Rowe v. Maricopa County Library District Featured Case

Plaintiff: Anne Rowe
Defendant: Maricopa County Library District
Case Number: 2:2011cv00157
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER denying 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as final judgment has been entered and this case is closed. We again urge plaintiff to seek the advice of a lawyer. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/11/11.(LSP)
August 4, 2011 12 MOTION (APPLICATION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anne Rowe. (LAD)
June 23, 2011 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne Rowe; P764751, Estrella Jail-F-30, 2939 W Durango Street, Phoenix AZ 85009 (REW)
June 10, 2011 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Court's order filed June 10, 2011, in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed. (DMT)
June 10, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/10/11.(DMT)
May 3, 2011 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Maricopa County Library District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Hartman-Tellez, Karen)
March 28, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 5 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/28/11. (SAT)
March 24, 2011 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anne Rowe. Maricopa County Library District waiver sent on 3/7/2011. (SAT)
March 24, 2011 5 MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Anne Rowe. (SAT)
February 2, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion (application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 02/02/11.(ESL)
January 24, 2011 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frederick J Martone. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-11-157-PHX-FJM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JRD)
January 24, 2011 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anne Rowe. (JRD)
January 24, 2011 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Anne Rowe.(JRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Maricopa County Library District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Library District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?