental Statement of Fact re: #829 Response by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) *Modified to add document number/link on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 828 RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
February 22, 2013 Filing 827 *STATEMENT of Facts in Opposition to Wolfswinkel's Motion for Summary Judgment and Separate Statment of Facts in Response to Wolfswinkel's Motion for Summary Judgment re: #826 Response by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V, #2 Exhibit 1-20)(Mueller, James) *Modified to add document number/link on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 826 RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 22, 2013 Filing 825 RESPONSE to Motion re #765 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Maricopa County, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 824 STATEMENT of Disputed Facts in Support of Its Response to Wolfswinkels' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and In Opposition to Wolfswinkels' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #823 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 823 *RESPONSE to Motion re #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon) *Modified to correct Response event on 2/25/2013* (REW).
February 22, 2013 Filing 822 RESPONSE to Motion re #764 MOTION WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DWIGHT DUNCAN AS SET FORTH IN HIS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #784 MOTION to exclude expert testimony of Enrique "Rick" Rodriguez filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B & C, #3 Exhibits D & E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibits G & H, #6 Exhibits I, J & K)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2013 Filing 821 RESPONSE in Opposition re #780 MOTION Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and to Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom by Maricopa County, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Eagan, Shannon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 820 STATEMENT of Facts re #819 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, of William Montgomery, by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 819 RESPONSE to Motion re #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment of William Montgomery, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 22, 2013 Filing 818 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley for proceedings held on January 15, 2013 before Judge Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
February 15, 2013 Filing 817 * Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment #765 , #771 , #776 and #789 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Kastner, John) * Modified to add document linkage on 2/15/2013 (LAD).
February 15, 2013 Filing 816 NOTICE re Notice of Filing by Maricopa, County of Defendant Maricopa County's Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley. (Shively, Sharon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 815 OBJECTION re #749 Notice (Other), to Defendants Arpaios' Roshetkos' and Halversons' Rule 26(a)(3) Witness and Exhibit List for Trial by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 814 OBJECTION re #748 Notice (Other) to Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas' Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosure by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 813 OBJECTION re #751 Notice (Other) to Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's FRCP Rule 26(3)(A) Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 812 OBJECTION re #755 Notice (Other) to Defendants Hendershotts' Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosure by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 811 OBJECTION re #753 Notice (Other) to Defendant Maricopa County's FRCP Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Disclosures by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 14, 2013 Filing 810 OBJECTION re #756 Notice (Other), to Plaintiffs' January 28, 2013 List of Trial Exhibits by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Lisa Aubuchon, Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott, Maricopa, County of, William Montgomery, Peter R Pestalozzi, Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2013 Filing 809 NOTICE re Service of Arpaios', Halversons' Roshetkos' Supplemental Disclosure Statement Regarding MCSO Disk 15 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
February 11, 2013 Filing 808 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs FRCP Rule 26(A)(3) Supplemental Pretrial Disclosure Statement by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Solanki, Lindsy)
February 11, 2013 Filing 807 NOTICE of Deposition of Rachel Alexander, filed by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw. (Callahan, Charles)
February 11, 2013 Filing 806 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Kathleen Holderbach. (Shively, Sharon)
February 6, 2013 Filing 805 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Defendant Maricopa County's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley. (Shively, Sharon)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER granting Defendant Montgomery's request to join the Summary Judgment Motion (Doc. #765 ) filed by Maricopa County. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 2/5/13. (NKS)
February 4, 2013 Filing 803 * Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment #765 , #776 , #777 , #789 by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) * Modified to add document linkage on 2/5/2013 (LAD).
February 4, 2013 Filing 802 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #797 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment -- Exhibit 43 -- by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 44, #2 Exhibit 45, #3 Exhibit 46, #4 Exhibit 47, #5 Exhibit 48, #6 Exhibit 49, #7 Exhibit 50, #8 Exhibit 51, #9 Exhibit 52, #10 Exhibit 53, #11 Exhibit 54, #12 Exhibit 55, #13 Exhibit 56, #14 Exhibit 57)(LAD)
February 4, 2013 Filing 801 Sealed Pages of Deposition filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (MAP)
February 4, 2013 Filing 800 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #797 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment -- Exhibit 31 -- by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42) (more exhibits to follow)(LAD)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER granting #786 Motion to Seal. ORDERED directing the Clerk's Office to file page 141 through 152 of Defendant Jonathan Halverson's deposition transcript under seal pending further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/4/13.(MAP)
February 4, 2013 Filing 798 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #797 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Exhibit 16 - by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 28, #13 Exhibit 29, #14 Exhibit 30) (more exhibits to follow)(LAD)
February 4, 2013 Filing 797 STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of #796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (additional exhibits to follow)(LAD)
February 4, 2013 Filing 796 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (applicable only in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW) by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (LAD)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Plaintiffs'Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #767 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk's Office to file the Wolfswinkels' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/4/13. (LAD)
February 1, 2013 Filing 794 * Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment ( #765 , #771 , #777 , #789 ) by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) * Modified to add document linkage on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 793 * Joinder re #765 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Maricopa County by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James) * Modified to indicate document is titled as a Motion for Summary Judgment but it is actually a Joinder on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 792 Joinder re #771 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Anna Hendershott and David Hendershott by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 1, 2013 Filing 791 Joinder re #777 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ava Arpaio and Joseph M Arpaio by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 1, 2013 Filing 790 STATEMENT of FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #789 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Mueller, James)
February 1, 2013 Filing 789 * MOTION for Summary Judgment (applicable only in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW) by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional clarifying text on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 788 NOTICE of Errata re #787 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 1, 2013 Filing 787 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 1, 2013 Filing 786 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendant Halverson's Deposition Transcript by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
February 1, 2013 Filing 785 * ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS TO MAIN DOCUMENT: Proposed Order re #784 MOTION to exclude expert Filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence) * Modified to correct event on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 784 MOTION to exclude expert testimony by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wright, Lawrence)
February 1, 2013 Filing 783 SEALED LODGED Proposed Pages 141-152 of Jonathan Halversons October 4, 2012 Deposition Under Seal Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(d) re: #782 MOTION to Seal Document Notice of Lodging Pages 141-152 of Jonathan Halversons October 4, 2012 Deposition Under Seal Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(d). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 1, 2013 Filing 782 MOTION to Seal Document Notice of Lodging Pages 141-152 of Jonathan Halversons October 4, 2012 Deposition Under Seal Pursuant to LRCiv 5.6(d) by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 1, 2013 Filing 781 * LODGED PROPOSED PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #770 Lodged Proposed Document (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by Consol Plaintiffs Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35-Part 1, #36 Exhibit 35-Part 2, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57)(Eagan, Shannon) * Modified to correct event on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 780 MOTION Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian Dorrah and to Limit Testimony of Bruce Strombom by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-6, #3 Exhibit 7-11)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 DVD of Exhibit 10, Joan Stoops Interview, received and stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CAD)
February 1, 2013 Filing 779 * STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment #777 by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 15 to SOF)(Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to add document linkage on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 778 STATEMENT of FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #776 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah)
February 1, 2013 Filing 777 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl)
February 1, 2013 Filing 776 * MOTION for Summary Judgment (applicable only in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW) by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) * Modified to add clarifying text on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 775 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Defendants Hendershotts' Motion for Summary Judgment re #771 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibits G-M in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Markson, Barry)
February 1, 2013 Filing 774 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #768 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 21-24, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 25-28, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 29-32)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 Filing 773 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #768 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 18-20)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 Filing 772 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #768 Statement Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 11 - 12, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 13 - 17)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 Filing 771 * MOTION for Summary Judgment(application only in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW) by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) * Modified to add clarifying text on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 770 LODGED Proposed Wolfswinkels Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof re: #767 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
February 1, 2013 Filing 769 Additional Attachments to Main Document Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 9 -10)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2013 Filing 768 * STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Maricopa County's Motion for Summary Judgment #765 by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, Exhibits 1 - 3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 4 -7)(Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to add document linkage on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 767 * MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC and W Harquahaha LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eagan, Shannon) * Modified to add additional filers on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 766 MOTION for Joinder re #765 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Maricopa County by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
February 1, 2013 Filing 765 * MOTION for Summary Judgment (applicable only in CV-11-116-PHX-NVW) by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Modified to clarify text on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 764 MOTION WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DWIGHT DUNCAN AS SET FORTH IN HIS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eagan, Shannon)
February 1, 2013 Filing 763 NOTICE re Filing Non-Electronically Exhibit 10 to Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Filed 2-1-13 in Wolfswinkels v Arpaio, et al, by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
February 1, 2013 Filing 762 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Summary Judgment re #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
February 1, 2013 Filing 761 *MOTION for Summary Judgment (applicable to CV-11-116-PHX-NVW only) by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria) * Modified to clarify text on 2/4/2013 (LAD).
February 1, 2013 Filing 760 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Defendant Maricopa County's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley. (Shively, Sharon)
February 1, 2013 Filing 759 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Defendant Maricopa County's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe. (Shively, Sharon)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER granting the Defendants' Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' Request for Permission to File Non-Electronically an Exhibit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #757 ). Counsel may submit their DVD as an exhibit to their Statement of Facts in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment that will be filed on 02/01/13. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/31/13. (NKS)
January 30, 2013 Filing 757 Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' MOTION (Request) for Permission to File Non-Electronically an Exhibit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Consol Defendants Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Audilett, Daryl) * Modified to correct event on 1/31/2013 (LAD).
January 28, 2013 Filing 756 * NOTICE re WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS FRCP RULE 26(A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Solanki, Lindsy) * Discovery filed in violation of Local and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Attorney noticed on 1/29/2013 (LAD).
