Croomes v. Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated

Plaintiff: Tracee Croomes
Defendant: Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv00141
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/19/12.(REW)
April 13, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $1,507.50. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/12/12.(LAD)
March 29, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot; that the Clerk of the Court shall cause a copy of this Order to be filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, District of Arizona, No. 09-BK-24328-CGC; that, if the Trustee does not move to intervene within 15 days of the filing of this Order in Bankruptcy case No. 09-BK-24328-CGC, the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss this case and enter judgment for Defendants accordingly; that Plaintiff's 49 Request for Extension o f Time to Complete Discovery is denied, without prejudice, as moot. It is finally ordered that Defendant's 50 Motion for Leave to File Second Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits is denied, without prejudice, as moot. If the Trustee intervenes in this case, Defendant may re-file its Motion for Leave to File a Second Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 03/28/12. (ESL)
March 8, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and granting in part Defendant's 22 Motion to Dismiss Due to Plaintiff's Non-compliance with Discovery Requests as set forth herein; that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Docs. 30 & 33 ) is granted a s follows: discovery due: 04/30/12, dispositive moition due: 05/30/12. It is further ordered that, within 7 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall appropriately comply with all pending discovery requests as set forth herein; within 14 days of the date of this Order, Defendant shall file a motion for attorneys' fees incurred as a result of Plaintiff's failure to appear at her deposition, in compliance with LRCiv 54. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 03/07/12. (Note: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croomes v. Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracee Croomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated
Represented By: Christa von der Luft
Represented By: Timothy Mark Medcoff
Represented By: Larry E Palles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?