Mundinger v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Amy Y Mundinger and Aaron Mundinger
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA and Deutsche Bank
Case Number: 2:2010cv02774
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding defendants $1,500 in fees. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/11/11.(DMT)
April 25, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 21 defendants' motion to continue the May 13, 2011. The scheduling conference is vacated and the clerk shall enter final judgment.Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/22/11.(DMT)
February 2, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/2/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mundinger v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Y Mundinger
Represented By: Jess A Lorona
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mundinger
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Flaherty
Represented By: Jess A Lorona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Michael Jeffrey Coccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank
Represented By: Michael Jeffrey Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?