January 28, 2013 Filing 755 NOTICE re Defendants Hendershotts' Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures in Wolfswinkel, et al. by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
January 25, 2013 Filing 754 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosure by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
January 25, 2013 Filing 753 NOTICE re re Defendant Maricopa County's FRCP Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Disclosures by Maricopa, County of . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment A, #2 Supplement Attachment B)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 Filing 752 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Defendant Maricopa County by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 Filing 751 NOTICE re RULE 26(A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE IN WOLFSWINKEL by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
January 25, 2013 Filing 750 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
January 25, 2013 Filing 749 NOTICE re Defendants Arpaios', Roshetkos' and Halversons' Rule 26(a)(3) Witness and Exhibit Lists for Trial by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
January 25, 2013 Filing 748 NOTICE re RULE 26(A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE IN WOLFSWINKEL by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
January 25, 2013 Filing 747 NOTICE re Notice of Service of WOLFSWINKEL PLAINTIFFS FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND FRCP 26(A)(2)(A), (C) DISCLOSURE by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Kaban, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2013 Filing 746 NOTICE re Service of Discovery Responses by William Montgomery . (Orze, Victoria)
January 18, 2013 Filing 745 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2013 Filing 744 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference held on 1/15/2013. Counsel stipulate in the Wolfswinkel matter to file their Rule 26 exhibit/witness lists by 01/25/13. Discussion is held regarding the sealing of certain future documents in the Wolfswinkel matter. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the parties' #741 Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Production of Documents from the County. The Court gives counsel direction as stated on the record. No new deadlines are set at this time. APPEARANCES: Stefan Palys, Lawrence Wulkan and Lawrence Wright for Plaintiffs. Victoria Orze, Jeffrey Leonard, Sharon Shively (by phone), Douglas Drury (by phone), Charles Callahan (by phone), Barry Markson (by phone), Sarah Barnes (by phone) and Daryl Audilett (by phone) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 4:04 p.m. to 4:54 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 11, 2013 Filing 743 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #741 Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Production of Documents from the County, ORDERED setting a status conference for 01/15/13 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 9, 2013 Filing 742 NOTICE of Errata re #741 Statement, by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
January 9, 2013 Filing 741 STATEMENT of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Production of Documents from The County by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Defendant Maricopa, County of, Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
January 9, 2013 Filing 740 NOTICE of Deposition of Peter Spaw, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
January 9, 2013 Filing 739 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Thomas, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
January 9, 2013 Filing 738 NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Arpaio, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline Three (3) Business Days to Conduct Party Depositions (Doc. #733 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the jointly moving parties shall have up to and including 01/21/13, to conduct party depositions in Donahoe (CV-10-02756-PHX-NVW) and Stapley (CV-11-00902-PHX-NVW). Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/8/13. (NKS)
January 8, 2013 Filing 736 NOTICE of Deposition of Roger Clark, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2013 Filing 735 NOTICE of Deposition of Dwight Duncan (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
January 8, 2013 Filing 734 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Peter Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
January 8, 2013 Filing 733 STIPULATION /JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE THREE (3) BUSINESS DAYS TO CONDUCT PARTY DEPOSITIONS by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah)
January 8, 2013 Filing 732 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2)(A),(B) Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2013 Filing 731 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Leonard, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER granting the Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Doc. #729 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for completing discovery shall be extended from 01/16/13 to 01/25/13. All other case management deadlines are affirmed at this time. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/8/13. (NKS)
January 7, 2013 Filing 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
January 3, 2013 Filing 728 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANN AND ANDREW THOMAS THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT IN STAPLEY, ET AL. LAWSUIT by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
January 3, 2013 Filing 727 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANN AND ANDREW THOMAS FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT IN DONAHOE ET AL. by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc. 725). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Sandra and Paul Wilsons' Verified Second Amended Complaint and this action (CV-10-02758-PHX-NVW) ONLY with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/2/13.(LAD)
December 28, 2012 Filing 725 MOTION to Dismiss Case Stipulation for Dismissal re Wilson by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2012 Filing 724 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Cohen (continued), filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2012 Filing 723 Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-17809 for #716 Notice of Appeal. (REW)
December 26, 2012 Filing 722 NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Arpaio, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 26, 2012 Filing 721 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 26, 2012 Filing 720 NOTICE of Deposition of Peter Spaw, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 26, 2012 Filing 719 NOTICE of Deposition of Lisa Aubuchon, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER that Defendant's Motion (Doc. #708 ) is denied in part. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/21/12. (NKS)
December 21, 2012 Filing 717 ANSWER to #573 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by William Montgomery.(Orze, Victoria)
December 21, 2012 Filing 716 *NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #693 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #572 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Set Aside,, by William Montgomery. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-7591904. (Orze, Victoria) *Modified to correct Appeal event on 12/26/2012* (REW).
December 21, 2012 Filing 715 NOTICE of Errata Re Response to Motion for Clarification/Reconsideration of November 30, 2012, Ruling on Discovery Dispute by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Palys, Stefan)
December 20, 2012 Filing 714 * Response to Motion re #708 MOTION for Reconsideration /Clarification of November 30, 2012 Ruling on Discovery Dispute filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Palys, Stefan) * Modified to correct event on 12/20/2012 (LAD).
December 19, 2012 Filing 713 NOTICE re Removal of Daniel B. Mestaz as Attorney for Defendant Maricopa County by Maricopa, County of . (Mestaz, Daniel)
December 18, 2012 Filing 712 NOTICE re Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott Second Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement Regarding Police Procedures Expert Witness Bennie R. Click. (Markson, Barry)
December 18, 2012 Filing 711 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement Dated 12-18-12 re Supplemental Report of Expert Ben Click by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
December 17, 2012 Filing 710 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that any interested party may file by December 20, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. a response to Defendant Maricopa County's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. #708 ). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 14, 2012 Filing 709 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios', Halversons', Roshetkos', and Defendants Hendershotts' Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
December 13, 2012 Filing 708 MOTION for Reconsideration /Clarification of November 30, 2012 Ruling on Discovery Dispute by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
December 13, 2012 Filing 707 NOTICE re of Service of Plaintiffs Donald T. Stapley and Kathleen Stapley's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 11, 2012 Filing 706 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Dorrah, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 705 NOTICE of Deposition of Roger Clark, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 704 NOTICE of Deposition of Bruce Strombom, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 703 NOTICE of Deposition of Kathleen Stapley, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 702 NOTICE of Deposition of Cherie Donahoe, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 701 NOTICE of Deposition of Donald Stapley, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2012 Filing 700 NOTICE of Deposition of Lee Johnson, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2012 Filing 699 NOTICE of Deposition of Enrique Rodriguez, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
December 10, 2012 Filing 698 NOTICE of Deposition of Dwight Duncan (Videotaped), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
December 10, 2012 Filing 697 NOTICE of Deposition of Gerald N. Zaddack, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
December 10, 2012 Filing 696 NOTICE of Deposition of Bennie R. Click (Videotaped), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
December 10, 2012 Filing 695 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant William Montgomery by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Solanki, Lindsy)
December 7, 2012 Filing 694 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Dispute Proceedings held on 11/30/2012, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2013. (VAR)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER that Defendant William Montgomery's Motion to Dismiss Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. #592 ) is denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/07/12. (NKS)
December 6, 2012 Filing 692 * NOTICE re Subpoena by Maricopa, County of William Levine. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Attorney noticed regarding filing of discovery on 12/7/2012 (LAD).
December 6, 2012 Filing 691 * NOTICE re Subpoena by Maricopa, County of Andrew Cohn. (Leonard, Jeffrey) * Attorney noticed regarding filing of discovery documents on 12/7/2012 (LAD).
December 6, 2012 Filing 690 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe for proceedings held on 11/30/2012 before Judge Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 6, 2012 Filing 689 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe for proceedings held on 2/20/2012 before Judge Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 4, 2012 Filing 688 NOTICE of Deposition of William Levine, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2012 Filing 687 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Cohn, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2012 Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 11/30/2012 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2012 Filing 685 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi for proceedings held on 02/10/2012 before Judge Hon. Neil V. Wake.. (Mueller, James)
November 30, 2012 Filing 684 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference held on 11/30/2012. Counsel state their respective positions regarding the Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Scope of Donald Stapley's Deposition (Doc. #681 ). The Court rules on the discovery dispute as stated on the record. APPEARANCES: Stefan Palys and Lawrence Wulkan for Plaintiffs. Douglas Drury, Sharon Shively, Jeffrey Leonard (by phone), Barry Markson (by phone), Sarah Barnes (by phone), Charles Callahan (by phone) and Daryl Audilett (by phone) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 30, 2012 Filing 683 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 10/25/2012, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013. (VAR)
November 30, 2012 Filing 682 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #681 Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Scope of Donald Stapley's Deposition, ORDERED setting a status conference for 11/30/12 at 3:30 PM (TODAY) in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Only counsel who are involved in this dispute are required to attend. All other counsel are welcome to attend if they wish. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 29, 2012 Filing 681 STATEMENT of JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONCERNING THE SCOPE OF DONALD STAPLEYS DEPOSITION by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER that the Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Thirty (30) Days to Conduct Party Depositions (Doc. #679 ) is granted, and the time to complete party depositions is extended to 01/16/13. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/28/12. (NKS)
November 28, 2012 Filing 679 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines Thirty (30) Days to Conduct Party Depositions by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Sarah)
November 26, 2012 Filing 678 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Colin F Campbell and Kathleen Erin Brody OMeara, counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER that, Independent Bar Counsel in the Peter Spaw Bar Proceeding, John Gleason, James Sudler or their duly authorized representative, is authorized to attend and to participate in the questioning of any deponent in this case unless, solely in the instance of a deponent who is also a Defendant, that Defendant objects to being questioned by Bar Counsel, in which case, that Defendant may be subject to being deposed separately in the Bar Proceeding. FURTHER ORDERED that any Defendant who does not consent to being deposed by Bar Counsel in this case shall provide notice to counsel for Defendant Spaw more than 10 days prior to the time that the deposition is scheduled. FURTHER ORDERED permitting service of a deposition subpoena in the Bar Proceeding during the deposition of any Defendant or other witness is this case for a separate deposition in the Bar Proceeding. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/21/12. (NKS)
November 21, 2012 Filing 676 REPLY to Response to Motion re #652 MOTION REPLY TO AUBUCHON AND PESTALOZZI RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE DISCOVERY WITH BAR PROCEEDINGS filed by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw. (Callahan, Charles)
November 21, 2012 Filing 675 NOTICE of Deposition of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Donald Stapley, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
November 21, 2012 Filing 674 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Thomas (Second Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
November 14, 2012 Filing 673 NOTICE of Errata re #672 Response to Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
November 12, 2012 Filing 672 RESPONSE to Motion re #652 MOTION to Consolidate Discovery with Bar Proceedings filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
November 7, 2012 Filing 671 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Thomas (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
November 7, 2012 Filing 670 NOTICE of Deposition of Lisa Aubuchon (Second Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
November 7, 2012 Filing 669 NOTICE of Deposition of Videotaped Deposition of Donald Stapley, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
November 6, 2012 Filing 668 NOTICE of Deposition of Videotaped Deposition of Brad Scott, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 667 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER that individually named Defendants Arpaio, Hendershott, Thomas, Aubuchon and Spaw and their respective counsel need not personally attend the mediations set in the Donahoe, Wilson and Stapley cases, but they may attend if any of them wish to attend. Further, the three mediations currently being scheduled for 11/26/12; 11/29/12; and 12/05/12; it is granted that the parties may have an extension of the 11/30/12 deadline to mediate. The deadline to mediate is extended to 12/14/12. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 11/5/12. (NKS)
November 5, 2012 Filing 665 STIPULATION and Request Re Mediation Attendance, and Request for Short Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
November 5, 2012 Filing 664 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Maricopa County's Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Shively, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 663 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Maricopa County's Amended Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Shively, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 662 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Maricopa County's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Maricopa, County of . (Shively, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 661 NOTICE of Deposition of Notice of Continued Videotaped Deposition of Gary Donahoe, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Shively, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 660 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel for proceedings held on 10/25/2012 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Wright, Lawrence)
November 1, 2012 Filing 659 NOTICE of Deposition of Second Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Brian Dorrah, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2012 Filing 658 NOTICE of Deposition of Second Amended Notice of Video Deposition of Gary Tharaldson, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER that the Scheduling Order entered on 06/01/12 (as to the Wolfswinkel case only) is hereby modified. The deadline for completing fact discovery, including all disclosure required under Rule 26(a)(3), shall be 01/16/13. Expert depositions shall be completed no later than 01/16/13. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/26/12. (NKS)
October 26, 2012 Filing 656 NOTICE re of Service of Plaintiffs Gary and Cherie Donahoe's Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Palys, Stefan)
October 26, 2012 Filing 655 STIPULATION Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2012 Filing 654 NOTICE of Deposition of Joan Ann Stoops, filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Audilett, Daryl)
October 25, 2012 Filing 653 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2012. Counsel state their respective positions regarding the #639 Joint Summary of Discovery Dispute. The Court declines to take any action or relief for the reasons stated on the record. APPEARANCES: Lawrence Wright and Shannon Eagan (telephonically) for Plaintiffs. Jeffrey Leonard, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson and Daryl Audilett (telephonically) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 25, 2012 Filing 652 *MOTION to Consolidate Discovery With Bar Proceedings by Defendants Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2012-10-25 Exh 1 to Motion to Consolidate Discovery)(Callahan, Charles) *Modified to motion type on 10/26/2012 (TLJ).
