Short et al v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Short and Paul Short
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv00133
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/2011.(KMG)
July 7, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; the Clerk is directed to file the lodged proposed response (Doc. 17); Defendants shall have until July 15, 2011 to file a reply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/7/11.(REW)
June 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response (Doc. 14) is granted. Plaintiffs' counsel shall have until June 20, 2011 to file with the Court and serve on Defendant a hardcopy of the response to the motion to dismiss. The Clerk is directed to accept the filing. All future documents shall be filed using the ECF system. Defendant's motion for summary ruling (Doc. 13) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/2011.(KMG)
March 15, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed amended complaint (Doc. 7-1) on or before 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/15/2011.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short et al v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Short
Represented By: Devin Andrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Short
Represented By: Devin Andrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?