Sambrano v. Opferbeck et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Sambrano
Defendant: Elizabeth Estrada, M Sampter, Unknown Opferbeck, Michael Moyer, Daniel Quillman, Albert Casados, Lourdes Lopez, Mercedes Fortune, James Smoke, Ethan Coffey, Robert R Simpson, Jason E Knippel, Corrine M Dunnington, Donna J Feller, Daniel M Caruso, Erin Kelly, Frances Hernandez, Unknown Party, Vu Nauyen, Marc R Matthews and Reginald Herd
Case Number: 2:2011cv00119
Filed: January 18, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 49; see Doc. 51). Defendants' 49 Motion to Dismiss is granted; Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/30/12.(DMT)
April 24, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Nurse Rosemary Barba's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 39) and Motion for Summary Disposition (Doc. 48). All other matters will remain with the Magistrate Judge. Denying defendant Nurse Rosemary Barba's 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying 48 Motion for Summary Disposition. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/24/12.(DMT)
July 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs 9 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is construed as a "Response" to the Court's April 4, 2011 Show Cause Order, (doc. 6). The April 4, 2011 Show Cause Order, (doc. 6), is discharged based upon Plaintiff 's Response, (doc. 9). Counts VI and VII and Defendants Caruso, Kelly, Hernandez, Matthews, Estrada, Sampter, Nauyen, and Herd are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Opferbeck, Moyer, Quillman, Casados, Lopez, Fortune, Smoke, Coffey, Simp son, Knippel, Dunnington, Feller, and Maricopa County Hospital Registered Nurse Rosemary must answer Counts I-V and VIII. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1), this Order, and both summons and reque st for waiver forms for Defendants Opferbeck, Moyer, Quillman, Casados, Lopez, Fortune, Smoke, Coffey, Simpson, Knippel, Dunnington, Feller, and Maricopa County Hospital Registered Nurse Rosemary. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/14/11. (DMT) ).
June 24, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE denying 7 Plaintiff's Request in his Letter for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days from the date this Order is signed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a Response as described. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/11.(LSP) Modified on 6/24/2011 (LSP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sambrano v. Opferbeck et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Sampter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Opferbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Quillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Casados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason E Knippel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine M Dunnington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna J Feller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vu Nauyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc R Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Herd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?