October 24, 2012 Filing 651 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 23, 2012 Filing 650 REPLY re #642 Reply, SUR-REPLY TO DEFS' REPLY RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Consol Plaintiffs ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
October 23, 2012 Filing 649 NOTICE of Deposition of Gary Tharaldson, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #647 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 23, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX127363 as to Lindsy Solanki. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 23, 2012 Filing 647 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lindsy Solanki on behalf of Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, and Conley D Wolfswinkel. (BAS)
October 19, 2012 Filing 646 NOTICE re Service of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' FRCP 26(A)(2),(B) Disclosure of Rebuttal Police Procedures Experts Roger Clark by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Eagan, Shannon)
October 19, 2012 Filing 645 REPLY to Response to Motion re #592 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
October 19, 2012 Filing 644 NOTICE re Service of Thomas' Sixth Supplemental Disclosure Statement in Wolfswinkel by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER setting a hearing on the Joint Summary of Discovery Dispute (Doc. #639 ) on 10/25/12, at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. Plaintiff Wolfswinkel may file a sur-reply to Defendants' Reply (Doc. #642 ) by 10/23/12. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/19/12. (NKS)
October 18, 2012 Filing 642 REPLY re #640 Order, Defendants' Reply re Discovery Dispute by Defendants Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Lisa Aubuchon, Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott, Maricopa, County of, Peter R Pestalozzi, Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2012 Filing 641 NOTICE of Deposition of Gary Tharaldson, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER as to the Summary of Discovery Dispute (Doc. #639 ), that Defendants file a further brief statement by 9:00 AM, 10/18/12, stating their specific reply to Plaintiffs' explanation, whether Defendants dispute the truthfulness of Plaintiffs' explanation, and if so, on what basis, and what is insufficient about Plaintiffs' proposal. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/17/12. (NKS)
October 16, 2012 Filing 639 MOTION for Discovery Joint Summary of Discovery Dispute by ABCDW LLC, Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Lisa Aubuchon, Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott, Maricopa, County of, Peter R Pestalozzi, Stone Canyon LLC, Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2012 Filing 638 NOTICE of Deposition of Amended Notice of Deposition of Brian Dorrah, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2012 Filing 637 NOTICE of Deposition of Lisa Aubuchon (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 10, 2012 Filing 636 NOTICE re Service of Response to Defendants Andrew and Ann Thomas' Second Request for Production by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Palys, Stefan)
October 10, 2012 Filing 635 NOTICE re Service of Response to Defendants' Andrew and Ann Thomas' First Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Palys, Stefan)
October 10, 2012 Filing 634 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' Supplemental Disclosure Statement Dated 10-10-12 by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
October 9, 2012 Filing 633 RESPONSE in Opposition re #592 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Eagan, Shannon)
October 9, 2012 Filing 632 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Sharad H Desai and Christina Claire Rubalcava, counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Campbell, Colin)
October 9, 2012 Filing 631 NOTICE of Deposition of Joseph Arpaio (Videotaped), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 9, 2012 Filing 630 NOTICE of Deposition of David Hendershott (Videotaped), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 9, 2012 Filing 629 NOTICE of Deposition of Lisa Aubuchon (Videotaped), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 5, 2012 Filing 628 NOTICE re Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REGARDING POLICE PROCEDURES EXPERT WITNESS BENNIE R. CLICK. (Markson, Barry)
October 5, 2012 Filing 627 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' Rule 26 Disclosure Statement Regarding Police Procedures Expert Bennie R. Click by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
October 3, 2012 Filing 626 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria Lea Orze. (Orze, Victoria)
October 3, 2012 Filing 625 NOTICE of Deposition of Rich Johnson, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 3, 2012 Filing 624 NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Freeman (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
October 2, 2012 Filing 623 *NOTICE of Waiver of Electronic Service re Attorney Erica J. Shoaf by Peter Spaw . (Dichter, Stephen) *Modified to correct event type on 10/3/2012 (LFIG).
October 1, 2012 Filing 622 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Peter Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
October 1, 2012 Filing 621 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Club Vista Financial Services, LLC. (Shively, Sharon)
September 28, 2012 Filing 620 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Palys, Stefan)
September 28, 2012 Filing 619 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Palys, Stefan)
September 28, 2012 Filing 618 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Palys, Stefan)
September 28, 2012 Filing 617 NOTICE of Deposition of Brian Dorrah, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2012 Filing 616 NOTICE re Service of Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement in Wolfswinkel lawsuit by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
September 28, 2012 Filing 615 NOTICE re Service of Third Supplemental Disclosure Statements in Donahoe, Stapley and Wilson lawsuits by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
September 28, 2012 Filing 614 NOTICE re Notice of Service re Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
September 28, 2012 Filing 613 NOTICE of Deposition of Patrick Roshetko (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 28, 2012 Filing 612 NOTICE of Deposition of Jonathan Halverson (Amended), filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER (applicable in all cases except No. CV 11-00116-PHX-NVW) that the settlement conference deadline scheduled for September 30, 2012 be continued to November 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/27/12. (NKS)
September 27, 2012 Filing 610 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion for Extension of Settlement Conference Deadline by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shively, Sharon)
September 27, 2012 Filing 609 NOTICE re of Service by Maricopa, County of DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Applicable in Wolfswinkel). (Shively, Sharon)
September 25, 2012 Filing 608 NOTICE of Deposition of Patrick Roshetko, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 607 NOTICE of Deposition of Jonathan Halverson, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 606 NOTICE of Deposition of Brandon Luth, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 605 NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Freeman, filed by Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 604 NOTICE of Deposition of Jeff Gentry, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 603 NOTICE of Deposition of Rich Burden, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 602 NOTICE of Deposition of Bill Knight, filed by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 25, 2012 Filing 601 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios, Halversons and Roshetkos' Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
September 25, 2012 Filing 600 NOTICE re Notice of Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
September 24, 2012 Filing 599 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
September 24, 2012 Filing 598 NOTICE re NOTICE OF SERVICE by Maricopa, County of DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Holden, Helen)
September 24, 2012 Filing 597 NOTICE re Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement Regarding Expert Witnesses in Wolfswinkel, et al. Lawsuit by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
September 21, 2012 Filing 596 NOTICE re Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REGARDING EXPERT WITNESSES. (Markson, Barry)
September 21, 2012 Filing 595 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's FRCP 26(a)(2)(A),(B) Disclosure. (Shively, Sharon)
September 21, 2012 Filing 594 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena Duces Tecum of SolarReserve, LLC. (Shively, Sharon)
September 21, 2012 Filing 593 *NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Harqua Solar LLC, LLC. (Shively, Sharon) *Modified to correct name on the subpoena on 9/21/2012 (LSP).
September 20, 2012 Filing 592 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
September 18, 2012 Filing 591 NOTICE of Deposition of Amended Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Conley Wolfswinkel, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2012 Filing 590 Appeal Document by William Montgomery re #585 Notice of Appeal AMENDED Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal. (Orze, Victoria)
September 14, 2012 Filing 589 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria Lea Orze. (Orze, Victoria)
September 14, 2012 Filing 588 Appeal Document by William Montgomery re #585 Notice of Appeal Withdrawal of Notice of Appeal. (Orze, Victoria)
September 14, 2012 Filing 587 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lea Orze on behalf of William Montgomery. (Orze, Victoria)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER that line 17 after the words "County Attorney" and line 18 on page 4 of the order of August 28, 2012, (Doc. #572 ) are stricken. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/14/12. (NKS)
September 13, 2012 Filing 585 WITHDRAWN by #588 and 590 - NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to #572 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion to Set Aside, by William Montgomery. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-7228116. (Orze, Victoria) *Modified on 9/19/2012; appeal withdrawn prior to being opened by Ninth Circuit* (REW).
September 13, 2012 Filing 584 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: #549 Judgment on Attorney Fees, by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Campbell, Colin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 583 *NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Gregory Como, counsel for Intervenor Plaintiff Charles Hoskins (named Request To Be Removed From Service List). (Como, Gregory) *Modified to correct event on 9/17/2012 (CMAL).
September 11, 2012 Filing 582 NOTICE of Deposition of Conley Wolfswinkel, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2012 Filing 581 NOTICE of Deposition of Brandon Wolfswinkel, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2012 Filing 580 NOTICE of Deposition of Ashton Wolfswinkel, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2012 Filing 579 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon D Wolfswinkel, W Harquahala LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, ABCDW LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. William Montgomery served on 8/30/2012. (Wright, Lawrence)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER that individually named Defendants Arpaio, Halverson, Roshetko, Hendershott, Thomas, and Aubuchon and their respective counsel need not personally attend the mediation set in Wolfswinkel v. Arpaio, et al., for 09/14/12, but they may attend if any of them want to attend. Defendant Montgomery, who has not yet answered the Amended Complaint, and/or his counsel, may also attend if either or both wants to attend. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/10/12. (NKS)
September 5, 2012 Filing 577 STIPULATION Regarding Mediation Attendance in Wolfswinkel Only by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
August 31, 2012 Filing 576 NOTICE re Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Custodian of Records of Maricopa County Superior Court by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Sarah)
August 30, 2012 Filing 575 Summons Issued as to William Montgomery. (LFIG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 30, 2012 Filing 574 SUMMONS Submitted by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
August 30, 2012 Filing 573 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Lisa Aubuchon, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott, Maricopa, County of, William Montgomery, Peter R Pestalozzi, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko, Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas, filed by Brandon D Wolfswinkel, W Harquahala LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, ABCDW LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel.(Wright, Lawrence)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER that the Maricopa County's #514 Amended Motion for Reconsideration is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' #565 Motion to Set Aside is granted. The Wolfswinkel plaintiffs are given leave without further order of the Court to file an amended complaint by September 7, 2012, to name Montgomery as a defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/28/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.)(LFIG)
August 27, 2012 Filing 571 NOTICE re of Service by Maricopa, County of Supplemental Response to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Defendant Maricopa County. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2012 Filing 570 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas Second Request for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Gary Donahoe and Cherie Donahoe by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER approving the substitution of Michael C. Manning, Larry J. Wulkan, and Stefan M. Palys, of the law firm of Stinson Morrison Hecker, LLP, as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Donald Stapley and Kathleen Stapley, in place of Merwin D. Grant and Kenneth B. Vaughn of Grant & Vaughn, P.C. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/20/12. (NKS)
August 17, 2012 Filing 568 STIPULATION Stipulation and Consent for Substitution of Counsel for Stapley Plaintiffs by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Michael)
August 17, 2012 Filing 567 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel Notice of Service of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' FRCP 26(a)(2)(A), (B) (Kaban, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2012 Filing 566 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel Notice of Service of Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement re Computation of Damages and FRCP 26(A)(2)(A), (C) Disclosure (Kaban, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2012 Filing 565 MOTION to Set Aside #70 Order Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Court's May 26, 2011 Order Dismissing William Montgomery as a Party-Defendant by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Kaban, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2012 Filing 564 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Stapleys' First Request for Production of Documents by Maricopa, County of . (Mestaz, Daniel)
August 15, 2012 Filing 563 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Responses and Objections to Defendants' Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R Pestalozzi's Request for Production of Documents and Things by Maricopa, County of . (Mestaz, Daniel)
August 15, 2012 Filing 562 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Responses and Objections to Defendants Andrew and Ann Thomas' First Request for Production of Documents and Things by Maricopa, County of . (Mestaz, Daniel)
August 15, 2012 Filing 561 NOTICE re Service of Thomas Responses to Plaintiff Stapleys First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
August 14, 2012 Filing 560 NOTICE re Service of Donahoes' Response to Defendants Hendershotts' First Set of Requests for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 559 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to Defendants Hendershotts' First Set of Request for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE re Service of Donahoes' Response to Defendants Hendershotts' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to Defendants Hendershotts' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE re Sesrvice of Donahoes' Response to Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents from Defendant Maricopa County by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 555 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents From Defendant Maricopa County by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
August 14, 2012 Filing 554 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Stapleys' Responses to Maricopa County's Second Set of Requests for Production by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Vaughn, Kenneth)
August 14, 2012 Filing 553 NOTICE of Deposition of Sandra Wilson, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2012 Filing 552 NOTICE of Deposition of Gary Donahoe, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2012 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/26/2012, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012. (VAR)
August 9, 2012 Filing 550 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CONLEY WOLFSWINKEL ET AL.'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANTS AUBUCHON AND PESTALOZZI, MARICOPA COUNTY, AND HENDERSHOTT (Kaban, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2012 Filing 549 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the Court's Order filed August 8, 2012, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiffs Mary Rose Wilcox and Earl Wilcox against Maricopa County in the amount of $9,935.83, with interest thereon at the federal rate of.21 percent per annum from the date of judgment until paid.(LAD)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Wilcox's Motion for Award ofAttorneys' Fees and Expenses (Doc. 535) is granted in the amount of $9,935.83. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter a further judgment in favor of Plaintiffs Mary Rose Wilcox and Earl Wilcox against Maricopa County in the amount of $9,935.83, with interest thereon at the federal rate of.21% per annum from the date of judgment until paid. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/7/12.(LAD)
August 6, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios', Halversons' and Roshetkos' First Request for Production of Documents to Maricopa County by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
August 2, 2012 Filing 546 NOTICE of Deposition of Andrew Thomas, filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Manning, Michael)
July 30, 2012 Filing 545 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Response to Plaintiff Stapley's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
July 30, 2012 Filing 544 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward P Moriarity. (Moriarity, Edward)
July 30, 2012 Filing 543 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Stapleys' Responses to Defendants Hendershotts First Set of Request for Admission, Request for Production and Non-Uniform Interrogatories by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Vaughn, Kenneth)
July 30, 2012 Filing 542 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Stapley Responses to Thomas' First Set of Requests for Production by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Vaughn, Kenneth)
July 27, 2012 Filing 541 NOTICE re of Service of Response to Plaintiffs Stapleys' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
July 26, 2012 Filing 540 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2012. Appearances: Lawrence Wright and Michael Manning for Plaintiffs; Jeffrey Leonard and Daniel Mestaz for Defendant Maricopa County. Also present: Maricopa County Attorney Bill Montgomery. Discussion is held. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the #514 Amended Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order. The Court takes the #514 Motion under advisement. Written order to issue. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 25, 2012 Filing 539 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #538 Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation, ORDERED granting the aforementioned motion. FURTHER ORDERED modifying the Court's #465 Scheduling Order by extending the deadline for engaging in good faith settlement talks from 08/31/12 to 09/28/12 (not 09/14/12 as stated in Plaintiffs' motion). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 25, 2012 Filing 538 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Lawrence)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER that the Court has received a letter from Maricopa County Attorney Montgomery that is relevant to matters at issue in this case and the pending motion re #514 MOTION for Reconsideration and is accordingly hereby made part of the record in this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/23/12. (DMT)
July 20, 2012 Filing 536 REPLY to Response to Motion re #525 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order, #514 MOTION for Reconsideration re #460 Order, and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order filed by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2012 Filing 535 * MOTION for Attorney Fees Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(OMeara, Kathleen).*Modified to Add MOTION for Expenses on 7/23/2012 (DMT).
