Brea v. Heartland Express Incorporated of Iowa

Plaintiff: Rafael Brea
Defendant: Heartland Express Incorporated of Iowa
Case Number: 2:2011cv00042
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 69 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/8/2012.(KMG)
July 16, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 58 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Count One is dismissed. Count Two survives. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/16/2012.(KMG)
April 11, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 12 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 04/08/11.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brea v. Heartland Express Incorporated of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Brea
Represented By: Richard L Klauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Express Incorporated of Iowa
Represented By: James Lawrence Blair
Represented By: Neil Todd McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?