Wright v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al

Plaintiff: Laurie F Wright
Defendant: Tiffany & Bosco PA, Unknown Parties and Chase Home Finance LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00095
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for New Trial and motion to amend complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/11/12.(SJF)
March 9, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/8/12.(TLJ)
September 14, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Claim three is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss counts one, two, and four is denied. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/14/11.(TLJ)
June 2, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 defendants' Motion to Dismiss without prejudice; denying 8 and 9 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date this order is entered to file a motion for leave to amend in compliance with LRCiv. 15.1. Otherwise the clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/1/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Bosco PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie F Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?