July 20, 2012 Filing 534 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties are advised that only the attorneys participating in the July 26, 2012 hearing on Defendant Maricopa County's #514 Amended Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order are required to appear. All other attorneys of record are welcome to attend, but their presence is not required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER: The hearing on Defendant Maricopa County's #514 Amended Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order is rescheduled from 07/25/12 at 10:00 AM to 07/26/12 at 2:00 PM. All counsel are advised to notify the Court immediately if they will be unable to attend the new hearing time. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/20/12. (NKS)
July 13, 2012 Filing 532 RESPONSE in Opposition re #514 MOTION for Reconsideration re #460 Order, and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order, #513 MOTION for Reconsideration re #460 Order, and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order, #525 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Maricopa County's Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order filed by Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Kaban, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2012 Filing 531 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Request for Production of Documents and Things and Non-Uniform Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Conley D. Wolfswinkel by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Charles Hoskins' Motion to Intervene (Doc.444 in CV10-2756) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mary Rose and Earl Wilcoxs Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Doc. 457 in CV10-2756) is granted. Wilcox shall submit proof and itemization of her claim for further fees by July 21, 2012. The County may file a response by August 4, 2012. Wilcox may file a reply by August 11, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Maricopa County's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (Doc. 41 in CV11- 0473) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that execution on the judgment (Doc. 39 in CV11-0473) is stayed pending appeal. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/5/12.(LAD)
July 6, 2012 Filing 529 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #525 Supplement to Motion for Reconsideration of May 31, 2012 is allowed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
July 5, 2012 Filing 528 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas Second Supplemental Disclosure Statements in Donahoe, Stapley and Wilson lawsuits by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
July 5, 2012 Filing 527 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas Third Supplemental Disclosure Statement in Wolfswinkel lawsuit by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER setting hearing on Defendant Maricopa County's #514 Amended Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order on 07/25/12, at 10:00 AM. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a response to the Motion by 07/13/12. The County may file a reply by 07/20/12. The County Attorney is invited to appear also at the hearing to present his position. The County is ordered to supply the County Attorney with a copy of this order to inform him of the invitation. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/3/12. (NKS)
July 3, 2012 Filing 525 Supplemental MOTION for Reconsideration and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2012 Filing 524 NOTICE re of Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Requests for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory to Plaintiffs Donald Stapley, Jr. and Kathleen Stapley. (Markson, Barry)
June 29, 2012 Filing 523 NOTICE re of Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Requests for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory to Plaintiffs Wolfswinkel. (Markson, Barry)
June 29, 2012 Filing 522 NOTICE re of Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Requests for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory to Plaintiffs Sandra and Paul Wilson. (Markson, Barry)
June 29, 2012 Filing 521 NOTICE re of Service by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things and First Set of Requests for Admission and Non-Uniform Interrogatory to Plaintiffs Gary and Cherie Donahoe. (Markson, Barry)
June 29, 2012 Filing 520 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Stapleys' First Set of Request for Production to Defendants by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Grant, Merwin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 519 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANN AND ANDREW THOMAS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO PLAINTIFFS SANDRA WILSON AND PAUL WILSON by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 29, 2012 Filing 518 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANDREW AND ANN THOMASS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO PLAINTIFFS DONALD T. STAPLEY, JR. AND KATHLEEN STAPLEY by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 29, 2012 Filing 517 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANN AND ANDREW THOMAS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTY by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 29, 2012 Filing 516 NOTICE re SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANN AND ANDREW THOMAS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO PLAINTIFFS GARY DONAHOE AND CHERIE DONAHOE by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 29, 2012 Filing 515 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Maricopa County by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 514 AMENDED MOTION for Reconsideration re #460 Order, and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2012 Filing 513 MOTION for Reconsideration re #460 Order, and Modification of May 31, 2012 Order by Maricopa, County of. (Leonard, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2012 Filing 512 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Second Set of Requests for Production to Wilson Plaintiffs. (Shively, Sharon)
June 29, 2012 Filing 511 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiffs Donahoe. (Shively, Sharon)
June 29, 2012 Filing 510 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Request for Production of Documents and Things to Stapley by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 509 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Non Uniform Interrogatories to Stapley by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 508 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Request for Production of Documents and Things to Wilson by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 507 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Non-Uniform Interrogatories to Wilson by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 506 * NOTICE of Service of Defendant Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Request for Production of Documents and Things to Donahoe by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 29, 2012 Filing 505 * NOTICE of Service of Defendants Aubuchon and Pestalozzi's Non-Uniform Interrogatories to Donahoe by Peter R Pestalozzi, Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) * Modified to add additional filer on 7/2/2012 (LAD).
June 28, 2012 Filing 504 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Second Set of Requests of Production of Documents to the Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs. (Shively, Sharon)
June 28, 2012 Filing 503 NOTICE re Notice of Service by Maricopa, County of Maricopa County's Second Set of Requests of Production of Documents to the Stapley Plaintiffs. (Shively, Sharon)
June 28, 2012 Filing 502 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Aubuchon's Answers to Plaintiff Sandra Wilson's First Request For Admissions by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
June 28, 2012 Filing 501 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Aubuchon's Answers to Plaintiff Gary Donahoe's First Request for Admissions by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
June 27, 2012 Filing 500 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas' Responses to Plaintiff Wilson's First Requests for Admissions by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas (Barnes, Sarah) by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 27, 2012 Filing 499 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann and Andrew Thomas' Responses to Plaintiff Donahoe's First Requests for Admissions by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 27, 2012 Filing 498 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios, Halversons and Roshetkos' Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 26, 2012 Filing 497 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 6/26/2012. Appearances: Kathleen OMeara for Wilcox Plaintiffs; Jeffrey Leonard, James Armstrong, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury and Barry Markson for Defendants. Greg Como and Carl Mariano for Intervenor Charles Hoskins. Plaintiffs' counsel and Intervenor's counsel argue their respective positions regarding the #444 Amended Motion to Intervene. The Court takes the #444 Motion under advisement. Written order to issue. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
June 22, 2012 Filing 496 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Roshetkos' Responses to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 22, 2012 Filing 495 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Halversons' Responses to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 22, 2012 Filing 494 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Responses to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 21, 2012 Filing 493 NOTICE re of Service of Plaintiffs Stapleys' Responses to Maricopa County's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley . (Vaughn, Kenneth)
June 21, 2012 Filing 492 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on 2/10/2012, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2012. (VAR)
June 21, 2012 Filing 491 NOTICE re Service of Donahoe's Response to First Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories from Defendants Spaw by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 21, 2012 Filing 490 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on the #444 Amended Motion to Intervene for 06/26/12 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
June 20, 2012 Filing 489 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things from Defendants Spaw by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 488 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to First Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories from Defendants Spaw by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 487 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to First Set of Requests for Admission from Defendants Spaw by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 486 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to First Set of Interrogatories from Defendant Maricopa County by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 485 NOTICE re Service of Wilsons' Response to First Set of Requests for Production of Documents from Defendant Maricopa County by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 484 NOTICE re Service of Donahoe's Response to First Set of Requests for Admission from Defendants Spaw by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 483 NOTICE re Service of Donahoe's Responses to Defendants Spaws' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 482 NOTICE re Service of Donahoe's Responses to First Set of Requests For Production of Documents from Defendant Maricopa County by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 481 NOTICE re Service of Donahoe's Response to First Set of Interrogatories from Defendant Maricopa County by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 20, 2012 Filing 480 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Hendershott's Responses to Plaintiff Sandra Wilson's First Request for Admissions by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
June 20, 2012 Filing 479 NOTICE re of Service of Defendants Hendershott's Responses to Plaintiff Gary Donahoe's First Request for Admissions by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
June 20, 2012 Filing 478 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Responses to Plaintiffs Wilsons' First Requests for Admissions by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 20, 2012 Filing 477 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Responses to Plaintiffs Donahoes' Requests for Admissions by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 18, 2012 Filing 476 NOTICE re of Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Conley D Wolfswinkel . (Kaban, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2012 Filing 475 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilson by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 15, 2012 Filing 474 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 15, 2012 Filing 473 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
June 15, 2012 Filing 472 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann And Andrew Thomas Responses to Plaintiff Wolfswinkels First Set of Requests For The Production of Documents by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 15, 2012 Filing 471 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Ann And Andrew Thomas Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
June 14, 2012 Filing 470 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson for proceedings held on February 10, 2012 before Judge Wake.. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
June 11, 2012 Filing 469 REPLY to Response to Motion re #457 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Charles Hoskins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Charles Hoskins)(Como, Gregory)
June 8, 2012 Filing 468 NOTICE re of Service of Defendants Hendershott's Responses to Plaintiffs Wolfswinkel First Set of Requests for Production by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
June 8, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Response to Plaintiff Conley Wolfswinkel's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents by Defendants by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER: #376 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, joined by Defendants Andrew and Ann Thomas (Doc. 378), is denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/7/12. (NKS)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 SCHEDULING ORDER (applicable in the Wolfswinkel matter ONLY): Discovery due by 12/14/2012. Dispositive motions due by 2/1/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2013. FIRM Jury Trial set for 5/28/2013 at 8:45 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/1/12. (NKS)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ** MODIFIED PER ORDER 1011 AS TO FILING OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ** SCHEDULING ORDER (NOT applicable in the Wolfswinkel matter): Discovery due by 3/15/2013. Dispositive motions due by 8/9/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2013. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/1/12. (NKS) Modified on 8/8/2013 (LAD).
