Halloum v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Ammar Dean Halloum
Defendant: Unknown Eherdt, Unknown Rhihibe, Unknown Itenberg, Unknown Jackson, Unknown Huggins, Unknown Turner, Unknown Hernandez and Unknown Brier
Case Number: 2:2011cv00097
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, see PDF document for details. Hernandez, Huggins, Turner, and Riharb are dismissed as Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The sole remaining claim is the Count III First Amendment free-exercise claim against Brier for the denial/delay of a religious shaving waiver. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/17/14.(LSP)
September 30, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of entry of this order in which to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a response showing good cause why he cannot pay the filing fee; if the plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order in any way, the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss plaintiff's complaint in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/30/2013. (LFIG)
April 25, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 76 Motion to Subrogate His Electronic Filing is GRANTED; from the date of entry of this order, notice and service upon plaintiff shall be by first class mail to his last known address provided to the court; the 74 Order and 75 Judgment are both VACATED; Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of entry of this Order to pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a response showing good cause why he cannot pay; if plaintiff fails to timely comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action. Plaintiff's 77 Motion to Expedite Trial Date is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/25/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
November 28, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/28/2012.(LFIG)
October 12, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a Response showing good cause why he cannot pay the filing fee. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/11/12. (LSP)
November 16, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 34 . Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), the claims as against defendant Itenberg are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/16/11. (DMT)
October 4, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 22). (2) With 20 days from this Order, Brier must file an Amended Answer to include responses to Plaintiff equal-protection claims in Counts III and IV. (3) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 22) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the motion is granted as to Plaintiff's RLUIPA claims in Counts III-VII; (b) the motion is granted as to Plainti ff's First Amendment claims in CountsV and VII; these two claims are dismissed for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. (c) the motion is otherwise denied. (4) Eherdt is dismissed as a Defendant. (5) Counts V and VII are dismissed. (6) Th e remaining claims are: (a) Count IFirst Amendment retaliation claims against Hernandez, Huggins, and Turner; (b) Count IIIFirst Amendment free-exercise claim and equal protection claim against Brier for the denial of a religious shaving waiver; (c) Count IVFirst Amendment free-exercise claim and equal protection claim against Brier for the refusal to distribute a copy of the Quran; and(d) Count VIFirst Amendment free-exercise claim against Riharb for the denial of communal prayer. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/4/11.(LAD)
August 5, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 5 Order: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Jackson is dismissed without prejudice. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/5/11. (LAD)
May 25, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Motion for Clarification. Plaintiff's claims in Count VI of the Complaint are dismissed as to Defendant Eherdt. Defendant Eherdt is not required to answer Count VI of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/25/11.(DMT)
February 14, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn with respect to Pla's 2/10/2011 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 7 ); all other matters must remain with the Magistrate Judge as appropriate. Pla's 2/10/2011 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 7 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/14/11. (SAT)
January 27, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED Pla's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. Pla must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $4.86. Counts II and VIII and Dfts Ryan, ADOC, Clark, Canteen Inc., Sanders, Coleman, and Sauceda are dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Huggins, Turner, Hernandez, Brier, Eherdt, Rhibibe, and Itenberg must answer Counts I, III, IV, V, VI, and VII. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dft Huggins, Turner, Hernandez, Brier, Eherdt, Rhibibe, and Itenberg. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court withi n 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Dfts must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/27/11. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halloum v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Eherdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rhihibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Itenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ammar Dean Halloum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?