June 1, 2012 Filing 463 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument/Scheduling Conference held on 6/1/2012. Appearances: Lawrence Wulkan, Jeffrey Kaban, Stephen Neal, Lawrence Wright, Merwin Grant and Kenneth Vaughn for Plaintiffs; Daryl Audilett, Charles Callahan, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson, Jeff Leonard and Daniel Mestaz for Defendants. Discussion is held. Scheduling Orders outlining the case management deadlines to follow. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the #376 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. The Court takes the motion under advisement. Order to issue shortly. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox shall have judgment against Defendant Maricopa County for: 1) $975,000.00 in principal damages and 2) $27,222.00 in attorney fees and $1,089.56 expenses since 04/09/12, and 3) interest on the foregoing amounts at the federal rate of.21% per annum from the date of judgment until paid. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/1/12. (NKS)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER: #355 Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Stay Discovery Obligations is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that final judgment be entered by separate document in favor of Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox against Defendant Maricopa County in accordance with the settlement agreement made 04/09/12, as follows: Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox shall have judgment against Defendant Maricopa County for: A. 1) $975,000.00 in principal damages and 2) $27,222.00 in attorney fees and $1,089.56 expenses since 04/09/12, and 3) interest on the foregoing amounts at the federal rate of.21% per annum from the date of judgment until paid. B. Except for the rights expressly stated in this judgment, all claims of Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox that are brought or could have been brought in this action against any Defendant and that arise out of the transactions or occurrences alleged in this action are extinguished. Other than as expressly provided in this judgment, the parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court reserves jurisdiction to decide the #444 Motion to Intervene, which is not fully briefed, and Wilcox's claim for additional attorney fees award against Maricopa County on that motion. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/1/12. (NKS)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER: Plaintiff Wolfswinkel's #459 motion to compel discovery is granted. The County shall give the discovery demanded, failing which Plaintiff Wolfswinkel may seek further sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/31/12. (NKS)
May 30, 2012 Filing 459 *STATEMENT of Joint Summary of Discovery Dispute by Consol Plaintiff Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Kaban, Jeffrey) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); attorney notified on 5/31/2012 (LSP).
May 30, 2012 Filing 458 DECLARATION of Kathleen O'Meara re #457 Response to Motion [DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN O'MEARA IN SUPPORT OF THE WILCOXES' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE] by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-O)(OMeara, Kathleen)
May 30, 2012 Filing 457 *RESPONSE to Motion re #444 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen) *Modified to add motion type on 5/30/2012 (LSP).
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER: The parties should prepare to discuss at the 06/01/12 case scheduling conference: 1) Concluding fact discovery by 12/14/12. 2) What expert testimony is contemplated, why it is necessary, and why expert disclosures and discovery cannot be done by the close of fact discovery. 3) Why good faith settlement meetings as to individual cases and with assistance of mediators cannot be done by 08/31/12, by which time the depositions of the parties should be completed. 4) Why the Wolfswinkel case should not be set on a separate schedule with early anticipated trial date. 5) All other matters. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/30/12. (NKS)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER denying #450 Motion to Consolidate Case with CV 12-1076 PHX-PGR. The Clerk shall file this order in No. CV 12-1076-PHX-PGR and in No. CV 10-2756-PHX-NVW. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/30/12.(LSP)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER: Schuerman, No. CV 10-02757-PHX-NVW; Wetzel, No. CV 11-00262-PHX-NVW; and Mundell, No. CV 11-01921-PHX-NVW are deleted from the caption in these consolidated cases, and they shall not be included in future filings. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/30/12. (NKS)
May 29, 2012 Filing 453 *Joinder IN #452 DEFENDANTS LISA AUBUCHON AND PETER R. PESTALOZZIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 8(a), FEDERAL RULES OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) *Modified to add document number on 5/30/2012 (LSP).
May 29, 2012 Filing 452 REPLY to Response to Motion re #376 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a) Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
May 29, 2012 Filing 451 NOTICE re Notice of Motion for Consolidation by Lisa Randall re #450 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs Lisa Randall, Brenna Randall and Tracy Allen's Motion for Consolidation . (Gerry, Richard)
May 29, 2012 Filing 450 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiffs Lisa Randall, Brenna Randall and Tracy Allen's Motion for Consolidation by Lisa Randall. (Gerry, Richard)
May 25, 2012 Filing 449 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER approving the substitution of Jeffrey S. Leonard, Sharon B. Shively, Helen R. Holden and Daniel B. Mestaz for Steven A. LaMar, Nicole Suzanne Kaseta, and Rebeca Hoeffer Moskowitz as counsel for Defendant Maricopa County re granting #447 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/25/12.(TLJ)
May 24, 2012 Filing 447 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Application for Substitution of Counsel for Maricopa County by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Substitution of Attorney)(Leonard, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2012 Filing 446 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaios' Amended Initial Disclosure Statement by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
May 22, 2012 Filing 445 Joinder re #442 Response in Opposition to Motion, For Stay Pending Appeal by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Grant, Merwin)
May 22, 2012 Filing 444 AMENDED MOTION to Intervene by Charles Hoskins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Como, Gregory)
May 22, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE of Errata re #430 Intervenor Complaint, #431 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Plaintiff Charles Hoskins. (Como, Gregory)
May 21, 2012 Filing 442 RESPONSE in Opposition re #376 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a) Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wulkan, Lawrence)
May 18, 2012 Filing 441 NOTICE re Regarding Transcript of Oral Argument for Appeal by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
May 18, 2012 Filing 440 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Wilson by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
May 18, 2012 Filing 439 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Callahan, Charles)
May 18, 2012 Filing 438 NOTICE re Service of First Requests for Admissions to Defendants Aubuchon, Arpaio, Hendershott and Thomas by Gary Donahoe, Sandra Wilson . (Wulkan, Lawrence)
May 18, 2012 Filing 437 NOTICE re Service of First Supplemental Disclosure Statements in Donahoe, Stapley and Wilson Lawsuits by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
May 18, 2012 Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing. Proceedings held on 5/11/2012, before Judge Neil V. Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A. Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (VAR)
May 18, 2012 Filing 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox for proceedings held on 5/11/2012 before Judge Wake.. (OMeara, Kathleen)
May 18, 2012 Filing 434 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Wilson Plaintiffs by Maricopa, County of . (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
May 18, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Donahoe Plaintiffs by Maricopa, County of . (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
May 18, 2012 Filing 432 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Stapley Plaintiffs by Maricopa, County of . (Kaseta, Nicole)
May 18, 2012 Filing 431 * MOTION to Intervene by Charles Hoskins. (Mariano, Carl) * Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); attorney notified on 5/21/2012 (LAD).
May 18, 2012 Filing 430 * LODGED Proposed Intervenor COMPLAINT In Intervention, filed by Charles Hoskins.(Mariano, Carl) * Modified to correct event. Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c); attorney notified on 5/21/2012 (LAD).
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER pursuant to #428 Stipulation (re: CV-11-473-PHX-NVW): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Wilcoxes' attorneys' fees in the amount of $27,222.00 and costs in the amount of $1,089.56 are reasonable for the work performed during the period from April 10 through May 11, 2012. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/17/12. (LAD)
May 17, 2012 Filing 428 STIPULATION [STIPULATION TO REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND NONTAXABLE COSTS] by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(OMeara, Kathleen)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER pursuant to #425 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the action by Plaintiff Susan Schuerman (CV-10-2757-PHX-NVW) against Maricopa County; Sheriff Joseph Arpaio and Ava Arpaio, husband and wife; Andrew Thomas and Ann Thomas, husband and wife; Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi, wife and husband; and David Hendershott and Anna Hendershott, husband and wife is hereby dismissed with prejudice.Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs incurred. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/16/12. (LAD)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER pursuant to #424 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the action by Plaintiff Barbara Mundell (CV-11-01921- PHX-NVW) against Maricopa County, a body politic of the State of Arizona; Joseph Arpaio, individually, and in his official capacity as Maricopa County Sheriff; Joseph and Ava Arpaio, a married couple; David Hendershott and Anna Hendershott, a married couple; Lisa Aubuchon and Peter Pestalozzi, a married couple; and Andrew P. Thomas and Ann Thomas, a married couple is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys fees and costs incurred. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/16/12. (LAD)
May 16, 2012 Filing 425 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Action Filed by Plaintiff Susan Schuerman by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
May 16, 2012 Filing 424 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Action Filed by Plaintiff Barbara Mundell by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
May 15, 2012 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Michael Callahan on behalf of Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw. (Callahan, Charles)
May 15, 2012 Filing 422 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Amended Transcript Request by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on 5/11/2012 before Judge Wake.. (Liddy, Thomas)
May 14, 2012 Filing 421 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
May 14, 2012 Filing 420 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
May 14, 2012 Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michelle Lee for proceedings held on 5/11/12 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (VAR)
May 14, 2012 Filing 418 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Wilson Plaintiffs by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
May 14, 2012 Filing 417 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Stapley Plaintiffs by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
May 14, 2012 Filing 416 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Donahoe Plaintiffs by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas . (Barnes, Sarah)
May 14, 2012 Filing 415 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilcox by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
May 14, 2012 Filing 414 NOTICE re Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilson by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
May 14, 2012 Filing 413 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilson by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
May 14, 2012 Filing 412 NOTICE re Service of Defendants' Inital Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
May 14, 2012 Filing 411 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
May 14, 2012 Filing 410 NOTICE re of Service by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley Initial Disclosure Statement. (Vaughn, Kenneth)
May 14, 2012 Filing 409 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio . (Audilett, Daryl)
May 14, 2012 Filing 408 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
May 14, 2012 Filing 407 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw . (Dichter, Stephen)
May 14, 2012 Filing 406 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilson by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi . (Mueller, James)
May 14, 2012 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Dichter on behalf of Peter Spaw, Unknown Spaw. (Dichter, Stephen)
May 14, 2012 Filing 404 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Stapley by Maricopa, County of . (LaMar, Steven)
May 14, 2012 Filing 403 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wilson by Maricopa, County of . (LaMar, Steven)
May 14, 2012 Filing 402 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Donahoe by Maricopa, County of . (LaMar, Steven)
May 14, 2012 Filing 401 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiffs Sandra and Paul Wilson's Initial Disclosure Statement by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson . (Palys, Stefan)
May 14, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE re of Service of Plaintiffs Gary and Cheri Donahoe's Initial Disclosure Statement by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe . (Palys, Stefan)
May 14, 2012 Filing 398 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Maricopa, County of for proceedings held on May 11, 2012 before Judge Neil V. Wake.. (Liddy, Thomas)
May 14, 2012 Filing 397 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-16146 for #375 Notice of Appeal. (TLJ)
May 11, 2012 Filing 400 Exhibit List by Plaintiffs. (LAD)
May 11, 2012 Filing 396 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument re: #355 Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Stay Discovery Obligations held on 5/11/2012. Appearances: Kathleen OMeara and Colin Campbell for Plaintiffs; Daryl Audilett, Richard Chambliss, James Mueller, Barry Markson, Nicole Kaseta, Steven LaMar, and Rebeca Moskowitz for Defendants; John Ryan for non-party David Smith. Discussion is held. David Smith is sworn and examined. Exhibits A, B, and I are admitted into evidence. Cross examination begins. The witness is excused. Counsel present their closing arguments. The Court will issue a written order as stated on the record. Separate order to follow. LATER: Exhibits are released to the Plaintiffs and the Clerk will file the exhibit list. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
May 11, 2012 Filing 395 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Case Number 12-16145 for #377 Notice of Appeal. (TLJ)
May 11, 2012 Filing 394 SUPPLEMENT Supplement re #393 Response, by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Kaseta, Nicole)
May 11, 2012 Filing 393 RESPONSE re #392 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Memorandum on Admissibility of Settlement Negotiations and the Mediation Privilege by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Kaseta, Nicole)
May 11, 2012 Filing 392 MEMORANDUM Evidentiary Hearing Memorandum [PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENTIARY HEARING MEMORANDUM ON ADMISSIBILITY OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS AND THE MEDIATION PRIVILEGE] by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
May 10, 2012 Filing 391 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #381 Plaintiff Wilcox's Request for Evidentiary Hearing is granted as provided in the orders of May 9, 2012 (Doc. 383) and May 10, 2012 (Doc. 387). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER: The #388 Stipulated Request to Extend Initial Discovery Deadlines is denied, except that the time to exchange initial disclosures is extended to May 14, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/10/12. (NKS)
May 10, 2012 Filing 389 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #388 Stipulation Proposed Order re Request to Extend Initial Discovery Deadlines by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
May 10, 2012 Filing 388 STIPULATION to Extend Initial Discovery Deadlines by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER: #384 Defendant Maricopa County's Motion for Reconsideration of Courts May 9, 2012 Order and Motion to Seal Doc. 355, 356, 369, 374, 381, and 382 and the #385 Supplement is denied. The Court will consider sealing specific documents after the hearing and after considering arguments of counsel as to each. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/10/12. (NKS)
May 10, 2012 Filing 386 * JOINDER in #374 Response in Opposition to Motion, In Defendant Maricopa County's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) * Modified to correct event on 5/10/2012 (LAD).
May 10, 2012 Filing 385 SUPPLEMENT to Its Motion for Reconsideration of Court's May 9, 2012 Order re #384 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's May 9, 2012 Order and Motion to Seal Documents 355, 356, 369, 374, 381, and 382 by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kaseta, Nicole)
May 10, 2012 Filing 384 MOTION for Reconsideration of Court's May 9, 2012 Order and Motion to Seal Documents 355, 356, 369, 374, 381, and 382 by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaseta, Nicole)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER: Defendants produce Mr. Skelly and Mr. Smith to testify at the hearing on May 11, 2012, at 2:00 PM on the following matters: 1) Directions or authorization Mr. Smith gave to Mr. Skelly concerning Mr. Skelly's email of 04/09/12, at 4:02 PM to Mr. Campbell, including anything about the meaning of further approvals deemed necessary by the parties. 2) The County's course of performance under the 06/23/10 Resolution of the Board of Supervisors, including whether other settlements were paid with or without further specific approval of the Board of Supervisors. 3) Other matters fairly ancillary to these. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/9/12. (NKS)
May 9, 2012 Filing 382 DECLARATION of Colin F. Campbell re #381 Reply to Response to Motion, #355 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations [DECLARATION OF COLIN F. CAMPBELL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT] by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-I)(Campbell, Colin)
May 9, 2012 Filing 381 * REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND, IF NECESSARY, REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING] filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
May 7, 2012 Filing 380 *Joinder IN #374 DEFENDANT MARICOPA COUNTYS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOXS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James) *Modified to correct event type and to add document number on 5/7/2012 (LSP).
May 7, 2012 Filing 379 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting oral argument on #376 #378 Defendants' Aubuchon and Thomas's Motions for Stay Pending Appeal on June 1, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Any reply brief must be filed by May 29, 2012. Those Defendants must comply with the #339 scheduling conference order and be prepared to participate in the scheduling conference on June 1, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
May 4, 2012 Filing 378 * Joinder re #376 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a) Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) * Modified to correct event on 5/4/2012 (LAD).
May 4, 2012 Filing 377 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-6730376. (Barnes, Sarah)
May 4, 2012 Filing 376 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8(a) Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
May 4, 2012 Filing 375 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. Filing fee received: $ 455.00, receipt number 0970-6730063. (Mueller, James)
May 2, 2012 Filing 374 RESPONSE in Opposition re #355 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations filed by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kaseta, Nicole)
April 25, 2012 Filing 373 REVISED TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as to #355 Plaintiff Mary Rose Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement that: 1) Defendants shall file a response by 5:00 p.m. on May 2, 2012; 2) Plaintiff Wilcox shall file a reply by 5:00 p.m. on May 9, 2012; 3) Oral argument is set for 2:00 p.m. (not 1:30 p.m. as previously ordered) on May 11, 2012 in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
April 25, 2012 Filing 372 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as to #355 Plaintiff Mary Rose Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement that: 1) Defendants shall file a response by 5:00 p.m. on May 2, 2012; 2) Plaintiff Wilcox shall file a reply by 5:00 p.m. on May 9, 2012; 3) Oral argument is set for 1:30 p.m. on May 11, 2012 in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
April 25, 2012 Filing 371 NOTICE re Accelerated Briefing Schedule by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox [NOTICE OF ACCELERATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT]. (OMeara, Kathleen)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff Wilcox and counsel for Defendants confer and advise the Court by 5:00 p.m. on 04/25/12, of an agreed schedule for accelerated briefing and argument on #355 Plaintiff Wilcox's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, or what their respective positions are if they cannot agree. FURTHER ORDERED that the request to stay discovery obligations in the #355 Motion is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/24/12. (NKS)
April 24, 2012 Filing 369 NOTICE of Errata re #355 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations [NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
April 23, 2012 Filing 368 Thomas Defendants' ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint of Wilson by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.(Barnes, Sarah)
April 23, 2012 Filing 367 Thomas Defendants' ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint of Wilcox by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.(Barnes, Sarah)
April 23, 2012 Filing 366 Thomas Defendants' ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint of Stapley by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.(Barnes, Sarah)
April 23, 2012 Filing 365 Thomas Defendants' ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint of Donahoe by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.(Barnes, Sarah)
April 23, 2012 Filing 364 Defendants Hendershott's ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint of Wilson by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott.(Markson, Barry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 363 Defendants Hendershott's ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint of Stapley by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott.(Markson, Barry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 362 Defendants Hendershott's ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint of Wilcox by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott.(Markson, Barry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 361 Defendants Hendershott's ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint of Donahoe by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott.(Markson, Barry)
April 23, 2012 Filing 360 Lisa Aubuchon and Peter Pestalozzi's ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint Donald Stapley Jr and Kathleen Stapley's Verified Second Amended Complaint by Lisa Aubuchon.(Mueller, James)
April 23, 2012 Filing 359 Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint Mary Rose and Earl Wilcox's First Amended Complaint by Lisa Aubuchon.(Mueller, James)
April 23, 2012 Filing 358 Lisa Aubuchon and Peter Pestalozzi's ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint Sandra and Paul Wilson's Second Amended Complaint by Lisa Aubuchon.(Mueller, James)
April 23, 2012 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward P Moriarity on behalf of Lisa Aubuchon, Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Moriarity, Edward)
April 23, 2012 Filing 356 DECLARATION of KATHLEEN O'MEARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS re #355 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] [DECLARATION OF KATHLEEN O'MEARA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Ex. A-C)(OMeara, Kathleen)
April 23, 2012 Filing 355 * MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement [PLAINTIFFS MARY ROSE AND EARL WILCOX'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STAY DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS] by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enforce Settlement and Stay Discovery Obligations)(OMeara, Kathleen). * Added MOTION to Stay Discovery Obligations on 4/24/2012 (LAD).
April 23, 2012 Filing 354 ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio.(Audilett, Daryl)
April 23, 2012 Filing 353 ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of.(LaMar, Steven)
April 23, 2012 Filing 352 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of.(LaMar, Steven)
April 23, 2012 Filing 351 ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of.(LaMar, Steven)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER: This action will be dismissed by the Clerk's Office without further notice on 05/23/12 as to Plaintiff Susan Schuerman ONLY, unless prior thereto a judgment or order of dismissal is entered. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/23/12. (NKS)
April 23, 2012 Filing 349 ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of.(LaMar, Steven)
April 23, 2012 Filing 348 ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio.(Audilett, Daryl)
April 23, 2012 Filing 347 ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio.(Audilett, Daryl)
April 23, 2012 Filing 346 ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio.(Audilett, Daryl)
April 23, 2012 Filing 345 NOTICE of Settlement of Action Filed by Susan Schuerman by Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER: This action will be dismissed by the Clerk's Office without further notice on 05/21/12 as to Plaintiff Barbara Mundell ONLY, unless prior thereto a judgment or order of dismissal is entered. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/20/12. (NKS)
April 20, 2012 Filing 343 NOTICE of Settlement by Barbara Mundell. (Rivera, Jose)
April 20, 2012 Filing 342 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint Gary and Cherie Donahoe's Verified Second Amended Complaint by Lisa Aubuchon.(Mueller, James)
April 19, 2012 Filing 341 Defendants Peter and Mary Spaw's Answer to Gary and Cherie Donahoe's Verified Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint by Peter Spaw.(Dichter, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 Filing 340 Defendants Peter and Mary Spaw's Answer to Sandra and Paul Wilson's Verified Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint by Peter Spaw.(Dichter, Stephen)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER ISSUED: Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. The parties are ordered to provide initial disclosures at least 21 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference in the form required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1). See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/11/12. (NKS)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting/denying in part #270 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson. FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part #271 Thomas Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Claims in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), as the Claims are Barred by Absolute Prosecutorial Immunity FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part #283 Defendant Arpaios' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCivP 8, 10, and 12(b)(6) Applicable Collectively to the Newly Amended Complaints Filed by Plaintiffs Donahoe, Mundell, Schuerman, Stapley, Wilcox, and Wilson FURTHER ORDERED granting/denying in part #284 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rules 8(a)(2), 8(d)(1) (as to Plaintiffs Wilcox, Mundell and Stapley) and 12(b)(6), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (as to Plaintiffs Wilcox, Mundell, Stapley, Wilson, Schuerman, and Donahoe) FURTHER ORDERED denying #315 Defendants Peter and Mary Spaw's Motion to Dismiss. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FULL/COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/9/12. (MAP)
March 28, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaio, Halverson and Roshetko's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Patrick Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
March 23, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE re of Service of Supplemental Disclosure by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas in Wolfswinkel, et al.. (Barnes, Sarah)
February 10, 2012 Filing 335 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Oral Argument held on 2/10/2012. Appearances: Colin Campbell; Kathleen OMeara; Jose Rivera; Peter Limperis; Michael Manning; M. Elizabeth Nillen; Stefan Palys; Lawrence Wulkan; Merwin Grant; and Kenneth Vaughn for Plaintiffs; Daryl Audilett; Roger Perry, Jr.; Sarah Barnes; Douglas Drury; Caleb Lihn; Steven LaMar; Rebeca Moskowitz; and Stephen Dichter for Defendants. Counsel argue their respective positions regarding the pending #270 #271 #283 #284 #315 motions. The Court takes all of the pending motions under advisement. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
February 10, 2012 Filing 334 Joinder re #330 Reply to Response to Motion, #312 Reply to Response to Motion, #315 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #321 Reply to Response to Motion, #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson, #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox , #311 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendants Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
February 10, 2012 Filing 333 Joinder re #309 Response to Motion,, #308 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #307 Response to Motion,,, #328 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Plaintiff Barbara Mundell. (Rivera, Jose)
February 10, 2012 Filing 332 Joinder re #308 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #298 Response in Opposition to Motion, #307 Response to Motion,,, #328 Response to Motion (WILCOXES' JOINDER IN ARGUMENTS IN OTHER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS) by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
February 9, 2012 Filing 331 *Joinder re #298 Response in Opposition to Motion, #307 Response to Motion, #309 Response to Motion, & #328 Response to Motion by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Vaughn, Kenneth) *Modified to correct document numbers 2/10/2012 (CMAL).
February 8, 2012 Filing 330 REPLY to Response to Motion re #315 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Peter Spaw. (Dichter, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 Filing 329 Joinder re #321 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
February 6, 2012 Filing 328 RESPONSE to Motion re #315 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manning, Michael)
February 1, 2012 Filing 327 Joinder re #312 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (LaMar, Steven)
January 30, 2012 Filing 326 Joinder re #321 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Arpaio by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
January 30, 2012 Filing 325 Joinder re #322 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaints Pursuant to Rules 8(a)(2), 8(d)(1) (as to Plaintiffs Wilcox, Mundell and Stapley) and 12(b)(6), FRCP (as to Plaintiffs Wilcox, Mundell, Stapley, Wilson, Schuerman and Donahoe by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
January 30, 2012 Filing 324 Joinder re #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
January 30, 2012 Filing 323 * Errata by Peter Spaw re #315 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Dichter, Stephen) * Modified on 1/31/2012 to correct event (LAD).
January 30, 2012 Filing 322 REPLY to Response to #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (LAD)
January 30, 2012 Filing 321 REPLY to Response to #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Unknown Halverson, Patrick Roshetko, Unknown Roshetko. (LAD)
January 30, 2012 Filing 320 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #313 Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Exceed Page Limit and #317 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Exceed Page Limit, ORDERED granting both aforementioned motions. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the lodged documents as outlined in the Defendants' motions. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 30, 2012 Filing 319 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #315 Defendants Spaw's Motion to Dismiss is set for oral argument on February 10, 2012, at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a response to #315 Defendants Spaw's Motion to Dismiss by February 6, 2012, at noon. Defendants Spaw may file a reply by February 9, 2012, at 5:00 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 27, 2012 Filing 318 LODGED Proposed Reply on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints re: #317 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Reply on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
January 27, 2012 Filing 317 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Reply on Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mueller, James)
January 27, 2012 Filing 316 * NOTICE of Joinder re #314 Lodged Proposed Document, Omnibus Reply to Responses to Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Dismiss by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) * Modified on 1/30/2012 to correct event (LAD).
January 27, 2012 Filing 315 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants Peter and Mary Spaw's Motion to Dismiss by Peter Spaw. (Dichter, Stephen) *Modified to correct motion type on 1/30/2012 (CMAL).
January 27, 2012 Filing 314 LODGED Proposed Omnibus Reply to Responses to Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Dismiss re: #313 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
January 27, 2012 Filing 313 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limit by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
January 27, 2012 Filing 312 REPLY to Response to Motion re #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox Consolidated Reply filed by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
January 27, 2012 Filing 311 REPLY to Response to Motion re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson and First Amended Complaint of Planitiff Wilcox filed by Maricopa, County of. (LaMar, Steven)
January 24, 2012 Filing 310 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED resetting the Oral Argument on the #270 #271 #283 #284 Motions to Dismiss from 02/08/12 to 02/10/12 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Counsel are directed to contact the Court immediately if any essential counsel have an unavoidable conflict with the new date/time. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 18, 2012 Filing 309 RESPONSE (Consolidated) to Motion re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson, #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints, #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits)(KMG)
January 17, 2012 Filing 308 RESPONSE in Opposition re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson, #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints, #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Vaughn, Kenneth)
January 17, 2012 Filing 307 RESPONSE to Motion re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson, #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints, #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox , #282 MOTION for Joinder re #276 Lodged Proposed Document, Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Dismiss Newly Amended Complaints, #277 MOTION for Joinder re #276 Lodged Proposed Document, Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Amended Complaints by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Susan Schuerman, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manning, Michael)
January 17, 2012 Filing 306 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed #303 Plaintiffs Stapleys' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Their Response to Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaints, ORDERED granting the aforementioned motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are directed to file their lodged response as it currently appears on the Court's docket. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 13, 2012 Filing 305 * Errata by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley re #303 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaints to Attach Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Response to Motions to Dismiss)(Vaughn, Kenneth) * Modified on 1/17/2012 to correct event from Notice to Errata (LAD).
January 13, 2012 Filing 304 LODGED Proposed Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re: #303 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaints. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Vaughn, Kenneth)
January 13, 2012 Filing 303 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaints by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Vaughn, Kenneth)
January 13, 2012 Filing 302 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #299 Wilcoxes' Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Their Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, ORDERED granting the aforementioned motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are directed to file their lodged response as it currently appears on the Court's docket. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 13, 2012 Filing 301 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #296 Motion for Leave to File an Omnibus Response Exceeding the Page Limit to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Donahoe, Schuerman, and Wilson's Second Amended Complaints, ORDERED granting the aforementioned motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may exceed the 17-page limit by filing an Omnibus response up to 30 pages in text. Plaintiffs are directed to file their lodged response. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
January 13, 2012 Filing 300 LODGED Proposed Wilcoxes Consolidated Response to Defendants Thomas, Arpaio and Aubuchon Motions to Dismiss the Wilcoxes First Amended Complaint re: #299 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Wilcoxes Consolidated Response to Defendants Thomas, Arpaio and Aubuchon Motions to Dismiss the Wilcoxes First Amended Complaint . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index and Exhibits A through C)(Desai, Sharad)
January 13, 2012 Filing 299 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Wilcoxes Consolidated Response to Defendants Thomas, Arpaio and Aubuchon Motions to Dismiss the Wilcoxes First Amended Complaint by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desai, Sharad)
January 13, 2012 Filing 298 RESPONSE in Opposition re #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #284 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints, #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox filed by Barbara Mundell. (Limperis, Peter)
January 13, 2012 Filing 297 LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, and Schuerman's Joint Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints re: #296 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for for Omnibus Response Exceeding the Page Limit to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Donahoe, Schuerman, and Wilson's Second Amended Complaints . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Susan Schuerman, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manning, Michael)
January 13, 2012 Filing 296 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for for Omnibus Response Exceeding the Page Limit to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Donahoe, Schuerman, and Wilson's Second Amended Complaints by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Susan Schuerman, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Michael)
January 6, 2012 Filing 295 Minute Order: Per 11/21/11 order of the court Nancy Wetzel (wife) and Stephen Wetzel (husband) are terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DMT)
December 29, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Wolfswinkel by Maricopa, County of . (Kaseta, Nicole)
December 28, 2011 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox for proceedings held on 09/02/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Desai, Sharad)
December 28, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 09/02/2011, before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2012. (BAS)
December 22, 2011 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Susan Schuerman, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson for proceedings held on 09/02/2011 before Judge Wake.. (Palys, Stefan)
December 20, 2011 Filing 290 NOTICE re Change of Law Firm Name by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Patrick Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
December 20, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharad H Desai on behalf of Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox (Desai, Sharad)
December 19, 2011 Filing 288 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting Oral Argument on the #270 #271 #283 #284 Motions to Dismiss on February 8, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 16, 2011 Filing 287 ERRATA re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 286 Joinder re #283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Joinder Re: Stapley and Wilcox Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 285 Joinder re #271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox Partial Joinder Re: Stapley, Donahoe, Wilson & Wilcox Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 284 * MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaints by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozii. (Mueller, James) *Modified to add filer on 12/19/2011* (REW).
December 16, 2011 Filing 283 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
December 16, 2011 Filing 282 * Joinder re #276 Lodged Proposed Document, Defendants Arpaios' Motion to Dismiss Newly Amended Complaints #283 by Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James) Modified on 12/19/2011 (LAD). * Modified to correct event 12/19/11 LAD. Document linkage to #283 added.
December 16, 2011 Filing 281 Joinder re #270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson Re: Wilcox Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Moskowitz, Rebeca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 280 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel. (Wright, Lawrence)
December 16, 2011 Filing 279 TEXT ONLY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Lisa Aubuchon's #273 Motion to Exceed Page Limit and Defendants Arpaios' #275 Motion to Exceed Page Limit for their Motion to Dismiss are granted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
December 15, 2011 Filing 278 Joinder re #276 Lodged Proposed Document, SHERIFF AND AVA ARPAIOS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULES 8/10/12(B)(6) by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
December 15, 2011 Filing 277 * Joinder re #276 Lodged Proposed Document, Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Amended Complaints by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio #283 by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry) *Modified entry to correct event on 12/16/2011 (ESL). Modified on 12/19/2011 (LAD). * Modified to add document linkage to #283 .
December 15, 2011 Filing 276 LODGED Proposed Motion to Dismiss re: #275 MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limit for their Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Amended Complaints . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
December 15, 2011 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limit for their Motion to Dismiss Pertaining to Amended Complaints by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
December 15, 2011 Filing 274 LODGED Proposed Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints re: #273 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lisa Aubuchon. (Mueller, James)
December 15, 2011 Filing 273 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaints by Lisa Aubuchon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mueller, James)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #269 Maricopa County's Motion to Intervene and file its answer by 12/16/11. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/15/11.(TLJ)
December 15, 2011 Filing 271 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Various counts/claims of Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Donahoe, Wilson, Schuerman, Mundell, Stapley and Wilcox by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah)
December 15, 2011 Filing 270 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims of Second Amended Complaints of Plaintiffs Stapley, Donahoe and Wilson by Maricopa, County of. (Kaseta, Nicole)
December 15, 2011 Filing 269 MOTION to Intervene by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LaMar, Steven)
December 15, 2011 Filing 268 Defendant Maricopa County's ANSWER to #244 Amended Complaint of Susan Schuerman by Maricopa, County of.(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 267 * WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Wilson, Paul Wilson. (Manning, Michael) Modified on 12/9/2011 (LAD). * Modified to reflect that document is filed with member case number and not lead case number 12/9/11 LAD.
December 9, 2011 Filing 266 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Donahoe, Cherie Donahoe. Peter Spaw waiver sent on 12/1/2011; Unknown Spaw waiver sent on 12/1/2011. (Manning, Michael)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting the parties' #264 Stipulated Protective Order. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/08/11. (NKS)
December 6, 2011 Filing 264 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
November 29, 2011 Filing 263 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Barbara Mundell. (Webb, Nathan)
November 28, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE re of Service of Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wolfswinkel by Lisa Aubuchon . (Mueller, James)
November 28, 2011 Filing 261 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABCDW LLC, Stone Canyon LLC, Vanderbilt Farms LLC, Vistoso Partners LLC, W Harquahala LLC, Ashton A Wolfswinkel, Brandon D Wolfswinkel, Conley D Wolfswinkel Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement (Eagan, Shannon)
November 28, 2011 Filing 260 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas re Wolfswinkel. (Barnes, Sarah)
November 28, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE re Hendershott Defendants' Notice of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott . (Markson, Barry)
November 28, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE re Service of Defendants Arpaio, Halverson and Roshetko's Initial Disclosure Statement in Wolfswinkel, et al., v. Arpaio, et al. by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Patrick Roshetko . (Audilett, Daryl)
November 28, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE re Notice of Service of Defendant Maricopa County's Initial Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Wolfswinkel by Maricopa, County of . (Kaseta, Nicole)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting the parties' #251 Stipulated Protective Order. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/23/11. (NKS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 255 Summons Issued as to Peter Spaw. (KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 23, 2011 Filing 254 Summons Issued as to Unknown Spaw. (KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 23, 2011 Filing 253 Summons Issued as to Unknown Spaw. (KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 23, 2011 Filing 252 Summons Issued as to Peter Spaw. (KMG). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 22, 2011 Filing 251 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio, Jonathan Halverson, Patrick Roshetko. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
November 22, 2011 Filing 250 SUMMONS Submitted by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Manning, Michael)
November 22, 2011 Filing 249 SUMMONS Submitted by Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Manning, Michael)
November 22, 2011 Filing 248 SUMMONS Submitted by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe. (Manning, Michael)
November 22, 2011 Filing 247 SUMMONS Submitted by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe. (Manning, Michael)
November 21, 2011 Filing 246 AMENDED COMPLAINT Stapleys' Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Kathleen Stapley, Donald T Stapley, Jr.(Vaughn, Kenneth)
November 21, 2011 Filing 245 AMENDED COMPLAINT Sandra and Paul Wilson's Verified Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sandra Wilson, Paul Wilson.(Manning, Michael)
November 21, 2011 Filing 244 AMENDED COMPLAINT Susan Schuerman's Verified Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Susan Schuerman.(Manning, Michael)
November 21, 2011 Filing 243 AMENDED COMPLAINT Gary and Cherie Donahoe's Verified Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Gary Donahoe, Cherie Donahoe.(Manning, Michael)
November 21, 2011 Filing 242 AMENDED COMPLAINT 3rd Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Barbara Mundell.(Limperis, Peter)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER pursuant to #238 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the action by Plaintiff Anna Baca (CV-11-01921-PHX-NVW) against Maricopa County, a body politic of the State of Arizona; Joseph Arpaio, individually, and in his official capacity as Maricopa County Sheriff; Joseph and Ava Arpaio, a married couple; David Hendershott and Anna Hendershott, a married couple; Lisa Aubuchon and Peter Pestalozzi, a married couple; and Andrew P. Thomas and Ann Thomas, a married couple is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs incurred. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/21/11. (LAD)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: This action will be dismissed by the Clerk's Office without further notice on 12/19/11 as to the Wetzel's action ONLY, unless prior thereto a judgment or order of dismissal is entered. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/21/11. (NKS)
November 21, 2011 Filing 239 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox.(Campbell, Colin)
November 21, 2011 Filing 238 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Action Filed by Plaintiff Anna Baca by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
November 18, 2011 Filing 237 NOTICE of Settlement by Nancy Wetzel, Stephen Wetzel (Manning, Michael)
November 14, 2011 Filing 236 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Wolfswinkel, et al. by Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott.(Markson, Barry)
November 14, 2011 Filing 235 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Wolfswinkel, et al. by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi.(Mueller, James)
November 14, 2011 Filing 234 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Wolfswinkels, et al. by Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas.(Barnes, Sarah)
November 9, 2011 Filing 233 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Telephonic Conference held on 11/9/2011. Appearances: Lawrence Wright and Shannon Eagan for Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs; Daryl Audilett, Sarah Barnes, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson, Nicole Kaseta, and Rebecca Moskowitz for Defendants. Discussion is held. The Court reaffirms the deadlines for Answers and Initial Disclosures. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 9, 2011 Filing 232 AMENDED TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having been in contact with counsel regarding a potential disagreement between the Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs and the Defendants, ORDERED setting a Telephonic Conference for 11/09/11 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake to address the issue with these parties ONLY. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
November 9, 2011 Filing 231 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having been in contact with counsel regarding a potential disagreement between the parties, ORDERED setting a Telephonic Conference for 11/09/11 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER issued ruling on pending motions. FURTHER ORDERED that all Plaintiffs, except the Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs, are granted leave to file amended complaints. Amended complaints shall be filed by November 21, 2011. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their answers or responsive pleadings by December 15, 2011. FURTHER ORDERED that all future pleadings be filed in the lead case, No. CV10-2756-PHX-NVW, with a notation to the specific case to which it relates in the caption. See order for full details and further deadlines. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/28/11.(SJF)
October 12, 2011 Filing 229 TEXT ONLY ORDER: In light of the Court's order denying Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 7, No. CV11-1921) and granting the Mundell and Baca Plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint after the Court rules on the other pending motions in the consolidated cases, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the time for all defendants to file an answer or responsive pleading until after Plaintiffs Mundell and Baca have filed the contemplated amended complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 5, 2011 Filing 228 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' #226 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Mundell and Baca's Second Amended Complaint, ORDERED granting the aformentioned stipulation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including 10/13/11 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE: The Court having considered the Defendants' and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 225) filed on October 3, 2011, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED consolidating case CV-11-01921-PHX-ROS with the lead matter Donahoe, No. CV-10-02756-PHX-NVW for discovery. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/5/11. (LAD)
October 4, 2011 Filing 226 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT or File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Mundell and Baca's Second Amended Complaint by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
October 3, 2011 Filing 225 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Maricopa, County of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Moskowitz, Rebeca)
September 2, 2011 Filing 224 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2011. Appearances: Michael Manning, Colin Campbell, Kathleen OMeara, Shannon Eagan, Stephen Neal, Lawrence Wright, Merwin Grant, and Kenneth Vaughn for Plaintiffs; Daryl Audilett, Sarah Barnes, Richard Chambliss, Douglas Drury, Barry Markson, Nicole Kaseta, Steven LaMar, and Rebecca Moskowitz for Defendants. The Court addresses the Plaintiffs' Complaints with the exception of the Wolfswinkel Plaintiffs. Immunity claims discussed. Wolfswinkel Complaint addressed separately with the Wolfswinkels' counsel. Future scheduling of this matter briefing discussed. Counsel is invited to speak regarding any issue(s) they wish to bring to the Court's attention. Counsel address various issues with the Court. The Court advises Defendants' counsel that one Motion to Dismiss per Defendant may be filed, if they are dissatisfied with any Amended Complaint that may be filed in this matter. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
September 1, 2011 Filing 223 NOTICE re of Errata by Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Susan Schuerman, Nancy Wetzel, Stephen Wetzel, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson re #222 Joinder, Re Plaintiffs' Donahoe, Schuerman, Wetzel and Wilson's Joinder in Wilcoxes' Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Strike and/or Require a More Definite Statement. (Manning, Michael)
September 1, 2011 Filing 222 * Joinder re #66 Response, #64 Response, #63 Response, #65 Response, Joiner in Stapley's Responses to Defendants Motions to Dismiss, Strike and-or Require a More Definite Statement by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Consol Plaintiffs Susan Schuerman, Nancy Wetzel, Stephen Wetzel, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Manning, Michael) Modified on 9/2/2011 (LAD). * Per Errata #223 , this joinder is as to responses of Defendants Wilcox, not Stapley.
August 30, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE re Supplemental Authority by Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley re #162 Response to Motion,. (Grant, Merwin)
August 29, 2011 Filing 220 Joinder re #66 Response, #64 Response, #63 Response, #65 Response, #67 Response, #124 Notice (Other), #161 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, in Arguments in Other Plaintiffs' Responses to Motions to Dismiss, to Strike and for a More Definite Statement by Consol Plaintiffs Donald T Stapley, Jr, Kathleen Stapley. (Grant, Merwin)
August 26, 2011 Filing 219 Joinder re #168 Response to Motion, #173 Response to Motion, #162 Response to Motion, #163 Response to Motion, #171 Response, #161 Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, WILCOXES' JOINDER IN ARGUMENTS IN OTHER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS, TO STRIKE, AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Consol Plaintiffs Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox filed by Earl Wilcox, Mary Rose Wilcox. (OMeara, Kathleen)
August 25, 2011 Filing 218 Joinder re #217 Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike or to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
August 25, 2011 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 MOTION to Dismiss Party Sheriff Joseph and Ava Arpaio from Donald Stapley and Kathleen Stapley's First Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
August 25, 2011 Filing 216 Joinder re #168 Response to Motion, #173 Response to Motion, #162 Response to Motion, #163 Response to Motion, #171 Response, Plaintiffs Donahoe, Schuerman, Wetzel and Wilson's Joinder in the Stapleys' Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, Strike and/or Require a More Definite Statement by Plaintiffs Cherie Donahoe, Gary Donahoe, Consol Plaintiffs Susan Schuerman, Nancy Wetzel, Stephen Wetzel, Paul Wilson, Sandra Wilson. (Manning, Michael)
August 24, 2011 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION to Dismiss Party Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi of Stapleys' First Amended Complaint filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
August 23, 2011 Filing 214 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court having reviewed the #206 Defendants Lisa Aubuchon and Peter R. Pestalozzi's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit AND #209 Defendants Motion to Exceed Page Limit, ORDERED denying both motions at this time. The parties shall have until Thursday, 08/25/11, to file a reply that conforms with Local Rule 7.2(e)(2). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
August 19, 2011 Filing 213 Joinder re #211 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Stapley Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Violation of Rule 8 by Defendants Anna Hendershott, David Hendershott. (Markson, Barry)
August 19, 2011 Filing 212 Joinder In Sheriff Arpaio's Reply (Lodged at #210) to Stapley Response to Motion to Strike or to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) Modified on 8/22/2011 (KMG).
August 19, 2011 Filing 211 *REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Dismiss Party Ann and Andrew Thomas re the Stapley Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Violation of Rule 8 by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) *Modified on 8/22/2011 to correct event and document relationship.* (KMG).
August 19, 2011 Filing 210 LODGED Proposed Reply to Response to Motion to Strike or to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement re: #209 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Response to Motion to Strike or to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Audilett, Daryl)
August 19, 2011 Filing 209 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Response to Motion to Strike or to Dismiss the Amended Complaint or for a More Definite Statement by Ava Arpaio, Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Audilett, Daryl)
August 19, 2011 Filing 208 *REPLY to Response to Motion re #145 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : 1-4 and 6-18 of the Stapley First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) Based on Absolute Prosecutorial Immunity by Defendants Andrew Thomas, Anne Thomas. (Barnes, Sarah) *Modified on 8/22/2011 to correct event and document relationship.* (KMG).
August 19, 2011 Filing 207 LODGED Proposed Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Stapley's First Amended Complaint re: #206 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Mueller, James)
August 19, 2011 Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit re Reply to #142 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Lisa Aubuchon, Peter R Pestalozzi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mueller, James) Modified on 8/22/2011 as to document relationship. (KMG).
August 19, 2011 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : 1-14 of Plaintiffs Donald and Kathleen Stapley's First Amended Complaint filed by Maricopa, County of. (Kaseta, Nicole)
August 17, 2011 Filing 204 CONSOLIDATED REPLY BRIEF to Response to Motion re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : III, V, VI, VIII, IX, X and XI of Plaintiffs Sandra and Paul Wilson's First Amended Complaint, #82 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : III, V, VIII, IX, X and XII of Plaintiffs Gary and Cherie Donahoe's First Amended Complaint, #83 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : III, V, VIII, IX, X and XI of Plaintiff Susan Schuerman's First Amended Complaint filed by Maricopa, County of. (TLJ)